Williams v. Condensed Curriculum International, Inc
Plaintiff: Ryan Williams
Defendant: Condensed Curriculum International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv05292
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE HELD VIA ZOOM. Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 11/9/2020 02:00 PM via Zoom before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website: www.cand.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Condensed Curriculum International, Inc.. (Joy, Brendan) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Condensed Curriculum International, Inc (Joy, Brendan) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Or der 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/17/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Answer to Removed Complaint (see Document #1 -1; page 50) filed by Condensed Curriculum International, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 FEE PAID (Filing fee$400,receipt number 0971-14761044). (Joy, Brendan) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Condensed Curriculum International, Inc re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Joy, Brendan) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Napa Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV000392. (). Filed byCondensed Curriculum International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Defendant Condensed Curriculum International, Inc.'s Appendix of State Court Pleadings, #2 Declaration of Brendan Y. Joy in Support of Condensed Curriculum International, Inc.'s Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Thomas A. Ruziska in Support of Condensed Curriculum International, Inc.'s Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joy, Brendan) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Condensed Curriculum International, Inc. NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case. The fee must be paid within two business days or the case will be subject to termination. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Condensed Curriculum International, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Williams
Represented By: Alexander Robert Safyan
Represented By: Diyari Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Condensed Curriculum International, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan Yeats Joy
Represented By: Nicole Kamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?