Easter v. Neuschnid
Petitioner: Kevin Jerome Easter
Respondent: Warden Robert Neuschnid
Case Number: 4:2019cv07170
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC GRC
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 Mail sent to Kevin Jerome Easter returned as undeliverable re #2 Clerk's Notice re: IFP, #3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge, #1 Conformed Copy of First Page of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Mail Returned; response required by 2/14/2020. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 4, 2019 Remark - Re-mailed re #2 Clerk's Notice re: IFP, #3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge, #1 Conformed Copy of First Page of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Mail sent to Kevin Jerome Easter returned as undeliverable re #2 Clerk's Notice re: IFP, #3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge, #1 Conformed Copy of First Page of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Mail Returned; response required by 1/24/2020. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 12/9/2019. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/4/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Kevin Jerome Easter. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #1 Envelope) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easter v. Neuschnid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Jerome Easter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Robert Neuschnid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?