GLDOD, LLC v. NTL Institute of Applied Behavioral Sciences et al
Plaintiff: GLDOD, LLC
Defendant: Alan Klein, Janie Payne, NTL Institute of Applied Behavioral Sciences and Ted Tschudy
Case Number: 4:2020cv04613
Filed: July 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ted Tschudy and byNTL Institute of Applied Behavioral Sciences. (Castricone, Andrew) (Filed on 9/3/2020) Modified on 9/4/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #7 Summons Issued and Stipulation to Continue Deadline to Respond as to defendants NTL Institute of Applied Behavioral Sciences and Alan Klein Acknowledgement filed by GLDOD, LLC. (Bomse, Amy) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #8 Lucas T. Hanback's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Lucas T. Hanback ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14732231.) filed by GLDOD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from Virginia Bar)(Hanback, Lucas) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Alan Klein, NTL Institute of Applied Behavioral Sciences, Janie Payne, Ted Tschudy. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Bomse, Amy) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 #Electronic filing error. A maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons or multiple defendants on THREE summons and re-file in its entirety Re: #5 Proposed Summons filed by GLDOD, LLC (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Alan Klein, #2 Summons to Ted Tschudy, #3 Summons to Janie Payne)(Bomse, Amy) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GLDOD, LLC.. (Bomse, Amy) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/24/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR CONVERSION against All Defendants with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14679286.). Filed by GLDOD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bomse, Amy) (Filed on 7/10/2020) Modified on 7/13/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/23/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLDOD, LLC v. NTL Institute of Applied Behavioral Sciences et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLDOD, LLC
Represented By: Amy Lynne Bomse
Represented By: Lucas T Hanback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janie Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NTL Institute of Applied Behavioral Sciences
Represented By: Andrew D. Castricone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Tschudy
Represented By: Andrew D. Castricone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?