Lowell et al v. United Behavioral Health et al
Plaintiff: Tamar Lowell and Thomas Lowell
Defendant: United Behavioral Health and UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv01989
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by United Behavioral Health, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate United Behavioral Health is ultimately a wholly owned subsidiary of UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for United Behavioral Health; Other Affiliate UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a wholly owned subsidiary of UHIC Holdings, Inc., a wholly owned subsidiary of United HealthCare Services, Inc., a wholly owned subsidiary of UnitedHealth Group, In for UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Hill, Courtney) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by United Behavioral Health, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/26/2020. Replies due by 6/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nguyen ISO Motion, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer)(Hill, Courtney) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to #1 Complaint filed by United Behavioral Health, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, Thomas Lowell, and Tamar Lowell. (Hill, Courtney) (Filed on 5/4/2020) Modified on 5/5/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 7/13/2020 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tamar Lowell, Thomas Lowell. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Reynolds, Caroline) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tamar Lowell, Thomas Lowell. United Behavioral Health served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Reynolds, Caroline) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Caroline E. Reynolds. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Jason S. Cowart. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re D. Brian Hufford. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14332800.) filed by Tamar Lowell, Thomas Lowell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Reynolds, Caroline) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14332742.) filed by Tamar Lowell, Thomas Lowell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cowart, Jason) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14332677.) filed by Tamar Lowell, Thomas Lowell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hufford, D.) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 03/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tamar Lowell, Thomas Lowell.. (Bendat, Meiram) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United Behavioral Health, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/6/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tamar Lowell, Thomas Lowell identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Tamar Lowell, Thomas Lowell. (Bendat, Meiram) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Bendat, Meiram) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Behavioral Health, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14302100.). Filed byTamar Lowell, Thomas Lowell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bendat, Meiram) (Filed on 3/20/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowell et al v. United Behavioral Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health
Represented By: Courtney Culwell Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Courtney Culwell Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamar Lowell
Represented By: Meiram Bendat
Represented By: Jason S. Cowart
Represented By: D. Brian Hufford
Represented By: Caroline E. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lowell
Represented By: Meiram Bendat
Represented By: Jason S. Cowart
Represented By: D. Brian Hufford
Represented By: Caroline E. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?