(PC) Kocak v. Jiminez
Plaintiff: John Ivan Kocak
Defendant: Sherwin Jiminez
Case Number: 4:2020cv04794
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CHC
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the Eastern District of California, Case No. 1:20cv00921BAM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00921. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 6, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on John Ivan Kocak. (Marrujo, C)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the Northern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/2/2020. (Marrujo, C)
July 2, 2020 BAM1 FLAG SET. (Wong, C)
July 2, 2020 ***STAFF NOTE: Emailed BAM Chambers regarding venue. (Lundstrom, T)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by John Ivan Kocak. (Lundstrom, T)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against John Ivan Kocak by John Ivan Kocak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Kocak v. Jiminez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwin Jiminez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ivan Kocak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?