Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Defendant: Google LLC
Petitioner: Uniloc Licensing USA LLC and Uniloc USA, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: David Keyzer
Case Number: 4:2020cv05342
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting extension of time to file Objection (377) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-04355-YGR; granting (352) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05334-YGR; granting (229) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05346-YGR; granting (217) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05345-YGR; granting (331) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05341-YGR; granting (339) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05339-YGR; granting (227) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05343-YGR; granting (363) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05333-YGR; granting (367) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05330-YGR; granting (229) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05344-YGR; granting (231) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05342-YGR. NUNC PRO TUNC EFFECTIVE JANUARY 23, 2021.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 16, 2021 Filing 234 Brief re #232 Objection filed byUniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Flowrider, Sept. 22, 2020))(Related document(s) #232 ) (Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 10, 2021 Filing 233 RESPONSE re #232 Objection to Defendant Google LLC's Bill of Costs by Google LLC. (Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
January 27, 2021 Filing 232 OBJECTIONS to re #230 Costs Taxed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 22, 2021 Filing 231 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OBJECTION TO COSTS re #229 Bill of Costs filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Responses due by 1/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 230 Costs Taxed in amount of $632.45 against Uniloc 2017 LLC re #229 Bill of Costs. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 229 BILL OF COSTS (Amended) by Google LLC. Objections due by 2/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas Lee in Support of Defendant Google LLC's Amended Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit C1-C4)(Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 228 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/17/2020, before Judge Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (362 in 4:20-cv-05330-YGR) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/4/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2021. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 1/14/2021)
January 6, 2021 Filing 227 USCA Case Number 2021-1505 Federal Circuit for #225 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 226 BILL OF COSTS by Google LLC. Objections due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas Lee in Support of Defendant Google LLC's Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit C1-C4)(Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 ***DISREGARD, DUPLICATE ENTRY*** Appeal package sent to Federal Circuit via email. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021) Modified on 1/6/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2021 ***DISREGARD, DUPLICATE ENTRY*** appeal package sent to the Federal Circuit via email. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021) Modified on 1/6/2021 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2021 Appeal package sent to the Federal Circuit via email. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
December 31, 2020 Filing 225 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0971-15386405. Appeal Record due by 2/1/2021. (Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 224 NOTICE by Google LLC of Lodging of Unredacted Documents Previously Sought To Be Filed Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Google LLC's Supplemental Brief In Support of Its Renewed Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A (Unredacted), #3 Exhibit B (Unredacted), #4 Exhibit C (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit D (Unredacted))(Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (354) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (357) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:20-cv-04355-YGR; granting (330) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (333) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:20-cv-05334-YGR; granting (204) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (207) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting (208) Motion to Dismiss in case 4:20-cv-05346-YGR; granting (193) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (196) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:20-cv-05345-YGR; granting (309) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (312) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:20-cv-05341-YGR; granting (317) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (320) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:20-cv-05339-YGR; granting (201) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (204) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:20-cv-05343-YGR; granting (337) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (340) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:20-cv-05333-YGR; granting (340) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (343) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:20-cv-05330-YGR; granting (201) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (204) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:20-cv-05344-YGR; granting (207) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (210) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:20-cv-05342-YGR.The Clerk shall close each case. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 222 RESPONSE re #221 Notice (Other) OF RECENT JUDICIAL ACTION by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 221 NOTICE by Google LLC of Recent Judicial Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Order Dismissing Case for Lack of Standing))(Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 219 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC (Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 220 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held via Zoom Webinar and submitted on 11/17/2020. Total Time in Court: 5 minutes [total time for 11 cases is 61 minutes]. Court Reporter: Pam Hebel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 218 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR THE Renewed Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 11/17/2020 02:00 PM viz Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to joi n webinar (public hearings). If you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2020 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 11, 2020 Filing 217 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC OF RECENT JUDICIAL ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 11/11/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 216 Defendant Google LLC's Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing (re #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) and (re #211 Defendant Google LLC's Supplemental Brief In Support of Its Renewed Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Standing) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deepa Archarya, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I)(Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/23/2020) Modified on 10/26/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2020 Filing 215 