Deibel Laboratories of Illinois, Inc. v. Worldwide Express Operations, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Deibel Laboratories of Illinois, Inc.
Defendant: Worldwide Express Operations, LLC, Load One, LLC and 1-25 Does
Case Number: 4:2020cv05191
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT filed by Deibel Laboratories of Illinois, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/9/2020. Replies due by 10/16/2020. (Danishwar, Maryam) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY Memorandum in Support of Defendant Worldwide Express Operations, LLCs Motion to Dismiss (re #19 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by Worldwide Express Operations, LLC. (Ou, Chih Yu) (Filed on 9/2/2020) Modified on 9/2/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss . Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byDeibel Laboratories of Illinois, Inc.. (Danishwar, Maryam) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/19/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Worldwide Express Operations, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2020 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 8/26/2020. Replies due by 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Joseph Ou in Support of Defendant Worldwide Express Operations, LLCs Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Worldwide Express Operations, LLCs Motion to Dismiss, #7 Proposed Order)(Ou, Chih Yu) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Worldwide Express Operations, LLC.. (Ou, Chih Yu) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 17 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledgement of receipt of case transfer in from Central District of California (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-04371. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Transferring Action by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED THAT: The parties' Stipulated Motion to Transfer (Document No. #13 ) is granted. The Clerk shall transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Case transferred electronically. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (et)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Defendant Worldwide Express Operations, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A) (Ou, Chih)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #9 as to Defendant Load One, LLC, Worldwide Express Operations, LLC. (iv)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 19-1 Complaint/Petition includes more than 10 Does or fictitiously named parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #9 Deibel Laboratories of Illinois, Inc.. (Hughes, Bradford)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Worldwide Express Operations, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Hughes, Bradford)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Respond as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Worldwide Express Operations, LLC.(Attorney Chih Yu Ou added to party Worldwide Express Operations, LLC(pty:dft))(Ou, Chih)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Worldwide Express Operations, LLC. (jtil)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Deibel Laboratories of Illinois, Inc.. (Hughes, Bradford)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Deibel Laboratories of Illinois, Inc., (Hughes, Bradford)
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Deibel Laboratories of Illinois, Inc.. (Hughes, Bradford)
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26448145 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Deibel Laboratories of Illinois, Inc.. (Attorney Bradford G Hughes added to party Deibel Laboratories of Illinois, Inc.(pty:pla))(Hughes, Bradford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deibel Laboratories of Illinois, Inc. v. Worldwide Express Operations, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deibel Laboratories of Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: Bradford G Hughes
Represented By: Maryam Danishwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worldwide Express Operations, LLC
Represented By: G Geoffrey Robb
Represented By: Chih Yu Ou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Load One, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-25 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?