Hunt v. The Vail Corporation
Plaintiff: Brian Hunt, Dan Kodama and Michael Odell
Defendant: Vail Corporation, The Vail Corporation, Beecher Carlson Insurance, LLC, United Specialty Insurance Co., American Claims Management and The Vail Corporation doing business as Vail Resorts Management Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv02463
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 17 MDL ORDER DEEMING MOTION TO TRANSFER WITHDRAWN. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond filed by Brian Hunt, Dan Kodama, Michael Odell, American Claims Management, Beecher Carlson Insurance, LLC, United Specialty Insurance Co. (Krivoshey, Yeremey) (Filed on 5/28/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 Amended NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant The Vail Corporation by Brian Hunt, Dan Kodama, Michael Odell. (Scott, Brittany) (Filed on 5/22/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant The Vail Corporation by Brian Hunt, Dan Kodama (Scott, Brittany) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dan Kodama, Brian Hunt, Michael Odell. The Vail Corporation served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Scott, Brittany) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/30/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to American Claims Management, Beecher Carlson Insurance, LLC, United Specialty Insurance Co. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Scott, Brittany) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against The Vail Corporation, American Claims Management, Beecher Carlson Insurance, LLC, United Specialty Insurance Co. Filed by Brian Hunt, Dan Kodama, Michael Odell. (Scott, Brittany) (Filed on 4/29/2020) Modified on 4/30/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 4/16/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brian Hunt.. (Scott, Brittany) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendant The Vail Corporation. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 11, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/27/2020. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Scott, Brittany) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendant The Vail Corporation, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14364237). Filed by Brian Hunt. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, Brittany) (Filed on 4/10/2020) Modified on 4/13/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. The Vail Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hunt
Represented By: Brittany Skye Scott
Represented By: Yeremey O. Krivoshey
Represented By: Scott A. Bursor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Kodama
Represented By: Brittany Skye Scott
Represented By: Yeremey O. Krivoshey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Odell
Represented By: Brittany Skye Scott
Represented By: Yeremey O. Krivoshey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vail Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vail Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beecher Carlson Insurance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Claims Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vail Corporation doing business as Vail Resorts Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?