Leblanc v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: John Leblanc
Defendant: United States of America and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 4:2019cv07255
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Leblanc.. (Jato, Carlos) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/6/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service, United States of America. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/19/2019. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Jato, Carlos) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by John Leblanc . (Jato, Carlos) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13853691.). Filed byJohn Leblanc. (Jato, Carlos) (Filed on 11/4/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leblanc v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Leblanc
Represented By: Carlos Jato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?