Goldfinger et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Douglas Alston, Noe Farias, Jr., Katherine Coleman, Michael S. Payne, Elliot C. Boose, Andrew Johnson, Aaron Nero, Keven Robinson, Christine Lawler, Deborah A. Smith, Arnoldo Albiar, David Alan Wilson, Thomas C. O'Brien, Wilson Alvarado, Peter McLoyd, Chuck Shelton, Daniel Melton, Kelvin Calloway, Eric Lund, Akintunde A. Funso, Norris Baylor, Robert E. Franklin, Coretha Allen, Levon Anderson, James Edward Musico, Charles Kemp, Matthew Zarna, Lisa Burton, Teresa Bowers, Anthony Nardella, Alicia Blunt, David Oliver, Demarcus Eades, Evron Day, John Wimpy, Terry Lee Conn, Sherry Barner, Billy Morris, David W. Keith, William Plumbtree, Anthony Ford, Vincent Lamar, Danny A. Brown, Clifton McDaniel, Jon S. Carroll, Frank Bermudez, Deanne Foster, Vincent Scott, Myreon D. Williams, Rachel Frank, Gregory Wayne Brown, Monica R. Davis, Kenneth Harper, Allen Ray Adams, John Poarch, David Neal Dodson, Charles W. Carter, Roane Henry, Janet L. Coleman, James Shannon Chesher, Harvey Prosser, Virginia Spires, Thomas Kahn, Vernetta Oakman, Jimmie Thornton, Louis Toth, Jr., Tisha A. Jones, Jimmie L. Thomas, John M. Sharp, Roderick A. Reed, Zondre Watson, Kevin Eugene Cobb, Charles Bynum, Joan Johnson, Curtis Brooks, Eric J. Armstrong, Jeffery L. Aitken, Leon Yoakum, Reggie Owens, Mary Lindeman, James Benedict Menard, William Steward, II, Michael E. Thomas, Larry Hayes, Rodney E. Stark, Sr., Juan Nunez, Gregory Pigram, Craig Lewis, Sr., Darryl Nettles, Madina Marie Parker, Jetta Cundiff, Richard J. Parker, Frankie Scinto, Stella Beatrice Blissett, Sharon Jones, Terrell Clark, Roy Chambers, Derek Cupp, Aaron Goldfinger, James H. Anderson, Gregory Jones, Sr., Debra Everett, Patricia Harris, Edward Barksdale, Rita Bailey, Rita Hamilton, Gerald Davis, Lawrence Raibon, Wanda Cooper, Devin White, Reginald Dominique, Jerome Wallace, Sr., Rhonda Franklin, Arthur Taylor, Michael Anthony Davis, Brenda Cook, Marcus Haynes, Stephanie Woodall-Wilson, Ricky Alan Lujan, Lisa E. Price, Jay F. Anderson, Necobra Saunders, Max Reina Nunez, David R. Price, Earthalee Howard, Deborah Casey, Jason A. Johnson, Joseph Andrew Clopton, Bryan King, Ledarre Zeigler, Gerald Lee Youde, Jay C. Fanning, Robert Bailey, Tavares Brand, Serge Ruzeck, Rasanna Dubose, Douglas Lee Morrow, Dante Pinnock, Pamela Ruth Franklin, Anthony Felder, Walter Byron Meador-Morales, Doug Milliken, Sojan Pennington, Steven Casada, Juan De La Rosa, Kai Broomes, George W. Tresch, Martin Scharff, Robert Morales, Dorian Dillard, Cecil J. Gaines, Randall Shook, Eddie L. Jones, Constance Woods, Jimmy D. Jones, Eric James Means, Jerry Randall Coleman, Christopher Holloway, Brian Conway, Lawrence Goodwin, Steven Martin, Charles Slider, Bobby Creamer, Frances Carty, Kerney Dwayne Cook, Sr., Larry Rigsby, Donovan E. Lee, Gerald Chambers, Arvella Walker, Corey Jamal Harris, Dennis Lee Freeland, Daniel Murray, Kendal Richardson, Shantara D. Mixon, Edward Williams, Kendra Johnson, Kimberly Thomas, Delephine Owens, Crystal R. Wilborn, Patrick Bedford, Michael Pratt, Michael Erby, Stanley Kirkland, Clarence Spears, Stanley Nazombe, Mary Mathis, William Johnson, James O'Hare, Cornell V. Green, Sr., Dylan Brown, James Keenan, Sadie Strong and David McGee
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04043
