Porter-heft v. Santa Clara Sheriffs Department et al
Plaintiff: Deanna Rae Porter-heft
Defendant: UnIdentified Officer, Further Unknown Officers and Santa Clara Sheriffs Department
Case Number: 4:2020cv01570
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi is no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Clerk on 4/10/2020. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2020: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Reassignment to a District Judge; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Dismissal re #1 Complaint filed by Deanna Rae Porter-Heft. Objections due by 5/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 4/2/2020. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2020: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Deanna Rae Porter-heft. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 Declaration of Deanna Rae Porter (Weese) Heft filed byDeanna Rae Porter-heft. (Related document(s) #1 ) (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Further Unknown Officers, Santa Clara Sheriffs Department, UnIdentified Officer. Filed by Deanna Rae Porter-heft. Consent/Declination due by 3/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter-heft v. Santa Clara Sheriffs Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnIdentified Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Further Unknown Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Rae Porter-heft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?