McCurdy v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Melissa McCurdy
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv07404
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Judge Hamilton's Standing Order re Removed Cases by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Tran, Tiffany) (Filed on 11/18/2019) Modified on 11/18/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Tran, Tiffany) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Tran, Tiffany) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Costco Wholesale Corporation Amended. (Tran, Tiffany) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/ 6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Answer to Removal Complaint by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 #Electronic filing error. 1. Civil Cover Sheet is not signed and dated by attorney of record. Please complete a corrected Civil Cover Sheet and e-file an an Amended Civi l Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet.2. Corporate Disclosure Statement > Certification of Interested Entities or Persons must be filed separately on the docket and not as attachments to the initiating document. Correct event is found under Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action to the U.S. District Court from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG19034112. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13871112). Filed byCostco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Cerification of Interested Entities or Persons)(Tran, Tiffany) (Filed on 11/8/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCurdy v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa McCurdy
Represented By: Andrea J Justo
Represented By: Lori J. Costanzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Tiffany T Tran
Represented By: Mark P. Grajski
Represented By: Lindsay Stevens Fitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?