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to R. Allan Pixton.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Katrina Ashley.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Hilliard.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14754833.) filed by Allen Ray Adams, Jeffery L. Aitken, Arnoldo Albiar, Coretha Allen, Douglas Alston, Wilson Alvarado, James H. Anderson, Jay F. Anderson, Levon Anderson, Eric J. Armstrong, Rita Bailey, Robert Bailey, Edward Barksdale, Sherry Barner, Norris Baylor, Patrick Bedford, Frank Bermudez, Stella Beatrice Blissett, Alicia Blunt, Elliot C. Boose, Teresa Bowers, Tavares Brand, Curtis Brooks, Kai Broomes, Danny A. Brown, Dylan Brown, Gregory Wayne Brown, Lisa Burton, Charles Bynum, Kelvin Calloway, Jon S. Carroll, Charles W. Carter, Frances Carty, Steven Casada, Deborah Casey, Gerald Chambers, Roy Chambers, James Shannon Chesher, Terrell Clark, Joseph Andrew Clopton, Kevin Eugene Cobb, Janet L. Coleman, Jerry Randall Coleman, Katherine Coleman, Terry Lee Conn, Brian Conway, Brenda Cook, Kerney Dwayne Cook, Sr, Wanda Cooper, Bobby Creamer, Jetta Cundiff, Derek Cupp, Gerald Davis, Michael Anthony Davis, Monica R. Davis, Evron Day, Juan De La Rosa, Dorian Dillard, David Neal Dodson, Reginald Dominique, Rasanna Dubose, Demarcus Eades, Michael Erby, Debra Everett, Jay C. Fanning, Noe Farias, Jr, Anthony Felder, Anthony Ford, Deanne Foster, Rachel Frank, Pamela Ruth Franklin, Rhonda Franklin, Robert E. Franklin, Dennis Lee Freeland, Akintunde A. Funso, Cecil J. Gaines, Aaron Goldfinger, Lawrence Goodwin, Cornell V. Green, Sr, Rita Hamilton, Kenneth Harper, Corey Jamal Harris, Patricia Harris, Larry Hayes, Marcus Haynes, Roane Henry, Christopher Holloway, Earthalee Howard, Andrew Johnson, Jason A. Johnson, Joan Johnson, Kendra Johnson, William Johnson, Eddie L. Jones, Gregory Jones, Sr, Jimmy D. Jones, Sharon Jones, Tisha A. Jones, Thomas Kahn, James Keenan, David W. Keith, Charles Kemp, Bryan King, Stanley Kirkland, Vincent Lamar, Christine Lawler, Donovan E. Lee, Craig Lewis, Sr, Mary Lindeman, Ricky Alan Lujan, Eric Lund, Steven Martin, Mary Mathis, Clifton McDaniel, David McGee, Peter McLoyd, Walter Byron Meador-Morales, Eric James Means, Daniel Melton, James Benedict Menard, Doug Milliken, Shantara D. Mixon, Robert Morales, Billy Morris, Douglas Lee Morrow, Daniel Murray, James Edward Musico, Anthony Nardella, Stanley Nazombe, Aaron Nero, Darryl Nettles, Juan Nunez, Max Reina Nunez, Thomas C. O'Brien, James O'Hare, Vernetta Oakman, David Oliver, Delephine Owens, Reggie Owens, Madina Marie Parker, Richard J. Parker, Michael S. Payne, Sojan Pennington, Gregory Pigram, Dante Pinnock, William Plumbtree, John Poarch, Michael Pratt, David R. Price, Lisa E. Price, Harvey Prosser, Lawrence Raibon, Roderick A. Reed, Kendal Richardson, Larry Rigsby, Keven Robinson, Serge Ruzeck, Necobra Saunders, Martin Scharff, Frankie Scinto, Vincent Scott, John M. Sharp, Chuck Shelton, Randall Shook, Charles Slider, Deborah A. Smith, Clarence Spears, Virginia Spires, Rodney E. Stark, Sr, William Steward, II, Sadie Strong, Arthur Taylor, Jimmie L. Thomas, Kimberly Thomas, Michael E. Thomas, Jimmie Thornton, Louis Toth, Jr, George W. Tresch, Arvella Walker, Jerome Wallace, Sr, Zondre Watson, Devin White, Crystal R. Wilborn, Edward Williams, Myreon D. Williams, David Alan Wilson, John Wimpy, Stephanie Woodall-Wilson, Constance Woods, Leon Yoakum, Gerald Lee Youde, Matthew Zarna, Ledarre Zeigler. