Mack et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin E. McCarthy, Michelle Collette Walker, Freeman E. Thompson, Jr., Marvin J. Gomez, Lela Smith-Jones, Carlos Johnson, Umbret Fields, Benita I. Morrison, Park Bishop, Michael Fitzgerald Lindsay, Linda Slaughter, Thomas D. Dudley, III, Phillip Fields, Robert Ybarra, David R. Wilson, Georgianna Butts, Roger D. Mitchell, Sheila Townsel, Robert C. Walker, Stacy Smith, Michelle Renee Marshall, Kevin Eugene Seaman, Marcus Harris-Pride, Mary Tarver, Angela Mack, Antonio M. McGhee, Sr., Stephanie McCray-Bunion, Timothy W. Hume, Lori Neeb, Susan Riggs, Chad T. McCanless, Christopher A. Williams, Tammie Smith, Louis Gray, Willie Mae Brown, Jimmy L. Young, Jerald Schuman, Anthony Reed, James Douglas Gaines, Betty Y. Trapp, Preston Lafayette Harrington, Karen Knox, Barbara Ann McLain, Zachary Bennett Watkins, Sherri Pearson, Jonathan Harris, Brandon Strogen, Tyrone Trent, Donald Emberlin-Lamorte and Janel Jones
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04734
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (336) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (14) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-04734-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dismissal of Claims and Responsive Pleadings filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Mack Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 8/17/2020) Modified on 8/18/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to R. Allan Pixton.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Katrina Ashley.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Hilliard.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14754901.) filed by Park Bishop, Willie Mae Brown, Georgianna Butts, Thomas D. Dudley, III, Donald Emberlin-Lamorte, Phillip Fields, Umbret Fields, James Douglas Gaines, Marvin J. Gomez, Louis Gray, Preston Lafayette Harrington, Jonathan Harris, Marcus Harris-Pride, Timothy W. Hume, Carlos Johnson, Janel Jones, Karen Knox, Michael Fitzgerald Lindsay, Angela Mack, Michelle Renee Marshall, Chad T. McCanless, Kevin E. McCarthy, Stephanie McCray-Bunion, Antonio M. McGhee, Sr, Barbara Ann McLain, Roger D. Mitchell, Benita I. Morrison, Lori Neeb, Sherri Pearson, Anthony Reed, Susan Riggs, Jerald Schuman, Kevin Eugene Seaman, Linda Slaughter, Stacy Smith, Tammie Smith, Lela Smith-Jones, Brandon Strogen, Mary Tarver, Freeman E. Thompson, Jr, Sheila Townsel, Betty Y. Trapp, Tyrone Trent, Michelle Collette Walker, Robert C. Walker, Zachary Bennett Watkins, Christopher A. Williams, David R. Wilson, Robert Ybarra, Jimmy L. Young. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14754878.) filed by Park Bishop, Willie Mae Brown, Georgianna Butts, Thomas D. Dudley, III, Donald Emberlin-Lamorte, Phillip Fields, Umbret Fields, James Douglas Gaines, Marvin J. Gomez, Louis Gray, Preston Lafayette Harrington, Jonathan Harris, Marcus Harris-Pride, Timothy W. Hume, Carlos Johnson, Janel Jones, Karen Knox, Michael Fitzgerald Lindsay, Angela Mack, Michelle Renee Marshall, Chad T. McCanless, Kevin E. McCarthy, Stephanie McCray-Bunion, Antonio M. McGhee, Sr, Barbara Ann McLain, Roger D. Mitchell, Benita I. Morrison, Lori Neeb, Sherri Pearson, Anthony Reed, Susan Riggs, Jerald Schuman, Kevin Eugene Seaman, Linda Slaughter, Stacy Smith, Tammie Smith, Lela Smith-Jones, Brandon Strogen, Mary Tarver, Freeman E. Thompson, Jr, Sheila Townsel, Betty Y. Trapp, Tyrone Trent, Michelle Collette Walker, Robert C. Walker, Zachary Bennett Watkins, Christopher A. Williams, David R. Wilson, Robert Ybarra, Jimmy L. Young. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14754870.) filed by Park Bishop, Willie Mae Brown, Georgianna Butts, Thomas D. Dudley, III, Donald Emberlin-Lamorte, Phillip Fields, Umbret Fields, James Douglas Gaines, Marvin J. Gomez, Louis Gray, Preston Lafayette Harrington, Jonathan Harris, Marcus Harris-Pride, Timothy W. Hume, Carlos Johnson, Janel Jones, Karen Knox, Michael Fitzgerald Lindsay, Angela Mack, Michelle Renee Marshall, Chad T. McCanless, Kevin E. McCarthy, Stephanie McCray-Bunion, Antonio M. McGhee, Sr, Barbara Ann McLain, Roger D. Mitchell, Benita I. Morrison, Lori Neeb, Sherri Pearson, Anthony Reed, Susan Riggs, Jerald Schuman, Kevin Eugene Seaman, Linda Slaughter, Stacy Smith, Tammie Smith, Lela Smith-Jones, Brandon Strogen, Mary Tarver, Freeman E. Thompson, Jr, Sheila Townsel, Betty Y. Trapp, Tyrone Trent, Michelle Collette Walker, Robert C. Walker, Zachary Bennett Watkins, Christopher A. Williams, David R. Wilson, Robert Ybarra, Jimmy L. Young. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (323) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RELATING CASES to 18-cv-06972-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 29, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Michelle Renee Marshall, Park Bishop, Kevin E. McCarthy, Brandon Strogen, Louis Gray, Jerald Schuman, Anthony Reed, Angela Mack, Jimmy L. Young, Michael Fitzgerald Lindsay, Janel Jones, Tammie Smith, Lori Neeb, Marcus Harris-Pride, Marvin J. Gomez, Sherri Pearson, Karen Knox, Georgianna Butts, Willie Mae Brown, Linda Slaughter, Christopher A. Williams, Michelle Collette Walker, Preston Lafayette Harrington, David R. Wilson, Umbret Fields, Kevin Eugene Seaman, Stephanie McCray-Bunion, Timothy W. Hume, Freeman E. Thompson, Jr, Lela Smith-Jones, Mary Tarver, Betty Y. Trapp, Zachary Bennett Watkins, Sheila Townsel, Robert C. Walker, Antonio M. McGhee, Sr, Chad T. McCanless, Stacy Smith, Donald Emberlin-Lamorte, Tyrone Trent, James Douglas Gaines, Carlos Johnson, Roger D. Mitchell, Barbara Ann McLain, Phillip Fields, Robert Ybarra, Thomas D. Dudley, III, Jonathan Harris, Susan Riggs, Benita I. Morrison. Service waived by Gilead Sciences, Inc. waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Gilead Sciences, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14696867). Filed by Michelle Renee Marshall, Park Bishop, Kevin E. McCarthy, Brandon Strogen, Louis Gray, Jerald Schuman, Anthony Reed, Angela Mack, Jimmy L. Young, Michael Fitzgerald Lindsay, Janel Jones, Tammie Smith, Lori Neeb, Marcus Harris-Pride, Marvin J. Gomez, Sherri Pearson, Karen Knox, Georgianna Butts, Willie Mae Brown, Linda Slaughter, Christopher A. Williams, Michelle Collette Walker, Preston Lafayette Harrington, David R. Wilson, Umbret Fields, Kevin Eugene Seaman, Stephanie McCray-Bunion, Timothy W. Hume, Freeman E. Thompson, Jr, Lela Smith-Jones, Mary Tarver, Betty Y. Trapp, Zachary Bennett Watkins, Sheila Townsel, Robert C. Walker, Antonio M. McGhee, Sr, Chad T. McCanless, Stacy Smith, Donald Emberlin-Lamorte, Tyrone Trent, James Douglas Gaines, Carlos Johnson, Roger D. Mitchell, Barbara Ann McLain, Phillip Fields, Robert Ybarra, Thomas D. Dudley, III, Jonathan Harris, Susan Riggs, Benita I. Morrison. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 7/15/2020) Modified on 7/15/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin E. McCarthy
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Collette Walker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freeman E. Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin J. Gomez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lela Smith-Jones
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Johnson
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Umbret Fields
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benita I. Morrison
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Park Bishop
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fitzgerald Lindsay
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Slaughter
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas D. Dudley, III
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Fields
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ybarra
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Wilson
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgianna Butts
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger D. Mitchell
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Townsel
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C. Walker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Smith
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Renee Marshall
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Eugene Seaman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Harris-Pride
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Tarver
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Mack
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio M. McGhee, Sr.
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie McCray-Bunion
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy W. Hume
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Neeb
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Riggs
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad T. McCanless
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher A. Williams
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Gray
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mae Brown
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy L. Young
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald Schuman
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Reed
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Douglas Gaines
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Y. Trapp
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston Lafayette Harrington
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Knox
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann McLain
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Bennett Watkins
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Pearson
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Harris
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Strogen
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Trent
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Emberlin-Lamorte
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janel Jones
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Fornecker Johnson
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett,
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?