Navarrette v. 5 - Keys Charter School et al
Plaintiff: Tomas Navarrette
Defendant: State of California (CalTrans), 5 - Keys Charter School and Butte County
Case Number: 4:2020cv02579
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 4/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/21/20. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2020: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 5/22/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 Letter from Tomas Navarrette. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 5 - Keys Charter School, Butte County, State of California (CalTrans). Filed by Tomas Navarrette. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarrette v. 5 - Keys Charter School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California (CalTrans)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 - Keys Charter School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butte County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Navarrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?