Patel v. eHealth, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jigneshkumar Patel
Defendant: Derek N Yung, David K Francis, Scott N Flanders, eHealth, Inc., David K. Francis, Scott N. Flanders and Derek N. Yung
Case Number: 4:2020cv02395
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 45 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. YOU ARE NOTIFIED THAT a Case Management Conference is set for 3/30/2021 02:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2021 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 7/23/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 43 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Yacob Chernet. Responses due by 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Laurence M. Rosen, #2 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR ANTICIPATED MOTION(S) TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #41 Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2020. Replies due by 1/22/2021. Responses due by 12/23/2020.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Filing Amended Complaint and Briefing Schedule for Anticipated Motion(s) to Dismiss filed by Billy White, Jigneshkumar B. Patel, eHealth, Inc., Scott N. Flanders, Derek N. Yung, and David K. Francis. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 7/1/2020) Modified on 7/2/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2020 Filing 40 ADR Remark: ECF No. 38 Non-Compliance of Court Order ISSUED IN ERROR. Per ECF No. #15 The CMC and the deadlines in the April 10 Order for the filing of a joint casemanagement statement, a Rule 26(f) report, Rule 26(a) disclosures, and ADR selectionprocedures are vacated pending the appointment of a lead plaintiff and the filing ofa consolidated amended complaint. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF BILLY WHITE FOR: (1) CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS; (2) APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF; AND (3) APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (19) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (19) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; terminating (24) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; terminating (24) Motion to Consolidate Cases; terminating (28) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 4:20-cv-02395-JST; granting (24) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (24) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 4:20-cv-02967-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 38 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 37 ERRATA re #36 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Billy White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McCall, Adam) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 36 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byBilly White. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions by George Lazopoulos re #28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 6/22/2020) Modified on 6/23/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2020 Filing 34 Statement of Non-Opposition to Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed byScott N. Flanders, David K. Francis, Derek N. Yung, eHealth, Inc.. (Birn, Jerome) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE by Jigneshkumar Patel re #24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Non-Opposition to Competing Motions (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Marc Apton on behalf of Billy White (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel . Responses due by 6/22/2020. Replies due by 6/29/2020. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 8, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Documents #25, #28, #29, #30 and #31 also listed case number 4:20-cv-02967-JST. If it is intended to be applied to that case, please e- file in that case also. If the document is not applicable to that case, DO NOT include that case number on the document Re: #29 Declaration in Support, filed by George Lazopoulos, #28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by George Lazopoulos, #30 Certificate of Counsel filed by George Lazopoulos, #25 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Jigneshkumar Patel, #31 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by George Lazopoulos (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by George Lazopoulos re #28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Laurence Matthew Rosen on behalf of George Lazopoulos (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 29 Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen in Support of #28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byGeorge Lazopoulos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Cert., #3 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by George Lazopoulos. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 8/5/2020. Replies due by 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Whitney E. Street on behalf of Jigneshkumar Patel (Street, Whitney) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Jacob Allen Walker on behalf of Jigneshkumar Patel (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jigneshkumar Patel (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jigneshkumar Patel. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 6/22/2020. Replies due by 6/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jacob A. Walker with Exhibits)(Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Billy White (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Adam Christopher McCall on behalf of Billy White (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 21 Declaration of Adam C. McCall in Support of #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #20 Brief, filed byBilly White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #3 Exhibit C - Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #19 , #20 ) (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 20 Brief re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Memorandum in Support of Billy White's Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byBilly White. (Related document(s) #19 ) (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Billy White. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 6/22/2020. Replies due by 6/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCall, Adam) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RELATING CASE 20-cv-02395-JST to 20-cv-02967-RS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 28, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/18/2020. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott N. Flanders, David K. Francis, Derek N. Yung, eHealth, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Argonaut Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc., Other Affiliate Hudson Insurance Company, Other Affiliate RLI Corp., Other Affiliate Chubb Specialty Insurance, Other Affiliate FMR, LLC, Other Affiliate AXIS Insurance, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate AIG/National Union Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Beazley Insurance Company, Inc., Other Affiliate CNA Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Old Republic Insurance Company for David K. Francis, Derek N. Yung, Scott N. Flanders, eHealth, Inc.. and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Statement (Birn, Jerome) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #13 Stipulation Regarding Response to Complaint.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 11, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials JST immediately after the case number. Re: #15 O rder on Stipulation, #14 Declaration in Support, filed by David K. Francis, eHealth, Inc., Derek N. Yung, Scott N. Flanders, #12 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by David K. Francis, eHealth, Inc., Derek N. Yung, Scott N. Flanders (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #12 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by David K. Francis, eHealth, Inc., Derek N. Yung, Scott N. Flanders (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Catherine E. Moreno in Support of #13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Response to Complaint filed byScott N. Flanders, David K. Francis, Derek N. Yung, eHealth, Inc.. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Moreno, Catherine) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Response to Complaint filed by Scott N. Flanders, David K. Francis, Derek N. Yung, eHealth, Inc. and Jigneshkumar B. Patel. (Birn, Jerome) (Filed on 5/11/2020) Modified on 5/12/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott N. Flanders, David K. Francis, Derek N. Yung, eHealth, Inc. (Birn, Jerome) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome F. Birn, Jr Catherine E. Moreno, Dylan G. Savage, Elizabeth R. Gavin (Birn, Jerome) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Publication of PSLRA Notice Pursuant to Local Rule 23-1(a) by Jigneshkumar Patel (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 4/20/2020) Modified on 4/21/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Scott N Flanders, David K Francis, Derek N Yung, eHealth, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 Corrected Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jigneshkumar Patel. Amendment to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 ***DISREGARD. INCORRECT ORDER. SEE DOCKET #8 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020) Modified on 4/10/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 ***DISREGARD. ERROR ON PDF. SEE DOCKET #9 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT*** Summons Issued as to Scott N Flanders, David K Francis, Derek N Yung, eHealth, Inc.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020) Modified on 4/13/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney E. Street (Street, Whitney) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14355983.). Filed by Jigneshkumar Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Jacob) (Filed on 4/8/2020) Modified on 4/10/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. eHealth, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek N Yung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David K Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott N Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eHealth, Inc.
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Gavin
Represented By: Catherine Eugenia Moreno
Represented By: Jerome F. Birn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David K. Francis
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Gavin
Represented By: Catherine Eugenia Moreno
Represented By: Jerome F. Birn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott N. Flanders
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Gavin
Represented By: Catherine Eugenia Moreno
Represented By: Jerome F. Birn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek N. Yung
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose Gavin
Represented By: Catherine Eugenia Moreno
Represented By: Jerome F. Birn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jigneshkumar Patel
Represented By: Whitney E. Street
Represented By: Jacob Allen Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?