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14754821.) filed by Allen Ray Adams, Jeffery L. Aitken, Arnoldo Albiar, Coretha Allen, Douglas Alston, Wilson Alvarado, James H. Anderson, Jay F. Anderson, Levon Anderson, Eric J. Armstrong, Rita Bailey, Robert Bailey, Edward Barksdale, Sherry Barner, Norris Baylor, Patrick Bedford, Frank Bermudez, Stella Beatrice Blissett, Alicia Blunt, Elliot C. Boose, Teresa Bowers, Tavares Brand, Curtis Brooks, Kai Broomes, Danny A. Brown, Dylan Brown, Gregory Wayne Brown, Lisa Burton, Charles Bynum, Kelvin Calloway, Jon S. Carroll, Charles W. Carter, Frances Carty, Steven Casada, Deborah Casey, Gerald Chambers, Roy Chambers, James Shannon Chesher, Terrell Clark, Joseph Andrew Clopton, Kevin Eugene Cobb, Janet L. Coleman, Jerry Randall Coleman, Katherine Coleman, Terry Lee Conn, Brian Conway, Brenda Cook, Kerney Dwayne Cook, Sr, Wanda Cooper, Bobby Creamer, Jetta Cundiff, Derek Cupp, Gerald Davis, Michael Anthony Davis, Monica R. Davis, Evron Day, Juan De La Rosa, Dorian Dillard, David Neal Dodson, Reginald Dominique, Rasanna Dubose, Demarcus Eades, Michael Erby, Debra Everett, Jay C. Fanning, Noe Farias, Jr, Anthony Felder, Anthony Ford, Deanne Foster, Rachel Frank, Pamela Ruth Franklin, Rhonda Franklin, Robert E. Franklin, Dennis Lee Freeland, Akintunde A. Funso, Cecil J. Gaines, Aaron Goldfinger, Lawrence Goodwin, Cornell V. Green, Sr, Rita Hamilton, Kenneth Harper, Corey Jamal Harris, Patricia Harris, Larry Hayes, Marcus Haynes, Roane Henry, Christopher Holloway, Earthalee Howard, Andrew Johnson, Jason A. Johnson, Joan Johnson, Kendra Johnson, William Johnson, Eddie L. Jones, Gregory Jones, Sr, Jimmy D. Jones, Sharon Jones, Tisha A. Jones, Thomas Kahn, James Keenan, David W. Keith, Charles Kemp, Bryan King, Stanley Kirkland, Vincent Lamar, Christine Lawler, Donovan E. Lee, Craig Lewis, Sr, Mary Lindeman, Ricky Alan Lujan, Eric Lund, Steven Martin, Mary Mathis, Clifton McDaniel, David McGee, Peter McLoyd, Walter Byron Meador-Morales, Eric James Means, Daniel Melton, James Benedict Menard, Doug Milliken, Shantara D. Mixon, Robert Morales, Billy Morris, Douglas Lee Morrow, Daniel Murray, James Edward Musico, Anthony Nardella, Stanley Nazombe, Aaron Nero, Darryl Nettles, Juan Nunez, Max Reina Nunez, Thomas C. O'Brien, James O'Hare, Vernetta Oakman, David Oliver, Delephine Owens, Reggie Owens, Madina Marie Parker, Richard J. Parker, Michael S. Payne, Sojan Pennington, Gregory Pigram, Dante Pinnock, William Plumbtree, John Poarch, Michael Pratt, David R. Price, Lisa E. Price, Harvey Prosser, Lawrence Raibon, Roderick A. Reed, Kendal Richardson, Larry Rigsby, Keven Robinson, Serge Ruzeck, Necobra Saunders, Martin Scharff, Frankie Scinto, Vincent Scott, John M. Sharp, Chuck Shelton, Randall Shook, Charles Slider, Deborah A. Smith, Clarence Spears, Virginia Spires, Rodney E. Stark, Sr, William Steward, II, Sadie Strong, Arthur Taylor, Jimmie L. Thomas, Kimberly Thomas, Michael E. Thomas, Jimmie Thornton, Louis Toth, Jr, George W. Tresch, Arvella Walker, Jerome Wallace, Sr, Zondre Watson, Devin White, Crystal R. Wilborn, Edward Williams, Myreon D. Williams, David Alan Wilson, John Wimpy, Stephanie Woodall-Wilson, Constance Woods, Leon Yoakum, Gerald Lee Youde, Matthew Zarna, Ledarre Zeigler. