Benjamin v. United States
Plaintiff: Lawrence Benjamin
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 4:2020cv03463
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lawrence Benjamin (Marks, Lia) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States. Filed byLawrence Benjamin. (Marks, Lia) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lawrence Benjamin.. (Marks, Lia) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/4/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 FEE PAID (Filing fee$400,receipt number 0971-14494819). (Marks, Lia) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Clerk is unable to randomly assigned case to judge due to lack of filing fee payment. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil &g t; Other Documents & New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Re: #1 Complaint filed by Lawrence Benjamin. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages with jury demand against All Defendants. (no process) Filed by Lawrence Benjamin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Marks, Lia) (Filed on 5/21/2020) Modified on 5/22/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Benjamin
Represented By: Lia Trelease Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?