Build Group, Inc. v. Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Build Group, Inc.
Defendant: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00555
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 20 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Endurance American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Endurance U.S. Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Sompo Japan Nipponkoa Insurance Inc., Corporate Parent Sompo Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Endurance Assurance Corporation, Corporate Parent Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd., Corporate Parent Sompo International Holdings Ltd. for Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Cicala, Conte) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Endurance American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Endurance U.S. Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Sompo Japan Nipponkoa Insurance Inc., Corporate Parent Sompo Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Endurance Assurance Corporation, Corporate Parent Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd., Corporate Parent Sompo International Holdings Ltd. for Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Cicala, Conte) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint byEndurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Cicala, Conte) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabrielle Ana Hollingsworth (Hollingsworth, Gabrielle) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company and Build Group, Inc. (Cicala, Conte) (Filed on 2/13/2020) Modified on 2/14/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Conte C. Cicala (Cicala, Conte) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/5/2020 by 5:00 P.M. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 02/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Build Group, Inc... (Demson, Ellen) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 Refund Status re #6 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by Build Group, Inc. re: Summons & Complaint (Holden, Miles) (Filed on 2/4/2020) Modified on 2/5/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14104256 by Build Group, Inc.. (Holden, Miles) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/7/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Build Group, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Holden, Miles) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Build Group, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Holden, Miles) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Holden, Miles) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14104339.). Filed byBuild Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holden, Miles) (Filed on 1/24/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Build Group, Inc. v. Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Build Group, Inc.
Represented By: Miles C. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?