Baumgartner et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lucretia Walton, Denise Key, Leroy Fields, Robert Ysais, Ronald Neal, Sergio Deoliveira, Daniel Pate, Miguel Bengochea, Jonathan Ramos, Willie Matlock, Dana Brewer, Michael Dove, Michael Stanley, Dushon Brent, Walter Weeks, Wesley Peake, Jr., Marconei Desouza, Daniel Leary, Troy Baumgartner, Shamar Gunn, Howard Dalley, Latanya Richardson, Joey Trujillo, Edwin Brandon and James Evans
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv02446
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #11 Stipulation to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Purposes.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance on Behalf of Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc. by Joshua Eugene Anderson (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 6/5/2020) Modified on 6/8/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Baumgartner Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 6/5/2020) Modified on 6/8/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATING CASE 20-cv-02446-SK to 18-cv-06972-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 29, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Leroy Fields, Michael Stanley, Sergio Deoliveira, Daniel Pate, Miguel Bengochea, Joey Trujillo, Troy Baumgartner, Wesley Peake, Jr, Lucretia Walton, Ronald Neal, Denise Key, Robert Ysais, Howard Dalley, Edwin Brandon, Michael Dove, Shamar Gunn, Latanya Richardson, Daniel Leary, Willie Matlock, Marconei Desouza, Dushon Brent, Walter Weeks, Jonathan Ramos, James Evans, Dana Brewer. Service waived by All Defendants. (Drakulich, Robert) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/15/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gilead Sciences, Inc. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/24/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Drakulich, Robert) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14361345.). Filed byLeroy Fields, Michael Stanley, Sergio Deoliveira, Daniel Pate, Miguel Bengochea, Joey Trujillo, Troy Baumgartner, Wesley Peake, Jr, Lucretia Walton, Ronald Neal, Denise Key, Robert Ysais, Howard Dalley, Edwin Brandon, Michael Dove, Shamar Gunn, Latanya Richardson, Daniel Leary, Willie Matlock, Marconei Desouza, Dushon Brent, Walter Weeks, Jonathan Ramos, James Evans, Dana Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drakulich, Robert) (Filed on 4/10/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baumgartner et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucretia Walton
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Key
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Fields
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ysais
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Neal
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Deoliveira
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Pate
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Bengochea
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Ramos
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Matlock
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Brewer
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dove
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stanley
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dushon Brent
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Weeks
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Peake, Jr.
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marconei Desouza
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Leary
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Baumgartner
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamar Gunn
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Dalley
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latanya Richardson
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Trujillo
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Brandon
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Evans
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?