Burch et al v. DBMP LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amy Schwartz, Ashley Burch-Hughes, Cindy Burch, Nicole Burch and Tonya Burch
Defendant: Allied Fluid Products Corp fka Allied Packing & Supply, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, DBMP LLC, GCO, Inc, CertainTeed LLC, Allied Fluid Products Corp., Allied Packing & Supply, Inc. and Groeniger & Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv08236
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #29 STIPULATION TO STAY THE CASE filed by Cindy Burch, Nicole Burch, Tonya Burch, Ashley Burch-Hughes, Allied Fluid Products Corp. ***Civil Case Administratively Closed.*** Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/24/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Cindy Burch, Nicole Burch, Tonya Burch, Ashley Burch-Hughes and Allied Fluid Products Corp. (Pelletier, Ted) (Filed on 2/18/2020) Modified on 2/19/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by DBMP LLC Of Bankruptcy Filing And Stay Of Proceedings And Entry Of Temporary Restraining Order (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES by Allied Fluid Products Corp. fka ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/31/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2020 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Allied Fluid Products Corp... (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities by Allied Fluid Products Corp. fka ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/31/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Thomas Cordery on behalf of ALLIED FLUID PRODUCTS CORP fka ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC. (Cordery, Theodore) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #22 Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of GCO, Inc., F/K/A Groeniger & Company, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii).(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 23, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 02:30 PM in Oakland, Chambers. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of GCO, Inc., F/K/A Groeniger & Company, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by GCO, Inc, Amy Schwartz, Ashley Burch-Hughes, Tonya Burch, Nicole Burch, and Cindy Burch. (Torres, Julie) (Filed on 1/22/2020) Modified on 1/23/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CertainTeed LLC.. (Walsh, Rachel) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand filed by Cindy Burch, Nicole Burch, Tonya Burch, Ashley Burch-Hughes, Amy Schwartz. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 1/31/2020. Replies due by 2/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Pelletier, Ted) (Filed on 1/17/2020) Modified on 1/23/2020 (mllS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cindy Burch, Nicole Burch, Tonya Burch, Ashley Burch-Hughes, Amy Schwartz (Pelletier, Ted) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ted William Pelletier (Pelletier, Ted) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DBMP LLC Of Case Management Scheduling Order For Reassigned Civil Case (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/13/20. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 01/13/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by DBMP LLC.. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/21/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
December 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byDBMP LLC. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by CertainTeed LLC identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Paris, France for CertainTeed LLC. (Walsh, Rachel) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CertainTeed LLC identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Paris, France for CertainTeed LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Walsh, Rachel) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by DBMP LLC identifying Other Affiliate Compagnie De Saint-Gobain for DBMP LLC. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 26, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities must be Filed as Separate Events. This filing will not be processed by the clerks o ffice. Please re-file ONLY Re: #7 - 1 and 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities filed by CertainTeed LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint byCertainTeed LLC. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons)(Walsh, Rachel) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
December 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Melissa Walsh (Walsh, Rachel) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Notice Of Removal On Adverse Parties And Filing Of Notice Of Removal With California Superior Court For The County Of Alameda Pursuant 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) by DBMP LLC. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 12/23/2019) Modified on 12/26/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by DBMP LLC identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie De Saint-Gobain for DBMP LLC. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (with jury demand by plaintiff) from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG19043696. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13994690). Filed by DBMP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Daniel B. Hoye In Support Of Defendant DBMP LLCs Notice Of Removal (with Exhibits 1-16), #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate Of Service By Mail)(Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 12/18/2019) Modified on 12/19/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burch et al v. DBMP LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Fluid Products Corp fka Allied Packing & Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBMP LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCO, Inc
Represented By: Julie Ann Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CertainTeed LLC
Represented By: Rachel Melissa Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Fluid Products Corp.
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Cordery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Packing & Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Cordery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groeniger & Company
Represented By: Julie Ann Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Schwartz
Represented By: Justin Alexander Bosl
Represented By: Ted William Pelletier
Represented By: Arcelia Leticia Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Burch-Hughes
Represented By: Justin Alexander Bosl
Represented By: Ted William Pelletier
Represented By: Arcelia Leticia Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Burch
Represented By: Justin Alexander Bosl
Represented By: Ted William Pelletier
Represented By: Arcelia Leticia Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Burch
Represented By: Justin Alexander Bosl
Represented By: Ted William Pelletier
Represented By: Arcelia Leticia Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Burch
Represented By: Justin Alexander Bosl
Represented By: Ted William Pelletier
Represented By: Arcelia Leticia Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?