Smith v. Parole Board, Counselors and Administration, Records Office of High Desert State Prison
Plaintiff: Anthony X. Smith
Defendant: Parole Board, Counselors and Administration, Records Office of High Desert State Prison
Case Number: 4:2019cv07162
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: PSLC JNE
2 Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Case transferred from California Northern has been opened in Eastern District of California - Live System as case 2:19-cv-02454, filed 12/09/2019. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/4/19. (Certificate of Service Attached)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony X. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 12/9/2019. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 ***ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY***See Correct Entry at Docket No. 4***CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony X. Smith. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019) Modified on 11/5/2019 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/21/2019 (ljf, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Parole Board, Counselors and Administration, Records Office of High Desert State Prison (Filing fee $ 400-ifpp). Filed byAnthony X. Smith. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Parole Board, Counselors and Administration, Records Office of High Desert State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony X. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parole Board, Counselors and Administration, Records Office of High Desert State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?