Save Our County et al v. United States Defense Logistics Agency et al
Plaintiff: Save Our County, Sierra Club, Community In-Power and Development Association Inc. and United Congregations of Metro East
Defendant: United States Defense Logistics Agency, Mark T. Esper, Darrell K. Williams, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling, LLC, United States Department of Defense and Heritage Environmental Service, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01267
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #27 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 27 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Barry M. Hartman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14316443.) filed by Heritage Environmental Service, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Hartman, Barry) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tradebe Treatment and Recycling, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Tradebe Environmental Services, LLC for Tradebe Treatment and Recycling, LLC. (Endemann, Buck) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Heritage Environmental Service, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Heritage Environmental Services, Inc. for Heritage Environmental Service, LLC. (Endemann, Buck) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Buck Britton Endemann (Endemann, Buck) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Community In-Power and Development Association Inc., Save Our County, Sierra Club, United Congregations of Metro East (Kalmuss-Katz, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Community In-Power and Development Association Inc., Save Our County, Sierra Club, United Congregations of Metro East (Kalmuss-Katz, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2020 02:30 PM in Oakland, Chambers. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 3/9/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (attachment(s): #1 Standing Order) (amgS, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 3/6/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Community In-Power and Development Association Inc., Save Our County, Sierra Club, United Congregations of Metro East.. (Kalmuss-Katz, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Ferrell for Federal Defendants (Ferrell, Taylor) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Mark T. Esper, Heritage Environmental Service, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling, LLC, United States Defense Logistics Agency, United States Department of Defense, Darrell K. Williams. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophia Bernadette Jayanty (Jayanty, Sophia) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Novak (Novak, Suzanne) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Kalmuss-Katz (Kalmuss-Katz, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C. Loarie (Loarie, Gregory) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sophia B. Jayanty. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Suzanne Novak. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Kalmuss-Katz. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/5/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14197534.) filed by Community In-Power and Development Association Inc., Save Our County, Sierra Club, United Congregations of Metro East. (Jayanty, Sophia) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14197524.) filed by Community In-Power and Development Association Inc., Save Our County, Sierra Club, United Congregations of Metro East. (Novak, Suzanne) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14197516.) filed by Community In-Power and Development Association Inc., Save Our County, Sierra Club, United Congregations of Metro East. (Kalmuss-Katz, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Community In-Power and Development Association Inc., Save Our County, Sierra Club, United Congregations of Metro East (Loarie, Gregory) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Loarie, Gregory) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Mark T. Esper, Heritage Environmental Service, LLC, Tradebe Treatment and Recycling, LLC, United States Defense Logistics Agency, United States Department of Defense, Darrell K. Williams (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14197430.). Filed by United Congregations of Metro East, Community In-Power and Development Association Inc., Save Our County, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Loarie, Gregory) (Filed on 2/20/2020) Modified on 2/24/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Save Our County et al v. United States Defense Logistics Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Save Our County
Represented By: Suzanne Novak
Represented By: Jonathan Kalmuss-Katz
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Sophia Bernadette Jayanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Suzanne Novak
Represented By: Jonathan Kalmuss-Katz
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Sophia Bernadette Jayanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community In-Power and Development Association Inc.
Represented By: Suzanne Novak
Represented By: Jonathan Kalmuss-Katz
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Sophia Bernadette Jayanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Congregations of Metro East
Represented By: Suzanne Novak
Represented By: Jonathan Kalmuss-Katz
Represented By: Gregory C. Loarie
Represented By: Sophia Bernadette Jayanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Defense Logistics Agency
Represented By: Taylor Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Esper
Represented By: Taylor Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell K. Williams
Represented By: Taylor Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradebe Treatment and Recycling, LLC
Represented By: Barry M. Hartman
Represented By: Buck Britton Endemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Taylor Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Environmental Service, LLC
Represented By: Barry M. Hartman
Represented By: Buck Britton Endemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?