Golden State Salmon Association et al v. United States Bureau of Reclamation
Plaintiff: Institute for Fisheries Resources, Friends of the River, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Golden State Salmon Association and Sierra Club
Defendant: United States Bureau of Reclamation
Case Number: 4:2020cv02016
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Bureau of Reclamation. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 22 First Supplemental COMPLAINT against United States Bureau of Reclamation. Filed by Golden State Salmon Association, Friends of the River, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Sierra Club. (Logan, Marie) (Filed on 5/6/2020) Modified on 5/7/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #14 Motion to Supplement Complaint. Supplemented Complaint due by 5/13/2020.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2020 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 4, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey P. Geis (Geis, Stacey) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Friends of the River, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Sierra Club and United States Bureau of Reclamation. (Logan, Marie) (Filed on 4/29/2020) Modified on 4/30/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT filed by United States Bureau of Reclamation, Friends of the River, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations and Sierra Club. . (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 4/28/2020) Modified on 4/29/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2020 Filing 16 Statement of Non-Opposition re #14 MOTION to Supplement Complaint filed byUnited States Bureau of Reclamation. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/14/2020. Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2020. Telephone Conference set for 5/5/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Chambers before Judge Jon S. Tigar.Please email to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk (jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov) one number at which all attorneys appearing by telephone can be reached. Because more than one conference will be set at that time, the conference may not begin precisely at 2:00 PM.Total Time in Court: 11 Minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Nina Robertson, Marie Logan. Defendant Attorney: Emmet P. Ong. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/14/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Supplement Complaint filed by Friends of the River, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Sierra Club. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/24/2020. Replies due by 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Logan, Marie) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 7, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:20-cv-02016-JST. Counsel need not r e-file the document, but should reference the correct case number on future filings. Re: #13 Joint Case Management Statement, filed by Friends of the River, Institute for Fisheries Resources, United States Bureau of Reclamation, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Sierra Club, Golden State Salmon Association (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Friends of the River, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Sierra Club and United States Bureau of Reclamation. (Logan, Marie) (Filed on 4/7/2020) Modified on 4/8/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Emmet P. Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Pursuant to General Order 72, the case management conference currently scheduled for April 14, 2020, will proceed telephonically. No party need submit a request for telephonic appearance. Not later than 24 hours before the conference, the parties are ordered to email the courtroom deputy a conference call number at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov. All counsel and/or parties representing themselves must be on the line at 2:00 p.m., ready to proceed when called. The Court usually schedules more than one case management conference at the same time, and thanks the parties and counsel in advance for their patience. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Friends of the River, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Sierra Club re 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Complaint, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #6 Summons Issued as to USA (Logan, Marie) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 4/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RELATING CASE 20-cv-02016-DMR to 19-cv-08319-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 1, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States Bureau of Reclamation. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2010 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/6/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Logan, Marie) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Friends of the River, Golden State Salmon Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Sierra Club (Logan, Marie) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14305586.). Filed byGolden State Salmon Association, Friends of the River, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Logan, Marie) (Filed on 3/23/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden State Salmon Association et al v. United States Bureau of Reclamation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Institute for Fisheries Resources
Represented By: Nina Catherine Robertson
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Logan
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the River
Represented By: Nina Catherine Robertson
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Logan
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations
Represented By: Nina Catherine Robertson
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Logan
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden State Salmon Association
Represented By: Nina Catherine Robertson
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Logan
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Nina Catherine Robertson
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Logan
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?