Tyler v. Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Janet and Phillip Tyler
Defendant: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00364
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED ANSWER to Unverified Complaint byTravelers Commercial Insurance Company. (DeLaney, Kathleen) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
January 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 Amended MOTION to Strike #6 MOTION to Strike Answer to Removal Complaint . Responses due by 2/11/2020. Replies due by 2/19/2020. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 15 Renotice motion hearing re #13 Amended MOTION to Strike #6 MOTION to Strike Answer to Removal Complaint filed byJanet and Phillip Tyler. (Related document(s) #13 ) (O'Connor, Timothy) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (O'Connor, Timothy) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 28, 2020 ***Deadlines terminated:Counsel has been notified to properly re-notice their motion on an open and available date on Judge White's calendar re: #6 MOTION to Strike Answer to Removal Complaint filed by Janet and Phillip Tyler. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 13 Amended MOTION to Strike #6 MOTION to Strike Answer to Removal Complaint filed by Janet and Phillip Tyler. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 2/11/2020. Replies due by 2/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Timothy) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/24/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned.

January 22, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company.. (DeLaney, Kathleen) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Janet and Phillip Tyler (O'Connor, Timothy) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Strike Answer to Removal Complaint filed by Janet and Phillip Tyler. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Responses due by 2/4/2020. Replies due by 2/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Timothy) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company of Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal of Action to District Court and All Related Papers (DeLaney, Kathleen) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2020 02:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman on 1/16/20. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Answer to #1 (Page 35) Removal Complaint; byTravelers Commercial Insurance Company. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/30/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Travelers Commercial Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for Travelers Commercial Insurance Company. (DeLaney, Kathleen) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO DISTRICT COURT (NO PROCESS); from Lake County Superior Court. Their case number is CV420501. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14079692). Filed byTravelers Commercial Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Ryan in Support of Notice of Removal of Action to District Court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(DeLaney, Kathleen) (Filed on 1/16/2020) Modified on 1/17/2020 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyler v. Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen M. DeLaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet and Phillip Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?