Huffman v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Scott Huffman
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv07408
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Huffman. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Guido, Cristina) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint byJPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Guido, Cristina) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Arjun P. Rao (Rao, Arjun) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Scott Huffman. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/4/2019) Modified on 12/5/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Christine Davidson for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Davidson, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., Scott Huffman. (Guido, Cristina) (Filed on 12/3/2019) Modified on 12/4/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Huffman. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. served on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Huffman re #1 Complaint, page 28 (Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/14/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 13, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Certificate of Interested Entities Must be Filed Separately. Event can be Located Under Notices. This portion of the filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file ONLY the Certificate of Interested Entities. Re: #1 Complaint, page 28, filed by Scott Huffman. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-13872474). Filed by Scott Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Veggian, Lauren) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/13/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huffman v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Huffman
Represented By: Lauren Brooks Sabb Veggian
Represented By: Michael Frederick Cardoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kelsey Christine Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Arjun P. Rao
Represented By: Cristina Anastassia Guido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?