Vernet v. The We Company et al
Plaintiff: Malakyar Vernet
Defendant: Bruce Dunlevie, Lewis Frankfort, John Zhao, SoftBank Group Corp., Adam Neumann, Ronald D. Fisher, Michael Gross, Arthur Minson, The We Company, M. Steven Langman and Mark Schwartz
Case Number: 4:2020cv03686
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL AND ESTABLISHING A SCHEDULE FOR CONSOLIDATING COMPLAINTS AND ANSWERING OR RESPONDING filed by Malakyar Vernet, John Zhao, The We Company, Mark Schwartz, Adam Neumann, Arthur Minson, M. Steven Langman, Michael Gross, Lewis Frankfort, Ronald D. Fisher, Bruce Dunlevie. (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 7/28/2020) Modified on 7/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Malakyar Vernet (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Telephonic Case Management Conference has been set for September 8, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by September 1, 2020. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:20-cv-03686-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020) Modified on 7/22/2020 to remove courtroom info (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 7/21/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The We Company.. (Aasen, Courtney) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #14 Motion to Relate Case. In light of the order relating cases, the Court TERMINATES #15 Stipulation to relate cases. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney C. Aasen (Aasen, Courtney) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 16 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL AND ESTABLISHING A SCHEDULE FOR CONSOLIDATING COMPLAINTS AND ANSWERING OR RESPONDING filed by Malakyar Vernet, The We Company, Mark Schwartz, Adam Neuman, Arthur Minson, M Steven Langman, Michael Gross, Lewis Frankfort, Ronald D. Fisher, Bruce Dunievie and John Zhao. (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 7/10/2020) Modified on 7/13/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2020 Filing 15 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #14 MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by Malakyar Vernet, John Zhao, The We Company, Mark Schwartz, Adam Neuman, Arthur Minson, M. Steven Langman, Michael Gross, Lewis Frankfort, Ronald D. Fisher, and Bruce Dunievie. (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 7/10/2020) Modified on 7/13/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by Malakyar Vernet. (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 7/10/2020) Modified on 7/13/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Defendant The We Company's Deadline to Respond to the Complaint filed by The We Company and Malakyar Vernet. (Metlitzky, Warren) (Filed on 6/26/2020) Modified on 6/29/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren Metlitzky (Metlitzky, Warren) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Cassidy Davis (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan Carlos Sanchez (Sanchez, Juan) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on The We Company on 06/10/2020, filed by Malakyar Vernet. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Malakyar Vernet.. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bruce Dunlevie, Ronald D. Fisher, Lewis Frankfort, Michael Gross, M. Steven Langman, Arthur Minson, Adam Neumann, Mark Schwartz, SoftBank Group Corp., The We Company, John Zhao. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 #Electronic filing error Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Malakyar Vernet. Please correct errors on summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Pleas e re-file in its entirety. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/18/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Malakyar Vernet (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 ***REFILED AT DKT. #6 ***Proposed Summons. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/3/2020) Modified on 6/8/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/8/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Violations of the California Corporations Code against Bruce Dunlevie, Ronald D. Fisher, Lewis Frankfort, Michael Gross, M. Steven Langman, Arthur Minson, Adam Neumann, Mark Schwartz, SoftBank Group Corp., The We Company, John Zhao ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14535624.). Filed byMalakyar Vernet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/3/2020) Modified on 6/5/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vernet v. The We Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Dunlevie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Frankfort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Zhao
Represented By: Courtney C. Aasen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoftBank Group Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gross
Represented By: Courtney C. Aasen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Minson
Represented By: Courtney C. Aasen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The We Company
Represented By: Courtney C. Aasen
Represented By: Warren Metlitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Steven Langman
Represented By: Courtney C. Aasen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Schwartz
Represented By: Courtney C. Aasen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malakyar Vernet
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Represented By: Juan Carlos Sanchez
Represented By: Brian Edward Cochran
Represented By: Travis E. Downs, III
Represented By: Jason Cassidy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?