Washington v. KLM Royal Dutch Airlines
Plaintiff: Denise Washington
Defendant: KLM Royal Dutch Airlines
Case Number: 4:2020cv04268
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for October 6, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by September 29th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:20-cv-04268-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/15/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines.. (Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V. to Plaintiff's Complaint byKLM Royal Dutch Airlines. (Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/13/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to United States District Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to USDC)(Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines identifying Corporate Parent Air France-KLM Group, a publicly-held corporation for KLM Royal Dutch Airlines. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Corporate Disclosure Statement of Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines identifying Corporate Parent Air France-KLM, Corporate Parent Air France-KLM, Other Affiliate Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V. for KLM Royal Dutch Airlines. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Certification of Interested Entities or Persons of Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij M.V. (Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Notice of Removal of Civil Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1441 on the Grounds of Diversity of Citizenship and Federal Question Jurisdiction Under 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332 and 1331 from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-580358. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14627149). Filed byKLM Royal Dutch Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet to Notice of Removal)(Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. KLM Royal Dutch Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Washington
Represented By: H. Nathan James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLM Royal Dutch Airlines
Represented By: Jennifer J. Johnston
Represented By: Ivy Larsen Nowinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?