People of the State of California v. Betsy Devos
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii, People of the State of California, New Jersey, State of, State of North Carolina, State of Nevada, State of Maryland, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, State of Vermont, State of Minnesota, State of Oregon, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Colorado, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, People Of The State Of Illinois, State of Wisconsin, People of Michigan, District of Columbia, State of Rhode Island, State of Delaware, State of Maine and State of New York
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education and Betsy DeVos
Case Number: 4:2020cv04717
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 59 Refund Status re #57 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Adam Welle ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14840406.) filed by State of Minnesota. (Welle, Adam) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 57 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 09714695190 by State of Hawaii. (Moriarty, Thomas) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14805433.) filed by State of Oregon. (Campbell, Katherine) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14792513.) filed by People of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Green, Brian) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14786475.) filed by District of Columbia. (Wiseman, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 50 Refund Status re #47 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14777604.) filed by State of North Carolina. (Liles, Matthew) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 47 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14715209 by State of Colorado. (Webster, Olivia) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by People of the State of California. Defendant U.S. Department of Education (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eskandari, Bernard) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by People of the State of California. Defendant Betsy DeVos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eskandari, Bernard) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14765764.) filed by State of Delaware. (Kassab, Vanessa) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14758350.) filed by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Boyer, Jacob) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14694621.) Filing fee previously paid on 7/15/2020 filed by New Jersey, State of. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hans, Elspeth) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020) Modified on 7/31/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14751236.) filed by State of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tucker, Laura) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14749940.) filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kubiak, Mark) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14745224.) filed by State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Fast, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14731347.) filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Court of Appeals of Maryland)(Madaio, Christopher) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14730600.) filed by State of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of good standing)(Chambers, Joseph) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb Andrew Rush for Plaintiff People of the State of Illinois (Rush, Caleb) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kevin J. Burns ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14715188.) Filing fee previously paid on 7-21-20 filed by State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Webster, Olivia) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Olivia D. Weber ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14715188.) filed by State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Webster, Olivia) (Filed on 7/21/2020) Modified on 7/22/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Please re-file in its entirety. Missing Certificate of Good Standing. Re: #5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 31 0, receipt number 0971-14694621.) filed by New Jersey, State of (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE:Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Miranda Mercedes Cover ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14710896.) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14710896.) filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 MCover Certificate of Good Standing)(Cover, Miranda) (Filed on 7/20/2020) Modified on 7/21/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon A Conlin (Conlin, Shannon) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian Renee O'Brien for Plaintiff State of Maine (O'Brien, Jillian) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/17/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Betsy DeVos, U.S. Department of Education, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Yael Shavit ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14705353.) filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shavit, Yael) (Filed on 7/17/2020) Modified on 7/20/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14700886.) filed by State of New Mexico. (Giandomenico, Lisa) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14698662.) filed by State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate in Good Standing)(Conlin, Shannon) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by People of the State of California.. (Eskandari, Bernard) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14695317.) filed by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Moriarty, Thomas) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14694621.) filed by New Jersey, State of. (Hans, Elspeth) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicklas A. Akers for Plaintiff the People of the State of California (Akers, Nicklas) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Eskandari, Bernard) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Commonwealth of Massachusetts, People of the State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, District of Columbia, State of Hawaii, People of the State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, People of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Wisconsin against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14693713.). Filed byPeople of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eskandari, Bernard) (Filed on 7/15/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the State of California v. Betsy Devos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Thomas Francis Mana Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of California
Represented By: Nicklas A. Akers
Represented By: Bernard Ardavan Eskandari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Jersey, State of
Represented By: Elspeth L. Faiman Hans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina
Represented By: Matthew Liles
Represented By: Joshua H Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Aaron Ford
Represented By: Laura Michelle Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Brian E Frosh
Represented By: Christopher John Madaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: William Tong
Represented By: Joseph J. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Lisa Marie Giandomenico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: Thomas J Donovan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Keith Ellison
Represented By: Adam Hoiland Welle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Katherine A. Campbell
Represented By: Ellen F Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Mark Herring
Represented By: Mark Stanley Kubiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: Olivia D Webster
Represented By: Philip Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Josh Shapiro
Represented By: Jacob B Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Yael Shavit
Represented By: Miranda Mercedes Cover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People Of The State Of Illinois
Represented By: Kwame Raoul
Represented By: Caleb Andrew Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Joshua L Kaul
Represented By: Shannon A Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of Michigan
Represented By: Brian Green
Represented By: Dana Nessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Karl A Racine
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Peter F Neronha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Vanessa Kassab
Represented By: Kathleen Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maine
Represented By: Jillian Renee O'Brien
Represented By: Aaron M Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Carolyn M. Fast
Represented By: Letitia James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy DeVos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?