People of the State of California v. The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency et al
Plaintiff: People of the State of California, People of the State of New York and People of the State of Illinois
Defendant: Brian P. Brooks and The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency
Case Number: 4:2020cv05200
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #22 Administrative Motion to Relate Cases. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha S. Edney (Edney, Marsha) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate Cases under Civil Local Rule 3-12 ) filed byBrian P. Brooks, The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Perez-Sangimino, Juan) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan Pablo Perez-Sangimino (Perez-Sangimino, Juan) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by People of the State of California re #22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate Cases under Civil Local Rule 3-12 (Mauney, Devin) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 22 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate Cases under Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by People of the State of California. Responses due by 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Mauney, Devin) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 21 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - Defendant Brian P. Brooks by People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Charoenpong, Wareewan) (Filed on 8/24/2020) Modified on 8/25/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2020 Filing 20 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - Defendant The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency by People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Charoenpong, Wareewan) (Filed on 8/24/2020) Modified on 8/25/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Danielle Grotheer (Grotheer, Erin) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L McCall (McCall, Christopher) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re: Christopher L. McCall. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Christopher L. McCall (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14776876) filed by People of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McCall, Christopher) (Filed on 8/5/2020) Modified on 8/6/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Erin D. Grotheer. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #13 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remove #12 Incorrectly Filed Document filed by People of the State of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Remove Doc. 12, Attachment 2)(Grotheer, Erin) (Filed on 8/4/2020) Modified on 8/5/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Erin D. Grotheer ( filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14770394.) filed by People of the State of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Grotheer Cert. of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit CA co-plaintiff statement)(Grotheer, Erin) (Filed on 8/4/2020) **Locked per filer's request.** Modified on 8/4/2020 (ddkS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/5/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Wareewan Tina Charoenpong (Charoenpong, Wareewan) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/3/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2020 11:00 AM. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Brian P. Brooks, The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by People of the State of California.. (Mauney, Devin) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/12/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicklas A. Akers for the People of the State of California (Akers, Nicklas) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mauney, Devin) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of People of the State of California, People of the State of Illinois, and People of the State of New York against Brian P. Brooks, The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14748291.). Filed byPeople of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mauney, Devin) (Filed on 7/29/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the State of California v. The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of California
Represented By: Nicklas A. Akers
Represented By: Devin Whetstone Mauney
Represented By: Wareewan Tina Charoenpong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of New York
Represented By: Christopher L McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of Illinois
Represented By: Erin Danielle Grotheer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian P. Brooks
Represented By: Marsha S. Edney
Represented By: Juan Pablo Perez-Sangimino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency
Represented By: Marsha S. Edney
Represented By: Juan Pablo Perez-Sangimino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?