IN RE PLAID INC. PRIVACY LITIGATION
Plaintiff: James Cottle, Frederick Schoeneman, Logan Mitchell, Caroline Anderson, Nicholas Yeomelakis, Rachel Curtis, Jordan Sacks, Jeffrey Umali, David Evans, Alexis Mullen and Gabriel Sotelo
Defendant: Plaid Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Adam Smotkin, Patrick Lenahen, Steven Hannigan, Alexa Grossman, Carrie Anderson, Oswaldo Herrera, Jeffrey Schwedock, Mallory Grossman and Brian McCrudden
Case Number: 4:2020cv03056
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Caroline Anderson, James Cottle, Rachel Curtis, David Evans, Logan Mitchell, Alexis Mullen, Jordan Sacks, Frederick Schoeneman, Gabriel Sotelo, Jeffrey Umali, Nicholas Yeomelakis, Plaid Inc. (Kennedy, Shawn) (Filed on 10/5/2020) Modified on 10/6/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2020 01:30 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded th at photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2020 01:30 PM. (Related documents(s) #58 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #90 Stipulation extending time: The parties Initial Disclosures and Joint Rule 26(f) Report will be due on 10/5/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time For Initial Disclosures filed by Plaid Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying #83 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Signed on 9/25/2020.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #83 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference ) filed byCaroline Anderson, James Cottle, Rachel Curtis, David Evans, Logan Mitchell, Alexis Mullen, Jordan Sacks, Frederick Schoeneman, Gabriel Sotelo, Jeffrey Umali, Nicholas Yeomelakis. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn M. Kennedy, #2 Proposed Order)(Geman, Rachel) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #85 Garrett D. Blanchfield's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #84 Rhea Ghosh's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14946344.) filed by Caroline Anderson, Brian McCrudden, Jeffrey Schwedock. (Blanchfield, Garrett) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Rhea Ghosh ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14942133.) filed by Caroline Anderson, James Cottle, Rachel Curtis, David Evans, Logan Mitchell, Alexis Mullen, Jordan Sacks, Frederick Schoeneman, Gabriel Sotelo, Jeffrey Umali, Nicholas Yeomelakis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ghosh, Rhea) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Plaid Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Dettmer in Support of Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management Conference, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management Conference)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 [Proposed] Order #81 Request for Judicial Notice re #78 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support, by Plaid Inc. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 9/14/2020) Modified on 9/15/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Request for Judicial Notice re #78 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support filed byPlaid Inc.. (Related document(s) #78 ) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Proposed Order re #78 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support by Plaid Inc.. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Declaration of ETHAN D. DETTMER in Support of #78 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support filed byPlaid Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #78 ) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Plaid Inc.. Responses due by 11/13/2020. Replies due by 12/4/2020. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Change of Address by Aaron M. Sheanin (Sheanin, Aaron) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Notice of Withdrawal of Madeline M. Gomez by Melissa Ann Gardner. (Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 9/14/2020) Modified on 9/14/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #74 Stipulation for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed on 9/11/2020.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Plaid Inc. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 9/8/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu Granting #67 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Michael E. Criden.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu Granting #66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Lindsey C. Grossman.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu Granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Diana J. Zinser.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu Granting #64 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Jeffrey L. Spector.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu Granting #63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Jeffrey L. Kodroff.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu Granting #62 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re William G. Caldes.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) Modified on 8/10/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Michael E. Criden ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14787323.) filed by Rachel Curtis, Alexis Mullen, Jordan Sacks, Nicholas Yeomelakis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Criden, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Lindsey C. Grossman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14787195.) filed by Rachel Curtis, Alexis Mullen, Jordan Sacks, Nicholas Yeomelakis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Grossman, Lindsey) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14786401.) filed by Carrie Anderson, Brian McCrudden, Jeffrey Schwedock. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zinser, Diana) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14786398.) filed by Carrie Anderson, Brian McCrudden, Jeffrey Schwedock. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Spector, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14786393.) filed by Carrie Anderson, Brian McCrudden, Jeffrey Schwedock. