Verch v. Six Foods LLC
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Defendant: Six Foods LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv03458
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyrights (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Transfer Order)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the Eastern District of New York, Case No. 1:20-cv-2053-ENV-RER. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02053. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 5/19/2020. (Almonte, Giselle)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT TRANSFER ORDER: This case is hereby transferred to the Northern District of California. So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 5/19/2020. (Almonte, Giselle)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Lloyd Brown on behalf of Six Foods LLC (aty to be noticed) (Brown, Christopher)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION to transfer Venue by Marco Verch (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Six Foods LLC. (Sica, Michele) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/6/2020) (Sica, Michele).
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Sica, Michele)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Sica, Michele)
May 6, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Sica, Michele)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Six Foods LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12758051 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Marco Verch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verch v. Six Foods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Foods LLC
Represented By: Christopher Lloyd Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?