Evans et al v. Plaid Inc.
Plaintiff: Oswaldo Herrera, David Evans, Adam Smotkin and Patrick Lenahen
Defendant: Plaid Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04804
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 ***CASE CLOSED. ALL FUTURE FILINGS TO BE FILED IN THE LEAD CASE, 4:20-CV-3056-DMR.*** (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 7/30/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RELATING CASES: 3:20-cv-04230-SK Mitchell v. Plaid Inc.; 4:20-cv-04344-DMR Curtis, et al v. Plaid Inc.; 3:20-cv-04480-JSC Anderson, et al v. Plaid Inc.; and 3:20-cv-04804-JSC Evans, et al v. Plaid Inc. are all related to 4:20-cv-03056-DMR Cottle, et al v. Plaid Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/29/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by David Evans, Oswaldo Herrera, Patrick Lenahen, Adam Smotkin of Joinder (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Adam Smotkin, Patrick Lenahen, David Evans, Oswaldo Herrera. Service waived by Plaid Inc. waiver sent on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Albert, Lee) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Jada Hodge (Hodge, Ashley) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Augus Barrera (Barrera, Abigail) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Doc Bedel (Bedel, Anthony) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan D. Dettmer (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Plaid Inc... (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David Evans, Oswaldo Herrera, Patrick Lenahen, Adam Smotkin.. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lee Albert. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14711661.) filed by David Evans. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Albert, Lee) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Plaid Inc.. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by David Evans, Oswaldo Herrera, Patrick Lenahen, Adam Smotkin re #1 Complaint (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Plaid Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14706092.). Filed byAdam Smotkin, Patrick Lenahen, David Evans, Oswaldo Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tostrud, Jon) (Filed on 7/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans et al v. Plaid Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oswaldo Herrera
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Represented By: Lee Albert,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Evans
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Represented By: Lee Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Smotkin
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Represented By: Lee Albert,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Lenahen
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Represented By: Lee Albert,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaid Inc.
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Abigail Augus Barrera
Represented By: Anthony Doc Bedel
Represented By: Ashley Jada Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?