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kodroff, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14786387.) filed by Carrie Anderson, Brian McCrudden, Jeffrey Schwedock. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Caldes, William) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DECLARATORY AND EQUITABLE RELIEF (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) by Carrie Anderson, James Cottle, Rachel Curtis, David Evans, Logan Mitchell, Alexis Mullen, Jordan Sacks, Frederick Schoeneman, Nicholas Yeomelakis, Gabriel Sotelo, Jeffrey Umali. Amendment to #1 Complaint. (Kennedy, Shawn) (Filed on 8/5/2020) Modified on 8/6/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #59 Matthew J. Geyer's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Geyer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14757869.) filed by Logan Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Geyer, Matthew) (Filed on 7/31/2020) Modified on 8/4/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #54 Administrative Motion to continue the Initial Case Management Conference: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2020 01:30 PM is continued to 10/7/2020 01:30 PM. The court may further continue this date as appropriate based on Defendant's response to the Consolidated Amended Complaint. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS AND PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 (AS MODIFIED): Within one week of this Order (by 8/5/2020), Plaintiffs shall jointly file a Consolidated Amended Complaint in Cottle et al v. Plaid, No. 4:20-cv-03056-DMR. All papers previously filed and served in any of the actions: 3:20-cv-4230; 4:20-4344; and 3:20-4480 are deemed part of the record in Cottle v. Plaid, No. 4:20-cv-03056-DMR. All papers hereafter filed in the Consolidated Action shall bear the following Caption: IN RE PLAID INC. PRIVACY LITIGATION Master Docket No. 4:20-cv-03056-DMR. See Order for more particulars. Motions terminated: ( #51 in 4:20-cv-03056-DMR) Stipulation with Proposed Order to Consolidate Actions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/29/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RELATING CASES: 3:20-cv-04230-SK Mitchell v. Plaid Inc.; 4:20-cv-04344-DMR Curtis, et al v. Plaid Inc.; 3:20-cv-04480-JSC Anderson, et al v. Plaid Inc.; and 3:20-cv-04804-JSC Evans, et al v. Plaid Inc. are all related to 4:20-cv-03056-DMR Cottle, et al v. Plaid Inc. Motions terminated: #42 Motion to Relate Case; #37 , #49 and #52 Administrative Motions to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/29/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020) Modified on 7/29/2020 (ig, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #54 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to continue Case Management Conference re #10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines ) filed byPlaid Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to continue Case Management Conference re #10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines filed by James Cottle, Frederick Schoeneman. Responses due by 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn M. Kennedy, #2 Proposed Order)(Geman, Rachel) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #52 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related ) filed byPlaid Inc.. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Carrie Anderson, James Cottle, Logan Mitchell, Frederick Schoeneman. Responses due by 7/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jon Tostrud, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint in Cottle v. Plaid, No. 20-cv-3056, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint in Evans v. Plaid, No. 20-cv-4804, #4 Proposed Order)(Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Consolidate Actions and Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed by Carrie Anderson, James Cottle, Logan Mitchell, Frederick Schoeneman, Plaid Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel Geman, #2 Declaration of Shawn M. Kennedy, #3 Declaration of Christopher J. Cormier, #4 Proposed Order)(Geman, Rachel) (Filed on 7/17/2020) Modified on 7/20/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #49 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related ) filed byPlaid Inc.. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Carrie Anderson. Responses due by 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Hartley, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint in Cottle v. Plaid, No. 20-cv-3056, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint in Anderson v. Plaid; No. 20-cv-4480, #4 Proposed Order)(Hartley, Jason) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (James Cottle) (Kennedy, Shawn) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Frederick Schoeneman) (Kennedy, Shawn) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Case caption and case number is blank. [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #45 ADR Cer tification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options filed by James Cottle, #46 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options filed by Frederick Schoeneman. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Frederick Schoeneman (Kennedy, Shawn) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options James Cottle (Kennedy, Shawn) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #42 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byPlaid Inc.. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Relate Case filed by James Cottle, Logan Mitchell, Frederick Schoeneman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Coll, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/8/2020) Modified on 7/8/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re: #37 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Logan Mitchell: The court has reviewed the motion to consider case relation and Defendant's non-opposition thereto. As the motion to relate cases is impacted by the issue of the parties consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction in Case No. 20-4230 SK, the court will rule on the motion once the parties have appeared in that case and made a decision on magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/2/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Cormier (Cormier, Christopher) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #37 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related ) filed byPlaid Inc.. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Document #38 also listed case number 3:20-cv-04230-SK. If it is intended to be applied to that case, please e-file in that case also . If the document is not applicable to that case, DO NOT include that case number on the document. Re: #38 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Plaid Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #37 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related ) filed byPlaid Inc.. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Logan Mitchell. Responses due by 6/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Sheanin In Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Aaron Sheanin, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Aaron Sheanin, #4 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion To Relate Cases)(Sheanin, Aaron) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #35 Stipulation extending time to respond to complaint and setting briefing schedule. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Plaid Inc., James Cottle, Frederick Schoeneman. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/26/2020) Modified on 5/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Plaid Inc... (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Jada Hodge (Hodge, Ashley) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #31 Alexander H. Southwell's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Alexander H. Southwell (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14494423) filed by Plaid Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service of Good Standing)(Southwell, Alexander) (Filed on 5/21/2020) Modified on 5/22/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Doc Bedel (Bedel, Anthony) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Augus Barrera (Barrera, Abigail) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities by Plaid Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Visa, Inc., Other Affiliate Spark Capital II, L.P., Other Affiliate New Enterprise Associates, Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs Investment Partners, Other Affiliate Zach Perret and William Hockey for Plaid Inc. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/21/2020) Modified on 5/22/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan D. Dettmer (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Cottle, Frederick Schoeneman of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Plaid Inc. (Hembd, Bret) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #17 Madeline Gomez's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #16 Rachel Geman's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #14 Charles Jacob Gower's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #13 Russell Herman's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #12 Christopher J. Cormier's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #11 Warren T. Burns's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ann Gardner (Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Sobol (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Madeline M. Gomez (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14447718) filed by James Cottle, Frederick Schoeneman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gomez, Madeline) (Filed on 5/7/2020) Modified on 5/8/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Rachel Geman (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14447014.) Filing fee previously paid on 05/07/2020 filed by James Cottle, Frederick Schoeneman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Geman, Rachel) (Filed on 5/7/2020) Modified on 5/8/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Cottle, Frederick Schoeneman.. (Herrera, Nicomedes) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Charles Jacob Gower (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-14444208) filed by James Cottle, Frederick Schoeneman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gower, Charles) (Filed on 5/6/2020) Modified on 5/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Russell Herman (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14444170) filed by James Cottle, Frederick Schoeneman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Herman, Russell) (Filed on 5/6/2020) Modified on 5/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Cormier (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14444110) filed by James Cottle, Frederick Schoeneman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cormier, Christopher) (Filed on 5/6/2020) Modified on 5/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Warren T. Burns (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-14444078) filed by James Cottle, Frederick Schoeneman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burns, Warren) (Filed on 5/6/2020) Modified on 5/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Plaid Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Purdy as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Purdy, Andrew) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/19/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura E Seidl (Seidl, Laura) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bret Douglas Hembd for Plaintiffs (Hembd, Bret) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by James Cottle, Frederick Schoeneman (Herrera, Nicomedes) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicomedes Sy Herrera for Plaintiffs (Herrera, Nicomedes) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Kennedy, Shawn) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Plaid Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-14437197.). Filed by James Cottle, Frederick Schoeneman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Shawn) (Filed on 5/4/2020) Modified on 5/5/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE PLAID INC. PRIVACY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaid Inc.