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14754812.) filed by Allen Ray Adams, Jeffery L. Aitken, Arnoldo Albiar, Coretha Allen, Douglas Alston, Wilson Alvarado, James H. Anderson, Jay F. Anderson, Levon Anderson, Eric J. Armstrong, Rita Bailey, Robert Bailey, Edward Barksdale, Sherry Barner, Norris Baylor, Patrick Bedford, Frank Bermudez, Stella Beatrice Blissett, Alicia Blunt, Elliot C. Boose, Teresa Bowers, Tavares Brand, Curtis Brooks, Kai Broomes, Danny A. Brown, Dylan Brown, Gregory Wayne Brown, Lisa Burton, Charles Bynum, Kelvin Calloway, Jon S. Carroll, Charles W. Carter, Frances Carty, Steven Casada, Deborah Casey, Gerald Chambers, Roy Chambers, James Shannon Chesher, Terrell Clark, Joseph Andrew Clopton, Kevin Eugene Cobb, Janet L. Coleman, Jerry Randall Coleman, Katherine Coleman, Terry Lee Conn, Brian Conway, Brenda Cook, Kerney Dwayne Cook, Sr, Wanda Cooper, Bobby Creamer, Jetta Cundiff, Derek Cupp, Gerald Davis, Michael Anthony Davis, Monica R. Davis, Evron Day, Juan De La Rosa, Dorian Dillard, David Neal Dodson, Reginald Dominique, Rasanna Dubose, Demarcus Eades, Michael Erby, Debra Everett, Jay C. Fanning, Noe Farias, Jr, Anthony Felder, Anthony Ford, Deanne Foster, Rachel Frank, Pamela Ruth Franklin, Rhonda Franklin, Robert E. Franklin, Dennis Lee Freeland, Akintunde A. Funso, Cecil J. Gaines, Aaron Goldfinger, Lawrence Goodwin, Cornell V. Green, Sr, Rita Hamilton, Kenneth Harper, Corey Jamal Harris, Patricia Harris, Larry Hayes, Marcus Haynes, Roane Henry, Christopher Holloway, Earthalee Howard, Andrew Johnson, Jason A. Johnson, Joan Johnson, Kendra Johnson, William Johnson, Eddie L. Jones, Gregory Jones, Sr, Jimmy D. Jones, Sharon Jones, Tisha A. Jones, Thomas Kahn, James Keenan, David W. Keith, Charles Kemp, Bryan King, Stanley Kirkland, Vincent Lamar, Christine Lawler, Donovan E. Lee, Craig Lewis, Sr, Mary Lindeman, Ricky Alan Lujan, Eric Lund, Steven Martin, Mary Mathis, Clifton McDaniel, David McGee, Peter McLoyd, Walter Byron Meador-Morales, Eric James Means, Daniel Melton, James Benedict Menard, Doug Milliken, Shantara D. Mixon, Robert Morales, Billy Morris, Douglas Lee Morrow, Daniel Murray, James Edward Musico, Anthony Nardella, Stanley Nazombe, Aaron Nero, Darryl Nettles, Juan Nunez, Max Reina Nunez, Thomas C. O'Brien, James O'Hare, Vernetta Oakman, David Oliver, Delephine Owens, Reggie Owens, Madina Marie Parker, Richard J. Parker, Michael S. Payne, Sojan Pennington, Gregory Pigram, Dante Pinnock, William Plumbtree, John Poarch, Michael Pratt, David R. Price, Lisa E. Price, Harvey Prosser, Lawrence Raibon, Roderick A. Reed, Kendal Richardson, Larry Rigsby, Keven Robinson, Serge Ruzeck, Necobra Saunders, Martin Scharff, Frankie Scinto, Vincent Scott, John M. Sharp, Chuck Shelton, Randall Shook, Charles Slider, Deborah A. Smith, Clarence Spears, Virginia Spires, Rodney E. Stark, Sr, William Steward, II, Sadie Strong, Arthur Taylor, Jimmie L. Thomas, Kimberly Thomas, Michael E. Thomas, Jimmie Thornton, Louis Toth, Jr, George W. Tresch, Arvella Walker, Jerome Wallace, Sr, Zondre Watson, Devin White, Crystal R. Wilborn, Edward Williams, Myreon D. Williams, David Alan Wilson, John Wimpy, Stephanie Woodall-Wilson, Constance Woods, Leon Yoakum, Gerald Lee Youde, Matthew Zarna, Ledarre Zeigler. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (304) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (8) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-04043-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 7/15/2020) Modified on 7/16/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 7/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RELATING CASES to 18-cv-06972-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 8, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Aaron Goldfinger. Service waived by Gilead Sciences, Inc. waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint and have been added to this case: Jimmy D. Jones, Joan Johnson, John M. Sharp, John