Dominguez v. Saul
Plaintiff: Cynthia Dominguez
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv07292
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew M. Saul.. (Bolin, Timothy) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285, #2 USM-285, #3 USM-285)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cynthia Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Valle, Angelina) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used Re: #4 Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Cynthia Dominguez. [err101]. The correct event is: Civil Events > Motions and Rel ated Filings > Motions - General > Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Application needs to be the main document and if you wish to submit a Proposed Order that would be an attachment.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 **DISREGARD, INCORRECT EVENT USED** Proposed Pretrial Order by Cynthia Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Valle, Angelina) (Filed on 11/5/2019) Modified on 11/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Valle, Angelina) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Cynthia Dominguez . (Valle, Angelina) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul (IFP; NO PROCESS). Filed by Cynthia Dominguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Valle, Angelina) (Filed on 11/5/2019) Modified on 11/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Timothy R. Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Dominguez
Represented By: Angelina Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?