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Alexander H. Southwell
Represented By: Abigail Augus Barrera
Represented By: Anthony Doc Bedel
Represented By: Ashley Jada Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cottle
Represented By: Nicomedes Sy Herrera
Represented By: Bret Douglas Hembd
Represented By: Shawn M. Kennedy
Represented By: Russell G Herman
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Melissa Ann Gardner
Represented By: Andrew Michael Purdy
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Christopher Cormier
Represented By: Madeline Michelle Gomez
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Represented By: Laura E Seidl
Represented By: Rebecca Coll
Represented By: Rhea Ghosh
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Schoeneman
Represented By: Nicomedes Sy Herrera
Represented By: Bret Douglas Hembd
Represented By: Shawn M. Kennedy
Represented By: Russell G Herman
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Melissa Ann Gardner
Represented By: Andrew Michael Purdy
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Christopher Cormier
Represented By: Madeline Michelle Gomez
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Charles Jacob Gower
Represented By: Laura E Seidl
Represented By: Rebecca Coll
Represented By: Rhea Ghosh
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Mitchell
Represented By: Christopher Cormier
Represented By: Aaron M. Sheanin
Represented By: Melissa Ann Gardner
Represented By: Rebecca Coll
Represented By: Rhea Ghosh
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Matthew James Geyer
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Anderson
Represented By: Nicomedes Sy Herrera
Represented By: Russell G Herman
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Melissa Ann Gardner
Represented By: Andrew Michael Purdy
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Christopher Cormier
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Shawn M. Kennedy
Represented By: Rhea Ghosh
Represented By: Garrett D. Blanchfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Yeomelakis
Represented By: Melissa Ann Gardner
Represented By: James Andrew Quadra
Represented By: Rhea Ghosh
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Caryn Grossman
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Rebecca Coll
Represented By: Michael Elliot Criden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Curtis
Represented By: Melissa Ann Gardner
Represented By: James Andrew Quadra
Represented By: Rhea Ghosh
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Caryn Grossman
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Rebecca Coll
Represented By: Michael Elliot Criden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Sacks
Represented By: Melissa Ann Gardner
Represented By: James Andrew Quadra
Represented By: Rhea Ghosh
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Caryn Grossman
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Rebecca Coll
Represented By: Michael Elliot Criden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Umali
Represented By: Nicomedes Sy Herrera
Represented By: Russell G Herman
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Melissa Ann Gardner
Represented By: Andrew Michael Purdy
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Christopher Cormier
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Shawn M. Kennedy
Represented By: Laura E Seidl
Represented By: Rhea Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Evans
Represented By: Melissa Ann Gardner
Represented By: Rhea Ghosh
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Represented By: Lee Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Mullen
Represented By: Melissa Ann Gardner
Represented By: Rhea Ghosh
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Lindsey Caryn Grossman
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Rebecca Coll
Represented By: Michael Elliot Criden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Sotelo
Represented By: Nicomedes Sy Herrera
Represented By: Bret Douglas Hembd
Represented By: Russell G Herman
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Melissa Ann Gardner
Represented By: Andrew Michael Purdy
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Christopher Cormier
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Shawn M. Kennedy
Represented By: Laura E Seidl
Represented By: Rhea Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Adam Smotkin
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Represented By: Lee Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Patrick Lenahen
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Represented By: Lee Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Steven Hannigan
Represented By: James Andrew Quadra
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Rebecca Coll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alexa Grossman
Represented By: James Andrew Quadra
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Rebecca Coll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Carrie Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kodroff
Represented By: Diana Janik Zinser
Represented By: Jason Scott Hartley
Represented By: William G. Caldes
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Spector
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Oswaldo Herrera
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Represented By: Lee Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jeffrey Schwedock
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kodroff
Represented By: Diana Janik Zinser
Represented By: Jason Scott Hartley
Represented By: Jason Michael Lindner
Represented By: William G. Caldes
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Spector
Represented By: Garrett D. Blanchfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mallory Grossman
Represented By: James Andrew Quadra
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Represented By: Rebecca Coll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brian McCrudden
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kodroff
Represented By: Diana Janik Zinser
Represented By: Jason Scott Hartley
Represented By: Jason Michael Lindner
Represented By: William G. Caldes
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Spector
Represented By: Garrett D. Blanchfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?