Rodriguez v. Rodriguez
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Rodriguez
Defendant: Miguel Luis Antonio Rodriguez and Antovich
Case Number: 4:2020cv01946
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CHC
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
2 Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 04/21/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE TO A DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie KIm on 4/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Antovich, Miguel Luis Antonio Rodriguez. Filed byJose Antonio Rodriguez. Consent/Declination due by 5/7/2020. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jose Antonio Rodriguez.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jose Antonio Rodriguez. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 4/27/2020. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 4/27/2020. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 LETTER to Clerk from Jose Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Luis Antonio Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?