Sullivan v. APL Marine Services LTD
Plaintiff: William A Sullivan
Defendant: APL Marine Services LTD
Case Number: 4:2020cv00178
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by William A Sullivan. Service waived by APL Marine Services LTD waiver sent on 1/13/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (Washkowitz, Jared) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to APL Marine Services LTD. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 12, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William A Sullivan.. (Washkowitz, Jared) (Filed on 1/12/2020)
January 12, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Washkowitz, Jared) (Filed on 1/12/2020)
January 9, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect filing procedure re: proposed summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The correct event is Proposed Summo ns. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. Please re-file the proposed summons using the instructions above. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/23/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against APL Marine Services LTD. Filed byWilliam A Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Washkowitz, Jared) (Filed on 1/8/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. APL Marine Services LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APL Marine Services LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A Sullivan
Represented By: Jared A. Washkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?