National Association of Manufacturers et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Retail Federation, National Association of Manufacturers, Intrax, Inc. and Technet
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, Michael R. Pompeo and Chad F. Wolf
Petitioner: Amici Curiae Additional Companies
Amicus Curiae: WORLDWIDE EMPLOYEE RELOCATION COUNCIL, U.S. Tech Workers, Amici Curiae Leading Companies and Business Organizations, Amicus Curiae Immigration Law Professors and Society for Human Resource Management
Case Number: 4:2020cv04887
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #85 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 19, 2020 Filing 85 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Press, Joshua) (Filed on 9/19/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #66 Opposition/Response to Motion by Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, Chad F. Wolf. (Press, Joshua) (Filed on 9/17/2020) Modified on 9/18/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #68 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Shoba Sivaprasad Wadhia. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 82 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey S. White: Motion Hearing held on 9/11/2020 re #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Total Time in Court: 1 hour 52 minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney: Paul W. Hughes. Defendant Attorney: Joshua S. Press. Attachment: Minutes. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/11/2020) Modified on 9/11/2020 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Additional Authority for Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #79 Order by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Intrax, Inc., National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, TechNet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NFAP, Updated Analysis of Employment Data, #2 Exhibit Gomez v. Trump)(Hughes, Paul) (Filed on 9/10/2020) Modified on 9/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities re #79 Order filed by Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, Chad F. Wolf. (Press, Joshua) (Filed on 9/10/2020) Modified on 9/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING ON #31 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #77 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by WORLDWIDE EMPLOYEE RELOCATION COUNCIL. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by WORLDWIDE EMPLOYEE RELOCATION COUNCIL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Salaheldin, Waleed) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 76 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING as to #31 Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/11/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey S. White. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsw Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel who will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jswcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than September 8, 2020 at 12:00 pm PT.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 75 Amicus Brief in Support of Federal Defendants in Opposition to Interim Relief filed by U.S. Tech Workers. Filed Per Order of the Court at Docket Entry #72 . (Related document(s) #72 ) (Joseph, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/2/2020) Modified on 9/2/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Steven Goldsmith (Goldsmith, Aaron) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Laura McNally. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #67 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Laura McNally (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14879038) filed by Amicus Curiae Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(McNally, Laura) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER REQUIRING Delivery of Chambers Copies re #69 Reply to Opposition/Response. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 28, 2020. (jswlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 69 REPLY (re #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byChamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Intrax, Inc., National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Technet. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Paul W. Hughes, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Declaration of William Gustafson, #7 Second Declaration of Marcie Schneider)(Hughes, Paul) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Shoba Sivaprasad Wadhia (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14875738) filed by Amicus Curiae Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Wadhia, Shoba) (Filed on 8/28/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2020 Filing 67 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by U.S. Tech Workers. Responses due by 9/8/2020. Replies due by 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Memo of Law, #2 Proposed Order proposed order)(Joseph, Lawrence) (Filed on 8/25/2020) Modified on 8/26/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2020 Filing 66 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byMichael R. Pompeo, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, Chad F. Wolf. (Press, Joshua) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #56 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURAIE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Leon Rodriguez. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Leon Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14816346) filed by Society for Human Resource Management . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rodriguez, Leon) (Filed on 8/14/2020) Modified on 8/17/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2020 Filing 62 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (to correct date on document):Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2020 11:00 AM. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 61 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2020 11:00 AM. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Sarah P. Hogarth. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Sarah P. Hogarth Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Intrax, Inc., National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Technet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Hogarth, Sarah) (Filed on 8/12/2020) Modified on 8/13/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Carl Hampe. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Carl Hampe ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14802563.) filed by Amici Curiae Additional Companies. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Hampe, Carl) (Filed on 8/11/2020) Modified on 8/12/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2020 Filing 56 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURAIE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by SOCIETY FOR HUMAN RESOURCE MANAGEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Amicus Brief)(Malm, Steven) (Filed on 8/11/2020) Modified on 8/12/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by National Retail Federation, National Association of Manufacturers, Intrax, Inc., Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Technet. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 10, 2020. (jswlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Pierce. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #45 Administrative Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Pierce ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14794707.) filed by Amici Curiae Additional Companies. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Pierce, Daniel) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #48 Administrative Motion For Leave to Join Brief of Amici Curiae. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David A. Schnitzer. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Stuart F. Delery. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 48 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION leave to join brief of amici curiae re #45 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Amici Curiae Additional Companies. Responses due by 9/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Salaheldin, Waleed) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David A. Schnitzer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14792574.) filed by Amici Curiae Leading Companies and Business Organizations. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Stuart F. Delery ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14792507.) filed by Amici Curiae Leading Companies and Business Organizations. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2020 Filing 45 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Amici Curiae Leading Companies and Business Organizations. Responses due by 8/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief of Leading Companies and Business Organizations, #2 Declaration of Ethan D. Dettmer, #3 Proposed Order)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #40 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief.. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Peter Margulies. