Insalaco v. Fire Insurance Exchange
Plaintiff: Robert Insalaco
Defendant: Fire Insurance Exchange
Case Number: 4:2020cv00664
Filed: January 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 02/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fire Insurance Exchange.. (Kawar, Ramsey) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/25/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Insalaco.. (Hirsch, Clifford) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 Addendum to Ex. A to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Fire Insurance Exchange. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Kawar, Ramsey) (Filed on 2/6/2020) Modified on 2/7/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Crutcher, Jacqueline.(terminating Docket No. #9 , Re-filed as Docket No. #10 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14136719.) Filing fee previously paid on 02/03/2020 filed by Fire Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Certificate of Good Standing from Louisiana Supreme Court)(Crutcher, Jacqueline) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 5, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Please re-file the application using the ECF login and password for the attorney who seeks to be admitted. Re: #9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14136719.) Filing fee previously paid on 02/03/2020 filed by Fire Insurance Exchange (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 ***RE-FILED, SEE DOCKET NO. #10 .*** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14136719.) Filing fee previously paid on 02/03/2020 filed by Fire Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Certificate of Good Standing from Louisiana Supreme Court)(Kawar, Ramsey) (Filed on 2/4/2020) Modified on 2/5/2020 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant by Fire Insurance Exchange. (Kawar, Ramsey) (Filed on 2/4/2020) Modified on 2/5/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2020 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re #7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Fire Insurance Exchange. ***Admission procedures require the attorney requesting to appear pro hac vice register as an ECF user. A search of ECF shows that Jacqueline C. Crutcher has not registered as an ECF user. The application will not be processed until attorney has registered.*** (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14136719.) filed by Fire Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Certificate of Good Standing from Louisiana Supreme Court)(Kawar, Ramsey) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fire Insurance Exchange of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal of Action to United States District Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Endorsed-Filed Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal of Action to United States District Court)(Kawar, Ramsey) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fire Insurance Exchange re #1 Notice of Removal, (Kawar, Ramsey) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Clifford Hirsch. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the Complaint in docket no. #1 . Please update your personal profile on ECF. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Fire Insurance Exchange (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/30/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/12/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Fire Insurance Exchange . (Kawar, Ramsey) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to United States District Court for the Northern District of California from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is C19-02687. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14121205). Filed byFire Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal)(Kawar, Ramsey) (Filed on 1/29/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Insalaco v. Fire Insurance Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Ramsey F. Kawar
Represented By: Jacqueline Childers Crutcher
Represented By: Michael A. Farbstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Insalaco
Represented By: Clifford Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?