Houser v. Tesla Motors Club, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Robert Houser
Defendant: TESLA MOTORS CLUB LLC, DOES 1 through 10 inclusive and Tesla Motors Club, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv08444
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Houser. Tesla Motors Club, LLC served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Basria, Saba) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 01/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Houser.. (Basria, Saba) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/28/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 Civil Cover Sheet by Robert Houser Amended. (Basria, Saba) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 ***DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET #10 FOR CORRECT FILING.*** Civil Cover Sheet by Robert Houser Amended. (Basria, Saba) (Filed on 12/30/2019) Modified on 1/2/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyright infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to TESLA MOTORS CLUB LLC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 7/19) [err101]. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Even t is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Re: #5 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Robert Houser (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Robert Houser . (Basria, Saba) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used at case opening of JS44 (Rev. 06/91). Please complete and re-file as a separate docket entry Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19) re #1 . #2 Complaint filed by Robert Houser (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/13/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Robert Houser (Basria, Saba) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Basria, Saba) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against TESLA MOTORS CLUB LLC and DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14021832.). Filed by Robert Houser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Basria, Saba) (Filed on 12/30/2019) Modified on 12/30/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houser v. Tesla Motors Club, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TESLA MOTORS CLUB LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Motors Club, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Houser
Represented By: Saba Ali Basria
Represented By: Mathew Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?