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Neil Nandi. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 8/19/2020. Replies due by 8/28/2020. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting AS MODIFIED #39 Administrative Motion For Adjustment to Briefing Schedule. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 40 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Amicus Curiae Immigration Law Professors. Responses due by 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Declaration, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion For Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief)(Dowlatshahi, Camron) (Filed on 8/7/2020) Modified on 8/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2020 Filing 39 DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF BRIEFING SCHEDUL re #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, Chad F. Wolf. Responses due by 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Press, Joshua) (Filed on 8/7/2020) Modified on 8/10/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14788437.) filed by Amicus Curiae Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Margulies, Peter) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14788283.) filed by Amicus Curiae Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Nandi, Neil) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Camron Dowlatshahi (Dowlatshahi, Camron) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn M. Girdharry on behalf of all Defendants (Girdharry, Glenn) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Samuel Press (Press, Joshua) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re: Re: Michael B. Kimberly. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Intrax, Inc., National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Technet re #31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declarations and Exhibits in Support thereof (Hughes, Paul) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Intrax, Inc., National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Technet. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 8/14/2020. Replies due by 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul W. Hughes, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Declaration of Jonathan Baselice, #37 Declaration of James Bell, #38 Declaration of Zane Brown, #39 Declaration of Nicholas Brummel, #40 Declaration of Jack Chen, #41 Declaration of Scott Corley, #42 Declaration of Stephanie Hall, #43 Declaration of Mike Leman, #44 Declaration of Tom O'Gorman, #45 Declaration of Marcie Schneider, #46 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Paul) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Michael B. Kimberly ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14761826.) filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Intrax, Inc., National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Technet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Kimberly, Michael) (Filed on 7/31/2020) Modified on 8/3/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2020 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Intrax, Inc., National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Technet re #26 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Intrax, Inc., National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Technet re Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limit and to Set Hearing (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Intrax, Inc., National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Technet re #23 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #22 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #25 Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limitation and Notice a Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 25 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation and Notice a Hearing filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Intrax, Inc., National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Technet. Responses due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul W. Hughes, #2 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Paul) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re: Paul Hughes. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/27/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2020 11:00 AM. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 7-27-2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/27/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Retail Federation, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Association of Manufacturers, Technet, Intrax, Inc.. Chad F. Wolf served on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Retail Federation, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Association of Manufacturers, Technet, Intrax, Inc.. Michael R. Pompeo served on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Retail Federation, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Association of Manufacturers, Technet, Intrax, Inc.. United States Department of State served on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Retail Federation, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Association of Manufacturers, Technet, Intrax, Inc.. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 7/24/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Intrax, Inc., National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Technet.. (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, Chad F. Wolf. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Paul Hughes ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14719350.) filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Intrax, Inc., National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Technet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Paul) (Filed on 7/21/2020) Modified on 7/23/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Intrax, Inc., National Association of Manufacturers, National Retail Federation, Technet (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intrax, Inc. (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Retail Federation (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Technet (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Association of Manufacturers (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William G. Gaede, III (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief [Filing Receipt # 0971-14717573] against All Defendants. Filed byNational Retail Federation, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Association of Manufacturers, Technet, Intrax, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaede, William) (Filed on 7/21/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Association of Manufacturers et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Michael B Kimberly
Represented By: Sarah P. Hogarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Retail Federation
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Michael B Kimberly
Represented By: Sarah P. Hogarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association of Manufacturers
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Michael B Kimberly
Represented By: Sarah P. Hogarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intrax, Inc.
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Michael B Kimberly
Represented By: Sarah P. Hogarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technet
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes, III
Represented By: William G. Gaede, III
Represented By: Michael B Kimberly
Represented By: Sarah P. Hogarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Glenn M. Girdharry
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Aaron Steven Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Represented By: Glenn M. Girdharry
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Aaron Steven Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo
Represented By: Glenn M. Girdharry
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Aaron Steven Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Glenn M. Girdharry
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Aaron Steven Goldsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WORLDWIDE EMPLOYEE RELOCATION COUNCIL
Represented By: Waleed Abderahman Salaheldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U.S. Tech Workers
Represented By: Lawrence John Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amici Curiae Leading Companies and Business Organizations
Represented By: David Ari Schnitzer,
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Stuart F. Delery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amicus Curiae Immigration Law Professors
Represented By: Peter Simon Margulies
Represented By: Neil Gerard Nandi
Represented By: Shoba Wadhia
Represented By: Laura K. McNally
Represented By: Camron Dowlatshahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society for Human Resource Management
Represented By: Steven Jeffrey Malm
Represented By: Leon Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amici Curiae Additional Companies
Represented By: Daniel Paul Pierce
Represented By: Carl Walter Hampe
Represented By: Waleed Abderahman Salaheldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?