Altman et al v. County of Santa Clara et al
Plaintiff: Albert Lee Swann, Firearms Policy Coalition, Roman Kaplan, Janice Altman, California Gun Rights Foundation, Inc., City Arms LLC, Ryan Goodrich, Second Amendment Foundation, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees Inc, Yan Traytel, City Arms East LLC, Dmitri Danilevsky, Greg David, National Rifle Association of America, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC d.b.a. Eddy's Shooting Sports and Scott Chalmers
Defendant: Sheriff David Livingston, Sara Cody, Edgardo Garcia, Chief Dan Steidle, Sam Liccardo, County of Santa Clara, Max Bosel, City of Mountain View, California, City of San Jose, California, Chris Farnitano, Doctor Scott Morrow, Erica Pan, Sheriff Carlos Bolanos, County of Alameda, California, City of Pleasant Hill, California, Jeffrey Rosen, County of Contra Costa, California, Laurie Smith, Bryan Hill, Gregory Ahern, County of San Mateo, California and City of Pacifica, California
Case Number: 4:2020cv02180
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE by Carlos Bolanos, County of San Mateo, California, Scott Morrow DEFENDANT COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF REVISED HEALTH OFFICER ORDER (McCloskey, Daniel) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 57 Supplemental Brief re #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Preliminary Injunction (Reply) filed byJanice Altman, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees Inc, California Gun Rights Foundation, Inc., Scott Chalmers, City Arms East LLC, City Arms LLC, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC d.b.a. Eddy's Shooting Sports, Dmitri Danilevsky, Greg David, Firearms Policy Coalition, Ryan Goodrich, Roman Kaplan, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, Albert Lee Swann, Yan Traytel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roman Kaplan (Supplemental))(Related document(s) #20 ) (Lee, George) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 56 Request for Judicial Notice re #55 Opposition/Response to Motion, Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief filed bySara Cody, County of Santa Clara, Jeffrey Rosen, Laurie Smith. (Related document(s) #55 ) (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 55 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Preliminary Injunction ) Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief filed bySara Cody, County of Santa Clara, Jeffrey Rosen, Laurie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jason M. Bussey with Exhibits A-F)(Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 5/27/2020) Modified on 5/28/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2020 Filing 54 Supplemental Brief re #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Preliminary Injunction filed byJanice Altman, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees Inc, California Gun Rights Foundation, Inc., Scott Chalmers, City Arms East LLC, City Arms LLC, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC d.b.a. Eddy's Shooting Sports, Dmitri Danilevsky, Greg David, Firearms Policy Coalition, Ryan Goodrich, Roman Kaplan, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, Albert Lee Swann, Yan Traytel. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Lee, George) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 5/20/2020. Responses due by 5/22/2020. Replies due by 5/27/2020. Objections due by 5/29/2020.Total Time in Court: 1 hour 25 minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Hebel. Attachment: minute order. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/20/2020)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDERThe Court will allocate one hour for oral argument on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. ECF No. 20. Each side may argue for up to 30 minutes, including time spent answering questions from the Court. Each side will be allowed to make an opening and a rebuttal argument, with Plaintiffs going first. Any side wishing to save time for rebuttal should avoid using all its time during opening argument; the Court will not "reserve" time. Defendants should determine in advance how they will divide up their time among them or, alternatively, whether they will permit counsel for one of them to argue for all of them. Each side should also address the effect, if any, of the modified orders attached to Defendants' supplemental request for judicial notice, ECF No. 50, including whether supplemental briefing is required and whether this case is now moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 51 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING MAY 20, 2020 HEARING. This link is for public use only; the parties will receive personal invites to attend the hearing. Please use the options below to access the hearing. Important: Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Zoom webinar: When: May 20, 2020 02:00 PM Pacific Time (US and Canada) Topic: Altman et al v. County of Santa Clara et al Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/85710616565?pwd=UlFvaTRiSWNKWCtkeGpFV0RMc3NTdz09Password: 029287Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 Webinar ID: 857 1061 6565 Password: 029287 (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 50 Defendants' Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Sara Cody, County of Santa Clara, Jeffrey Rosen, Laurie Smith, City of Pacifica, California, Dan Steidle, County of Contra Costa, California, David Livingston, Chris Farnitano, City of Pleasant Hill, California, Bryan Hill, City of San Jose, California, Sam Liccardo, Edgardo Garcia, City of Mountain View, California, Max Bosel, County of Alameda, California, Gregory Ahern, Erica Pan, County of San Mateo, California, Carlos Bolanos and Scott Morrow. (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 5/19/2020) Modified on 5/20/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2020 Filing 49 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than May 19, 2020 by 2:00 PM.