Poarch, John Wimpy, Jon S. Carroll, Joseph Andrew Clopton, Juan De La Rosa, Juan Nunez, Kai Broomes, Katherine Coleman, Kelvin Calloway, Kendal Richardson, Kendra Johnson, Kenneth Harper, Kerney Dwayne Cook, Sr, Keven Robinson, Kevin Eugene Cobb, Kimberly Thomas, Larry Hayes, Larry Rigsby, Lawrence Goodwin, Lawrence Raibon, Ledarre Zeigler, Leon Yoakum, Levon Anderson, Lisa Burton, Lisa E. Price, Louis Toth, Jr, Madina Marie Parker, Marcus Haynes, Martin Scharff, Mary Lindeman, Mary Mathis, Matthew Zarna, Max Reina Nunez, Michael Anthony Davis, Michael E. Thomas, Michael Erby, Michael Pratt, Michael S. Payne, Monica R. Davis, Myreon D. Williams, Necobra Saunders, Noe Farias, Jr, Norris Baylor, Pamela Ruth Franklin, Patricia Harris, Patrick Bedford, Peter McLoyd, Rachel Frank, Randall Shook, Rasanna Dubose, Reggie Owens, Reginald Dominique, Rhonda Franklin, Richard J. Parker, Ricky Alan Lujan, Rita Bailey, Rita Hamilton, Roane Henry, Robert Bailey, Robert E. Franklin, Robert Morales, Roderick A. Reed, Rodney E. Stark, Sr, Roy Chambers, Sadie Strong, Serge Ruzeck, Shantara D. Mixon, Sharon Jones, Sherry Barner, Sojan Pennington, Stanley Kirkland, Stanley Nazombe, Stella Beatrice Blissett, Stephanie Woodall-Wilson, Steven Casada, Steven Martin, Tavares Brand, Teresa Bowers, Terrell Clark, Terry Lee Conn, Thomas C. O'Brien, Thomas Kahn, Tisha A. Jones, Vernetta Oakman, Vincent Lamar, Vincent Scott, Virginia Spires, Walter Byron Meador-Morales, Wanda Cooper, William Johnson, William Plumbtree, William Steward, II, Wilson Alvarado and Zondre Watson. (This is a text-only entry.) (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14593185). Filed by Crystal R. Wilborn, Craig Lewis, Sr, Charles Slider, Edward Barksdale, Jay F. Anderson, Frank Bermudez, Anthony Felder, Clarence Spears, Harvey Prosser, Cecil J. Gaines, Frankie Scinto, Brian Conway, David R. Price, Donovan E. Lee, Clifton McDaniel, James Keenan, Gerald Chambers, Jimmie L. Thomas, Doug Milliken, Earthalee Howard, Charles Kemp, Jerome Wallace, Sr, Jay C. Fanning, Arnoldo Albiar, Cornell V. Green, Sr, Daniel Melton, Arthur Taylor, Jeffery L. Aitken, Gregory Pigram, Deborah Casey, Janet L. Coleman, Gregory Jones, Sr, Jerry Randall Coleman, Coretha Allen, Elliot C. Boose, Delephine Owens, Darryl Nettles, Edward Williams, Arvella Walker, David McGee, Douglas Alston, Brenda Cook, James Benedict Menard, Dennis Lee Freeland, Dylan Brown, Dorian Dillard, George W. Tresch, David W. Keith, Eric J. Armstrong, Gerald Lee Youde, Charles Bynum, James Shannon Chesher, Eddie L. Jones, Devin White, Eric James Means, Frances Carty, Eric Lund, Aaron Nero, Bryan King, Aaron Goldfinger, Jason A. Johnson, Corey Jamal Harris, James Edward Musico, Chuck Shelton, Constance Woods, David Alan Wilson, James H. Anderson, Gerald Davis, Bobby Creamer, Douglas Lee Morrow, Evron Day, Debra Everett, Christopher Holloway, Derek Cupp, Gregory Wayne Brown, David Neal Dodson, Charles W. Carter, Deanne Foster, Billy Morris, Christine Lawler, Jimmie Thornton, Andrew Johnson, James O'Hare, Daniel Murray, Akintunde A. Funso, Jetta Cundiff, Anthony Nardella, Demarcus Eades, Deborah A. Smith, Dante Pinnock, Anthony Ford, Alicia Blunt, Curtis Brooks, Danny A. Brown, David Oliver, Allen Ray Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/17/2020) Modified on 6/18/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldfinger et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Alston
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noe Farias, Jr.
