Our Children's Earth Foundation v. Wheeler
Plaintiff: Our Children's Earth Foundation
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Case Number: 4:2020cv00396
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER: Attorney Leslie M. Hill Must Update Current Mailing Address in ECF Profile. [err102] Re: #11 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew Wheeler. ( cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie M. Hill (Hill, Leslie) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Andrew Wheeler, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Wilcox, Stuart) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/22/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 01/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 21, 2020 #Electronic filing error Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Our Children's Earth Foundation. 1. Incorrect event used Re: #1 Complaint [err101]. The correct event is Propos ed Summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerk's office. Please re-file the proposed summons using the instructions above. 2. Contact information may not be up to date re: Stuart Wilcox. Counsel must update personal profile for change of contact information to be in effect. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Our Children's Earth Foundation.. (Wilcox, Stuart) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/4/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 20, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Our Children's Earth Foundation (Wilcox, Stuart) (Filed on 1/20/2020)
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Wheeler ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14086464.). Filed byOur Children's Earth Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Andrew Wheeler, #2 Summons - Attorney General, #3 Summons - Civil Process Clerk, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilcox, Stuart) (Filed on 1/20/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Our Children's Earth Foundation v. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Our Children's Earth Foundation
Represented By: Stuart Nicholas Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?