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.A notice with the dial in information will be posted for members of the public and press prior to the hearing.For important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 48 REPLY (re #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Preliminary Injunction ) filed byJanice Altman, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees Inc, California Gun Rights Foundation, Inc., Scott Chalmers, City Arms East LLC, City Arms LLC, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC d.b.a. Eddy's Shooting Sports, Dmitri Danilevsky, Greg David, Firearms Policy Coalition, Ryan Goodrich, Roman Kaplan, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, Albert Lee Swann, Yan Traytel. (Lee, George) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 47 Request for Judicial Notice re #46 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice filed bySara Cody, County of Santa Clara, Jeffrey Rosen, Laurie Smith. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 46 Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for a Preliminary Injunction (re #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Preliminary Injunction ) filed by Sara Cody, County of Santa Clara, Jeffrey Rosen, Laurie Smith, City of Pacifica, California, Dan Steidle, County of Contra Costa, California, David Livingston, Chris Farnitano, City of Pleasant Hill, California, Bryan Hill, City of San Jose, California, Sam Liccardo, Edgardo Garcia, City of Mountain View, California, Max Bosel, County of Alameda, California, Gregory Ahern, Erica Pan, County of San Mateo, California, Carlos Bolanos and Scott Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Armando Espitia, #2 Declaration Declaration of Bryan Hill, #3 Declaration Declaration of Chris Farnitano, M.D., #4 Declaration Declaration of Colby Staysa, #5 Declaration Declaration of Dan Steidle with Exhibit A, #6 Declaration Declaration of Erica Pan, M.D. with Exhibits A, B, C, #7 Declaration Declaration of George W. Rutherford, M.D., #8 Declaration Declaration of Jenna McAlpin, #9 Declaration Declaration of Neil Valenzuela, #10 Declaration Declaration of Robert Imobersteg, #11 Declaration Declaration of Sara H. Cody, M.D. with Exhibits A, B, C, #12 Declaration Declaration of Scott Morrow, M.D. with Exhibits A, B)(Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 5/1/2020) Modified on 5/4/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Krishan Singh Chopra (Chopra, Krishan) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Meredith Kieschnick (Kieschnick, Hannah) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 per order 43 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 5/1/2020. Replies due by 5/8/2020. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #42 Stipulation. A single consolidated opposition brief is due at 5 p.m. May 1, 2020. Plaintiffs' reply brief is due at 5 p.m. May 8, 2020. The hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction, ECF No. 20, is continued to May 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 21, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 37 Order,,, filed by Janice Altman, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees Inc, California Gun Rights Foundation, Inc., Scott Chalmers, City Arms East LLC, City Arms LLC, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC d.b.a. Eddy's Shooting Sports, Dmitri Danilevsky, Greg David, Firearms Policy Coalition, Ryan Goodrich, Roman Kaplan, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, Albert Lee Swann, Yan Traytel, County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith, Jeffrey Rosen, Sara Cody, City of Pacifica, California, Dan Steidle, County of Contra Costa, California, David Livingston, Chris Farnitano, City of Pleasant Hill, California, Bryan Hill, City of San Jose, California, Sam Liccardo, Edgardo Garcia, City of Mountain View, California, Max Bosel, County of Alameda, California, Gregory Ahern, Erica Pan, County of San Mateo, California, Carlos Bolanos, and Scott Morrow. (Lee, George) (Filed on 4/21/2020) Modified on 4/22/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Margo Laskowska (Laskowska, Margo) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 20, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Kristy L. van Herick and K. Scott Dickey. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 40 Notic e of Appearance filed by Erica Pan, County of Alameda, California, Gregory Ahern). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Krishan Chopra. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance E dward Bayer). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond L. MacKay for Defendants County of Alameda; Gregory Ahern and Erica Pan (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service PROOF OF SERVICE)(MacKay, Raymond) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Edward Bayer on behalf of Krishan Chopra, City Attorney (Bayer, Lance) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Edward Bayer (Bayer, Lance) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDERTo avoid duplication of argument and conserve the parties' and the Court's resources, the Court orders the parties to meet and confer regarding the filing of a single consolidated opposition brief to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. By 5:00 p.m. on April 21, 2020, the parties shall file a joint or competing proposals for such a brief, including its page length, as well as any resulting modifications to the length of Plaintiffs' reply brief. In their proposal(s), the parties may also request a continuance of up to one week for the briefing and hearing deadlines. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 4/18/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick L. Hurley (Hurley, Patrick) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Gene Tanaka (City of Pleasant Hill and Bryan Hill) (Tanaka, Gene) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Lawrence Geiger (Geiger, Thomas) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 33 ***DISREGARD. DUPLICATE OF DOCKET #32***NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Drake Siegel (Siegel, Kevin) (Filed on 4/17/2020) Modified on 4/20/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Drake Siegel (Siegel, Kevin) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 31 ***DISREGARD. DUPLICATE OF DOCKET #30*** NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Marchetta Kenyon (Kenyon, Michelle) (Filed on 4/17/2020) Modified on 4/20/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Marchetta Kenyon (Kenyon, Michelle) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Hoffman Trela (Trela, Sarah) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Todd McCloskey (McCloskey, Daniel) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Michael Press (Press, Douglas) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa R. Kiniyalocts (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 24 Declaration of George M. Lee in Support of #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Preliminary Injunction (Supplemental Declaration) filed byJanice Altman, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees Inc, California Gun Rights Foundation, Inc., Scott Chalmers, City Arms East LLC, City Arms LLC, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC d.b.a. Eddy's Shooting Sports, Dmitri Danilevsky, Greg David, Firearms Policy Coalition, Ryan Goodrich, Roman Kaplan, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, Albert Lee Swann, Yan Traytel. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Lee, George) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 13, 2020 Per Order #22 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 4/24/2020. Replies due by 5/1/2020. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERPlaintiffs have filed a notice of withdrawal of counsel and included a proposed order. ECF No. 18. Because Plaintiffs remain represented by other attorneys, the Court construes the notice as a Rule 5(1)(c)(2)(C) notice of change in counsel, which is effective without a court order. The Clerk is directed to remove John W. Dillon from the docket. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2020)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; SCHEDULING ORDER RE APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.Defendants' opposition is due April 24, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' reply is due May 1, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. A hearing will be held on May 13, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 10, 2020. (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe (DiGuiseppe, Raymond) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or in the Alternative, Preliminary Injunction filed by Janice Altman, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees Inc, California Gun Rights Foundation, Inc., Scott Chalmers, City Arms East LLC, City Arms LLC, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC d.b.a. Eddy's Shooting Sports, Dmitri Danilevsky, Greg David, Firearms Policy Coalition, Ryan Goodrich, Roman Kaplan, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, Albert Lee Swann, Yan Traytel. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Application/Motion, #2 Declaration of George M. Lee, #3 Declaration of Janice Altman, #4 Declaration of Michael Baryla, #5 Declaration of Scott Chalmers, #6 Declaration of Brandon Combs, #7 Declaration of Dmitriy Danilevsky, #8 Declaration of Gregory David, #9 Declaration of Ryan Goodrich, #10 Declaration of Alan Gottlieb, #11 Declaration of Gene Hoffman, #12 Declaration of Roman Kaplan, #13 Declaration of Josh Savani, #14 Declaration of Albert Lee Swann, #15 Declaration of Yan Traytel, #16 Proposed Order)(Lee, George) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants. Filed byGreg David, Ryan Goodrich, Janice Altman, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees Inc, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC d.b.a. Eddy's Shooting Sports, Second Amendment Foundation, National Rifle Association of America, Dmitri Danilevsky, Albert Lee Swann, City Arms LLC, California Gun Rights Foundation, Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, City Arms East LLC, Roman Kaplan, Yan Traytel, Scott Chalmers. (Lee, George) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 8, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #18 Notice (Other), filed by Albert Lee Swann, Firearms Policy Coalition, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC d.b.a. Eddy's Shooting Sports, City Arms LLC, California Gun Rights Foundation, Inc., National Rifle Association of America, Janice Altman, Greg David, Dmitri Danilevsky, Yan Traytel, Second Amendment Foundation, Ryan Goodrich, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees Inc, Roman Kaplan, City Arms East LLC (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Janice Altman, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees Inc, California Gun Rights Foundation, Inc., City Arms East LLC, City Arms LLC, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC d.b.a. Eddy's Shooting Sports, Dmitri Danilevsky, Greg David, Firearms Policy Coalition, Ryan Goodrich, Roman Kaplan, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, Albert Lee Swann, Yan Traytel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dillon, John) (Filed on 4/8/2020) Modified on 4/9/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Adam Kraut.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 4/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/2/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Adam Kraut ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14337551.) filed by Firearms Policy Coalition. (Kraut, Adam) (Filed on 4/2/2020) Modified on 4/3/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Caseload Rebalancing Judge no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 4/2/2020. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Janice Altman, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees Inc, California Gun Rights Foundation, Inc., City Arms East LLC, City Arms LLC, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC d.b.a. Eddy's Shooting Sports, Dmitri Danilevsky, Greg David, Firearms Policy Coalition, Ryan Goodrich, Roman Kaplan, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, Albert Lee Swann, Yan Traytel (Lee, George) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Janice Altman, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees Inc, California Gun Rights Foundation, Inc., City Arms East LLC, City Arms LLC, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC d.b.a. Eddy's Shooting Sports, Dmitri Danilevsky, Greg David, Firearms Policy Coalition, Ryan Goodrich, Roman Kaplan, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, Albert Lee Swann, Yan Traytel.. (Lee, George) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 4/1/2020. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/1/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/14/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lee, George) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14329470.). Filed byGreg David, Ryan Goodrich, Janice Altman, California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees Inc, Cuckoo Collectibles LLC d.b.a. Eddy's Shooting Sports, Second Amendment Foundation, National Rifle Association of America, Dmitri Danilevsky, Albert Lee Swann, City Arms LLC, California Gun Rights Foundation, Inc., Firearms Policy Coalition, City Arms East LLC, Roman Kaplan, Yan Traytel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, George) (Filed on 3/31/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altman et al v. County of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff David Livingston
Represented By: Thomas Lawrence Geiger
Represented By: Patrick L. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Cody
Represented By: Melissa R. Kiniyalocts
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Douglas Michael Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgardo Garcia
Represented By: Margo Laskowska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Dan Steidle
Represented By: Kevin Drake Siegel
Represented By: Michelle Marchetta Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Liccardo
Represented By: Margo Laskowska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Melissa R. Kiniyalocts
Represented By: Hannah Meredith Kieschnick
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Douglas Michael Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Bosel
Represented By: Krishan Singh Chopra,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mountain View, California
Represented By: Lance Edward Bayer
Represented By: Krishan Singh Chopra,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Jose, California
Represented By: Margo Laskowska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Farnitano
Represented By: Thomas Lawrence Geiger
Represented By: Patrick L. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Scott Morrow
Represented By: Sarah Hoffman Trela
Represented By: Daniel Todd McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Pan
Represented By: Kevin Scott Dickey
Represented By: Clay J. Christianson
Represented By: Raymond L. MacKay
Represented By: Kristy L van Herick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Carlos Bolanos
Represented By: Sarah Hoffman Trela
Represented By: Daniel Todd McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda, California
Represented By: Kevin Scott Dickey
Represented By: Clay J. Christianson
Represented By: Kristy L van Herick
Represented By: Raymond L. MacKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pleasant Hill, California
Represented By: Gene Tanaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Rosen
Represented By: Melissa R. Kiniyalocts
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Douglas Michael Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa, California
Represented By: Thomas Lawrence Geiger
Represented By: Patrick L. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Smith
Represented By: Melissa R. Kiniyalocts
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Douglas Michael Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Hill
Represented By: Gene Tanaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Ahern
Represented By: Kevin Scott Dickey
Represented By: Clay J. Christianson
Represented By: Raymond L. MacKay
Represented By: Kristy L van Herick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo, California
Represented By: Sarah Hoffman Trela
Represented By: Daniel Todd McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pacifica, California
Represented By: Kevin Drake Siegel
Represented By: Michelle Marchetta Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Lee Swann
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firearms Policy Coalition
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Adam Jeremy Kraut
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Kaplan
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Altman
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Gun Rights Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Arms LLC
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Goodrich
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Association of Federal Firearms Licensees Inc
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yan Traytel
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Arms East LLC
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dmitri Danilevsky
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg David
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Rifle Association of America
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuckoo Collectibles LLC d.b.a. Eddy's Shooting Sports
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: John William Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Chalmers
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?