Supplemental Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss filed byUniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 10/16/2020) Modified on 10/19/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (359) Administrative MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEAL TO 10/16/2020 in case 4:20-cv-04355-YGR; granting (335) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05334-YGR; granting (209) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05346-YGR; granting (197) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05345-YGR; granting (313) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05341-YGR; granting (321) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05339-YGR; granting (206) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05343-YGR; granting (342) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05333-YGR; granting (345) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05330-YGR; granting (206) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05344-YGR; granting (212) Administrative Motion in case 4:20-cv-05342-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 213 Declaration of Aaron S. Jacobs in Support of #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google LLC's Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed byUniloc 2017 LLC. (Related document(s) #210 ) (Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 212 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Extension of Time re #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google LLC's Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Responses due by 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 211 Supplemental Brief re #208 Renotice motion hearing, ([Redacted] Defendant Google LLC's Supplemental Brief In Support of Its Renewed Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Standing) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deepa Acharya ISO Defendant Google LLC's Supplemental Brief, #2 Exhibit A (Redacted), #3 Exhibit B (Redacted), #4 Exhibit C (Redacted), #5 Exhibit D (Redacted), #6 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #208 ) (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Google LLC's Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Berta In Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Defendant Google LLC's Supplemental Brief ISO Its Renewed Motion to Dismiss, #4 Unredacted Version of Defendant Google LLC's Supplemental Brief ISO Its Renewed Motion to Dismiss, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D)(Berta, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 209 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/21/2020, before Judge Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (336 in 4:20-cv-05333-YGR) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2021. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 208 Renotice motion hearing Renewed Motion to Dismiss filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Renewed Motion to Dismiss, #2 Appendix Response to Renewed Motion to Dismiss, #3 Appendix Reply in support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss, #4 Appendix Sur-reply in support of Response to Renewed Motion to Dismiss)(Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 2, 2020 Filing 207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits Accompanying the Parties Filings with Respect to Google's Motion to Dismiss filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Aaron S. Jacobs, #3 Redacted Exhibit C, #4 SEALED Exhibit C, #5 Redacted Exhibit D, #6 SEALED Exhibit D)(Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 10/2/2020) Modified on 10/5/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/24/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 205 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/21/2020. Supplemental Brief re Motion to Dismiss due by 10/9/2020. Responses due by 10/16/2020. Reply due by 10/23/2020. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 11/17/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers to be held via Zoom.Total Time in Court: 5 minutes as to each individual case: 57 minutes total for all related cases. Court Reporter: Pam Hebel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 204 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING AS TO THE Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 9/21/2020 01:00 PM in these related cases. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Please click the link below to join webinars (public hearings). If you are a case participant, you will join as an attendee, then you will be brought into the proceeding by court staff.https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618764848?pwd=bW03Y2NvV0YrK2FQSkxoMXRxOWprQT09Webinar ID: 161 876 4848Password: 715550Local telephone dial-in:US: +1 (669) 254-5252 or +1 (646) 828-7666International numbers available: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/u/advFLxrTkxGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2020 01:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 203 EXHIBITS re #201 Joint Case Management Statement, (Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 248) filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #201 ) (Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 #Electronic filing error. No caption Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a caption page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page require ment and re-file document in its entirety with a caption page. Re: #202 Exhibits filed by Google LLC (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 202 EXHIBITS re #201 Joint Case Management Statement, (Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 248) filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #201 ) (Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 201 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google LLC and Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 205, #4 Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 209, #5 Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 216, #6 Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 218, #7 Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 253, #8 Ex. -493 Case, Dkt. No. 254)(Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/14/2020) Modified on 9/15/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER GRANTING MOTION PRO HAC VICE AS TO ANDREW T. DUFRESNE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers : in case 4:20-cv-05346-YGR; granting (181) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 4:20-cv-05345-YGR; granting (296) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 4:20-cv-05341-YGR; granting (183) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 4:20-cv-05343-YGR; granting (183) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 4:20-cv-05344-YGR; granting (194) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 4:20-cv-05342-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 199 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF POTTER MINTON P.C. by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting (310) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05334-YGR; granting (278) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05340-YGR; granting (190) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05346-YGR; granting (178) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05343-YGR; granting (178) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05344-YGR; granting (187) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05342-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW ETHERIDGE LAW GROUP, PLLC by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ;granting (276) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05340-YGR; granting (187) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05346-YGR; granting (177) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05345-YGR; granting (292) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05341-YGR; granting (299) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05339-YGR; granting (176) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05343-YGR; granting (176) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05344-YGR; granting (190) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05342-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING MOTON TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY AS TO BRIAN KOIDE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ;granting (315) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05334-YGR; granting (279) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05340-YGR; granting (189) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05346-YGR; granting (179) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05345-YGR; granting (294) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05341-YGR; granting (301) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05339-YGR; granting (179) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05343-YGR; granting (313) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05333-YGR; granting (327) Motion to Withdraw in case 4:20-cv-05330-YGR; granting (179) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05344-YGR; granting (192) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 4:20-cv-05342-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 195 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 194 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14844858.) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dufresne, Andrew) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by Dan Levi Bagatell (Bagatell, Dan) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 192 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney BRIAN KOIDE filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Responses due by 8/28/2020. Replies due by 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 191 Certificate of Interested Entities by Uniloc 2017 LLC identifying Corporate Parent CF Uniloc Holdings LLC for Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 190 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ETHERIDGE LAW GROUP, PLLC filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Responses due by 8/27/2020. Replies due by 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 189 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN RELATED CASES. The Court SETs a case management conference for all parties for Monday, September 21, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. PDT. A case management statement is due Monday, September 14, 2020. The Court requests that the parties file one comprehensive statement for all of the Uniloc cases, and include a chart with the proposed dates showing where there is agreement versus disagreement.The Case Management Conference will be held via the Court's Zoom Platform.The Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 187 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 8/25/2020. Replies due by 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER RELATING CASES: the following cases ARE RELATED to case 4:20-cv-4355-YGR: 3:20-cv-5330-WHO; 3;20-cv-5333-WHA; 4:20-cv-5334-JSW; 5:20-cv-5339-EJD; 4:20-cv-5340-JSW; 5:20-cv-5341-LHK; 3:20-cv-5342-WHO; 3:20-cv-5343-VC; 4:20-cv-5344-JST; 5:20-5345-EJD; 4:20-5346-JST. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/10/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 185 NOTICE by Google LLC of Lodging of Notice of Related Cases in a Civil Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, Reassignment Order signed by CLERK on 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 183 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 182 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Uniloc 2017 LLC.. (Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by David Adam Caine on behalf of Defendant Google LLC (Caine, David) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas M Nyemah on behalf of Defendant Google LLC (Nyemah, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 179 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google LLC identifying Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc., Holding Company of Google LLC, Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc., Holding Company of XXVI Holdings Inc for Google LLC. (Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie Phan on behalf of Defendant Google LLC (Phan, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Masanori Koresawa on behalf of Defendant Google LLC (Koresawa, Masanori) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas H Lee on behalf of Defendant Google LLC (Lee, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Berta on behalf of Defendant Google LLC (Berta, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 174 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint case management statement due by 9/2/2020, including the parties' consent or declination to proceed before magistrate judge. Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2020, at 10:00 AM, by telephone. Parties by 8/14 to file notice of any related cases. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/cousins-nathanael-nc/ (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 173 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00548. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 17, 2020 Filing 172 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Seth Jacobs on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Jacobs, Aaron)
July 17, 2020 Filing 171 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Gannon, Kevin)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #79 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED]. ORDERED that the above-captioned case be transferred to the Northern District of California. It is further ORDERED that the unreached deadlines in the Docket Control Order are VACATED. See Dkt. No. 169. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/19/2020. (ch, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 169 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Stay Pending Transfer by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 29, 2020 Filing 168 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Carson Dean Anderson on behalf of Google LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7812816. (Anderson, Carson)
May 28, 2020 Filing 167 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Conor Reidy on behalf of Google LLC (Reidy, Patrick)
May 28, 2020 Filing 166 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Masanori Koresawa on behalf of Google LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7810722. (Koresawa, Masanori)
May 26, 2020 Filing 165 NOTICE by Google LLC re #79 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED], #78 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING AND IMPROPER VENUE Notice of Request for Ruling on Defendant's Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Transfer (Jones, Michael)
May 19, 2020 Filing 164 NOTICE by Google LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. JOINT MOTION PURUANT TO COURT'S ORDER OF MARCH 20, 2020 (Jones, Michael)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER TO CONTINUE STAY OF CASE re #161 Notice (Other) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/20/2020. (nkl, ) Modified on 3/20/2020 (nkl, ).
