Eco Electrical Systems, LLC v. Reliaguard Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eco Electrical Systems, LLC
Defendant: Maydwell & Hartzell LLC, Reliaguard Inc., Greenjacket Inc. and Hubbell Power Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00444
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 40 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC, Greenjacket Inc., Maydwell & Hartzell LLC, Reliaguard Inc. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/15/2020) Modified on 5/18/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2020 Filing 39 Joint Discovery Plan by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC, Greenjacket Inc., Maydwell & Hartzell LLC, Reliaguard Inc. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/15/2020) Modified on 5/18/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2020 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance of B. Christine Park by Cheryl Ann Noll. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/14/2020) Modified on 5/15/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2020 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance of Vivian V. Countryman by John Stewart Simonson. (Simonson, John) (Filed on 5/13/2020) Modified on 5/13/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2020 Filing 36 Certificate of Interested Entities by Maydwell & Hartzell LLC identifying Other Affiliate Hanover American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Bob Frase, Other Affiliate Sharon Frase for Maydwell & Hartzell LLC, Maydwell & Hartzell LLC. (Simonson, John) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Michael D. Lynch, Other Affiliate Michael D. Lynch, Trustee of the MICHAEL D. LYNCH TRUST, dated July 11, 2019, Other Affiliate Debra Lynch, Other Affiliate James "Buzz" Weldy, Other Affiliate Susan Weldy, Other Affiliate James Waite Weldy, Jr., as trustee of the Weldy Eco Electrical Trust dated February 22, 2011, Other Affiliate Warren Tripp, Other Affiliate Carol Tripp, Other Affiliate Warren W. Tripp and Carol A. Tripp as Trustees of The Warren and Carol Tripp Family Trust dated July 29, 1999, as may be amended. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/12/2020) Modified on 5/13/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents Re: #34 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/11/2020) Modified on 5/12/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Cross-Defendant Hubbell Power Systems Inc., as a Successor-in-Interest to Greenjacket Inc., a Delaware Corporation by Maydwell & Hartzell LLC (Simonson, John) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 32 Stipulation to Dismiss Hubbell Power Systems Without Prejudice (CORRECTION OF DOCUMENT #30) filed by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC, Greenjacket Inc., Hubbell Power Systems, Inc., Reliaguard Inc. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/8/2020) Modified on 5/8/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2020 Filing 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Hubbell Power Systems, Inc., as a Successor-In-Interest to Greenjacket Inc., a Delaware Corporation by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/8/2020) Modified on 5/11/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2020 Filing 30 ***ERROR ON PDF, SEE DOCKET ENTRY #32 *** STIPULATION re #14 Amended Complaint Stipulation to Dismiss Hubbell Power Systems Without Prejudice filed by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/8/2020) Modified on 5/8/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2020 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Simonson, John) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Cart, Jean-Paul) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/6/2020) Modified on 5/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2020 Filing 26 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ANSWER OF DEFENDANT MAYDWELL & HARTZELL, LLCS; AND CROSS-CLAIM FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNITY, CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF by Maydwell & Hartzell LLC. (Simonson, John) (Filed on 5/1/2020) Modified on 5/4/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by John Spencer Guy Worden (Worden, John) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Greenjacket Inc., Reliaguard Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hubbell Incorporated, Corporate Parent Hubbell Power Systems, Inc. for Greenjacket Inc., Reliaguard Inc.. (Cart, Jean-Paul) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint (with jury demand) by Greenjacket Inc., Reliaguard Inc. (Cart, Jean-Paul) (Filed on 4/29/2020) Modified on 4/30/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Summons and Amended Complaint Via US Mail and Email by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC. (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 4/9/2020) Modified on 4/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC re #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Proposed Summons, #14 Amended Complaint to HUBBELL POWER SYSTEMS, INC. (Bowles, Richard) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 19 Answer to #14 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNITY, CONTRIBUTION DECLARATORY RELIEF against Greenjacket Inc., Hubbell Power Systems, Inc., Reliaguard Inc. by Maydwell & Hartzell LLC. (Simonson, John) (Filed on 3/30/2020) Modified on 3/31/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Greenjacket Inc., Hubbell Power Systems, Inc., Maydwell & Hartzell LLC, Reliaguard Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 16, 2020 Filing 16 Civil Cover Sheet by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC Amended. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 16, 2020 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against all defendants. Filed by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 3/16/2020) Modified on 3/17/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMaydwell & Hartzell LLC. (Simonson, John) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC. Reliaguard Inc. served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC. Maydwell & Hartzell LLC served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/24/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC.. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Maydwell & Hartzell LLC, Reliaguard Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2020 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/22/20. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/5/2020. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eco Electrical Systems, LLC (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR: 1) TRADE LIBEL; 2) FALSE ADVERTISING (VIOLATION OF BUS.& PROF.CODE 17500, ET SEQ.); 3) INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH PROSPECTIVE ECONIMIC ADVANTAGE; 4) UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES (VIOLATION OF BUS & PROF.CODE 17200. ET SEQ.) 5) FALSE ADVERTISING (VIOLATION OF 15 USC 1125(a)); DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14091345.). Filed byEco Electrical Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noll, Cheryl) (Filed on 1/21/2020) Modified on 1/23/2020 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eco Electrical Systems, LLC v. Reliaguard Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eco Electrical Systems, LLC
Represented By: Cheryl Ann Noll
Represented By: Boksoon Christine Park
Represented By: Richard T. Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maydwell & Hartzell LLC
Represented By: John Stewart Simonson
Represented By: Vivian V. Countryman,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliaguard Inc.
Represented By: Jean-Paul P. Cart
Represented By: John Spencer Guy Worden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenjacket Inc.
Represented By: Jean-Paul P. Cart
Represented By: John Spencer Guy Worden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbell Power Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?