Zurich American Insurance Company v. Northern Pacific Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive and Northern Pacific Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00361
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STAYING CASE. Motions terminated: #9 MOTION for Entry of Default of Defendant Northern Pacific Corporation filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Case Management Statement due by 3/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 10, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Stay for Defendant Northern Pacific Corporation by Thomas P. Kelly, III (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kelly, Thomas) (Filed on 3/8/2020) Modified on 3/9/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2020 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2020 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 03/06/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zurich American Insurance Company.. (Horton, Lincoln) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default of Defendant Northern Pacific Corporation filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lincoln V. Horton in Support of Request for Default)(Horton, Lincoln) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Northern Pacific Corporation served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Horton, Lincoln) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/25/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Northern Pacific Corporation. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/30/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Horton, Lincoln) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd for Zurich American Insurance Company. (Horton, Lincoln) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14079059.). Filed byZurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Horton, Lincoln) (Filed on 1/16/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. Northern Pacific Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Lincoln Victor Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Pacific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?