San Francisco Baykeeper Inc. v. P.J.'s Lumber, Inc.
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper and San Francisco Baykeeper, Inc.
Defendant: P.J.'s Lumber, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00237
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines filed by San Francisco Baykeeper, Inc.. (Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by San Francisco Baykeeper, Inc.. Service waived by P.J.'s Lumber, Inc. waiver sent on 3/3/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to P.J.'s Lumber, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by San Francisco Baykeeper, Inc. (Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Francisco Baykeeper, Inc... (Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against P.J.'s Lumber, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-14060688). Filed by San Francisco Baykeeper Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 1/10/2020) Modified on 1/13/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Francisco Baykeeper Inc. v. P.J.'s Lumber, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.J.'s Lumber, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Represented By: Nicole Chiyeko Sasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Lee Len
Represented By: Nicole Chiyeko Sasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?