Sgromo v. Scott et al
Plaintiff: Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo, Peter Anthony Sgromo and Pietro Pasquale-Antoni Sgromo
Defendant: LEONARD GREGORY SCOTT and EUREKA INVENTIONS LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv08170
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 33 SUR-REPLY (re #29 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award ) filed byPietro Pasquale-Antoni Sgromo. (Sgromo, Pietro) (Filed on 2/13/2020) Modified on 2/13/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2020 Filing 32 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #29 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award ) and Oppose Cross-Petition filed byLeonard Gregory Scott. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Moore, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
January 26, 2020 Filing 30 Cross-Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award- Remand "Related Claims" to J. White Court (re #29 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award ) filed by Pietro Pasquale-Antoni Sgromo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Opposition, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10)(Sgromo, Pietro) (Filed on 1/26/2020) Modified on 1/27/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2020 Filing 31 USCA Case Number 20-15106 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #27 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Pietro Pasquale-Antoni Sgromo. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Leonard Gregory Scott. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/7/2020. Replies due by 2/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Thomas E. Moore III, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for March 17, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by March 10th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-08170-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #26 Order Reassigning Case, Case Assigned/Reassigned, #25 Order Relating Case by Pietro Pasquale-Antoni Sgromo. (IFP Request was previously e-filed with the Court and granted at docket no. #7 ). Appeal Record due by 2/24/2020. (Sgromo, Pietro) (Filed on 1/23/2020) Modified on 1/23/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/24/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to cas. Signed by the Clerk on 01/23/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RELATING CASE TO CASE NO. 17-CV-00205-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/22/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 24 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by EUREKA INVENTIONS LLC, LEONARD GREGORY SCOTT.. (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #20 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/16/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 27, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 27, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE : Acknowledging case transferred in from the Eastern District of Texas; 2:19-cv-00231 (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 18 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00231. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 First MOTION to Alter Judgment to specify original court of jurisdiction- NDCAL- OAK filed by Leonard Gregory Scott. (Moore, Thomas)
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Alter Judgment to specify original court of jurisdiction- NDCAL- OAK by Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo. (Sgromo, Pietro)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM ORDER - ORDERED that thiscase be transferred to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/7/2019. (ch, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Leonard Gregory Scott re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court or to Transfer to N.D. Cal. Notice of Ripeness and Request for Hearing (Moore, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court or to Transfer to N.D. Cal. filed by Leonard Gregory Scott. (Moore, Thomas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court or to Transfer to N.D. Cal. filed by Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DECL #1 OF PPASGROMO, #2 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 1 - LTA, #3 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 2 - INVEST IN ERKA, #4 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 3 - SGROMO CONSULT FOR SCOTT, #5 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 4 - SGROMO PRE SALARY, #6 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 5 - SCOTT SGRO INVEST DISC, #7 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 6 - WEM BSTWY 440 DEAL MEMO, #8 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 7 - BSTWY ERKA 440 AGMNT, #9 Exhibit DECL. EXH. 8 - BSTWY ERKA SLIDE AGMNT)(Sgromo, Pietro)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court or to Transfer to N.D. Cal. filed by Leonard Gregory Scott, #9 Stipulation filed by Leonard Gregory Scott. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/26/2019. (ch, ) (order sent regular mail)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court or to Transfer to N.D. Cal. and Order to Extend Due Date of Response by Leonard Gregory Scott. (Moore, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court or to Transfer to N.D. Cal. by Leonard Gregory Scott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Moore Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Moore Decl, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Moore Decl, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Moore Decl, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Thomas)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/8/2019. (ch, )
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER assigning case to Judge Payne by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/3/2019. (ch, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Eureka Inventions LLC, Leonard Gregory Scott, Pietro Pasquale Antonio Sgromo. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Thomas E. Moore, III on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7335834. (Moore, Thomas)
June 20, 2019 (MAILED TO PLAINTIFF REGULAR MAIL) In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) Modified on 6/20/2019 (ch, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pietro Pasquale Antonio Sgromo. (ch, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pietro Pasquale Antonio Sgromo from Superior Court of the State of California, case number CPF - 19-516663., filed by Pietro Pasquale Antonio Sgromo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit A-D)(ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ch, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sgromo v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo
Represented By: Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Anthony Sgromo
Represented By: Pietro Pasquale Antoni Sgromo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pietro Pasquale-Antoni Sgromo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEONARD GREGORY SCOTT
Represented By: Thomas E. Moore, III
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUREKA INVENTIONS LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Moore, III
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?