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Coleman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Payne
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot C. Boose
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Nero
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keven Robinson
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Lawler
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnoldo Albiar
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Alan Wilson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas C. O'Brien
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Alvarado
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter McLoyd
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck Shelton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Melton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Calloway
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Lund
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akintunde A. Funso
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norris Baylor
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Franklin
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coretha Allen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levon Anderson
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Musico
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kemp
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Zarna
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Burton
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Bowers
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Nardella
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Blunt
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oliver
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demarcus Eades
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evron Day
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wimpy
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Lee Conn
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Barner
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Morris
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Keith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Plumbtree
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ford
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Lamar
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny A. Brown
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton McDaniel
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon S. Carroll
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Bermudez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanne Foster
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Scott
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myreon D. Williams
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Frank
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Wayne Brown
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica R. Davis
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Harper
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Ray Adams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Poarch
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Neal Dodson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Carter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roane Henry
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet L. Coleman
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shannon Chesher
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Prosser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Spires
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kahn
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernetta Oakman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Thornton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Toth, Jr.
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tisha A. Jones
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie L. Thomas
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Sharp
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick A. Reed
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zondre Watson
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Eugene Cobb
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bynum
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Johnson
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Brooks
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric J. Armstrong
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery L. Aitken
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Yoakum
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reggie Owens
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lindeman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Benedict Menard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Steward, II
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Thomas
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Hayes
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney E. Stark, Sr.
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Nunez
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Pigram
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Lewis, Sr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Nettles
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madina Marie Parker
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jetta Cundiff
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Parker
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Scinto
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stella Beatrice Blissett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Jones
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Clark
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Chambers
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Cupp
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Goldfinger
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Anderson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Jones, Sr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Everett
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Harris
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Barksdale
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Bailey
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Hamilton
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Davis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Raibon
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Cooper
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin White
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Dominique
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Wallace, Sr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Franklin
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Taylor
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Davis
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Cook
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Haynes
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Woodall-Wilson
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Alan Lujan
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa E. Price
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay F. Anderson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Necobra Saunders
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Reina Nunez
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Price
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earthalee Howard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Casey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason A. Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Andrew Clopton
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan King
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledarre Zeigler
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Lee Youde
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay C. Fanning
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bailey
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tavares Brand
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serge Ruzeck
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasanna Dubose
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Lee Morrow
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante Pinnock
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Ruth Franklin
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Felder
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Byron Meador-Morales
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Milliken
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sojan Pennington
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Casada
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan De La Rosa
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kai Broomes
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W. Tresch
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Scharff
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Morales
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorian Dillard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil J. Gaines
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Shook
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie L. Jones
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Woods
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy D. Jones
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric James Means
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Randall Coleman
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Holloway
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Conway
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Goodwin
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Martin
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Slider
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Creamer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Carty
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerney Dwayne Cook, Sr.
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Rigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donovan E. Lee
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Chambers
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arvella Walker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Jamal Harris
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Lee Freeland
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Murray
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendal Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shantara D. Mixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delephine Owens
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal R. Wilborn
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Bedford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Erby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Spears
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Nazombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O'Hare
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornell V. Green, Sr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Brown
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Keenan
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadie Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David McGee
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?