Miller v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Plaintiff: Teddy Miller
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo & Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv08327
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #13 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. AND CERTICIATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative Transfer Proceedings to Southern District of New York filed by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/20/2020. Replies due by 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michaelle Wilkie, #2 Declaration of Bailey Bifoss, #3 Proposed Order)(McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 01/07/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Teddy Miller.. (Wills, Rhonda) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Teddy Miller identifying Other Affiliate Wills Law Firm, PLLC - Rhonda H. Wills for Teddy Miller. (Wills, Rhonda) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 2, 2020 #Electronic filing error.RE: #6 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Teddy Miller 1. Judge name or initials are missing/incorrect. Documents should reference the c orrect judge name/initials on future filings. The full and correct case number is: 4:19-cv-08327-KAW. 2. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Teddy Miller DISCLOSURE OF NON-PARTY INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Wills, Rhonda) (Filed on 12/31/2019)
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
December 24, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Teddy Miller.The Certificate of Interested Parties needs to be filed separately and not as an attachment to your complaint. Please re-file the document using the correct event. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019) Modified on 12/26/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/ 17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/6/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wills, Rhonda) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14002046.). Filed byTeddy Miller. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons)(Wills, Rhonda) (Filed on 12/20/2019) Modified on 12/24/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew More McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Andrew More McNaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Miller
Represented By: Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?