Sierra Club v. Fish and Wildlife Services of the United States
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Defendant: Fish and Wildlife Services of the United States
Case Number: 4:2020cv05279
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fish and Wildlife Services of the United States.. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION to extend time to Respond to Complaint filed by Fish and Wildlife Services of the United States and Sierra Club. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 9/9/2020) Modified on 9/9/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sierra Club (Monahan, Rose) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sierra Club.. (Monahan, Rose) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2020 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fish and Wildlife Services of the United States, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/17/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sierra Club (Monahan, Rose) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Monahan, Rose) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fish and Wildlife Services of the United States ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14759432.). Filed bySierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Monahan, Rose) (Filed on 7/31/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club v. Fish and Wildlife Services of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fish and Wildlife Services of the United States
Represented By: Pamela T. Johann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Rose K Monahan
Represented By: Gloria Diantha Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?