Karkanen v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kristie Marie Karkanen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv04156
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Lynn M. Harada (Harada, Lynn) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Benavides, Francesco) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT FOR SERVICE as to #7 Summons Issued as to USA. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kristie Marie Karkanen.. (Haley, Denise) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Andrew Saul on 06/26/20 by Kristie Marie Karkanen. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285, #2 USM-285)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on 6/25/2020.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/8/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kristie Marie Karkanen. (Haley, Denise) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Haley, Denise) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Review Of Final Decision Of The Commissioner Of Social Security against Commissioner of Social Security. Filed byKristie Marie Karkanen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haley, Denise) (Filed on 6/23/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karkanen v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Lynn M. Harada
Represented By: Francesco Paulo Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Marie Karkanen
Represented By: Denise Bourgeois Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?