March 19, 2020 Filing 162 REDACTION to #159 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -December subpoena email, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 18, 2020 Filing 161 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC re #152 Order Staying Case (JOINT SUBMISSION PURSUANT TO COURTS ORDER OF FEBRUARY 14, 2020) (Etheridge, James)
March 17, 2020 Filing 160 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing Proceedings held on 03/12/2020 before Judge Roy S. Payne. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 4/7/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2020. (sms, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 159 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #155 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Protective Order against non-party subpoenas filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -December subpoena email, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Filing 158 Emergency MOTION OPPOSED MOTION TO MODIFY DISCOVERY DEADLINES AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER TO FORBID DEPOSITIONS FOR A LIMITED TIME PERIOD TO AVOID COVID-19 by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of James Etheridge, #2 Exhibit A - CNN March 3 Coronavirus Article, #3 Exhibit B - Governor Newsom Declares State of Emergency, #4 Exhibit C -- Santa Clara County Directive, #5 Exhibit D - Google CEO Tweet, #6 Exhibit E -- WHO Pandemic, #7 Exhibit F -- White House Santa Clara Community, #8 Exhibit G -- Mountain View Emergency Declaration, #9 Exhibit H -- Palo Alto Emergency Proclamation, #10 Exhibit I -- Big Tech Firms Article, #11 Exhibit J -- White House Press Conference,, #12 Exhibit K -- Ltr from M. Jones to J. Etheridge of 03-12-2002, #13 Exhibit L -- NPR Article re Flattening a Curve, #14 Exhibit M -- Military Travel Ban, #15 Exhibit N -- White House March 14 Press Conference, #16 Exhibit O -- Marshall Suspends Schools, #17 Exhibit P -- Marshall Suspends Events Article, #18 Exhibit Q -- Mercury News Article, #19 Exhibit R -- CNN March 15 Article, #20 Exhibit S -- NBC News Fauci Interview, #21 Exhibit T -- SCOTUS Press Release, #22 Exhibit U -- CNN March 16 Article, #23 Exhibit V -- CNN Asymptomatic Article, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 157 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Status Conference held on 3/12/2020. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
March 7, 2020 Filing 156 REDACTION to #155 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Protective Order against non-party subpoenas by Uniloc Licensing USA LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Travis Richins, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
March 3, 2020 Filing 155 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Protective Order against non-party subpoenas by Uniloc Licensing USA LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Richins Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #135 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/19/2020. (klc, )
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER to Pay Technical Advisor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/18/2020. (nkl, )
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER STAYING Action for 30 Days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/14/2020. (klc, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 151 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #140 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Uniloc's Untimely Served Objections to Interrogatories and to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Responses filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Loveless, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
February 14, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 150 RESPONSE in Opposition re #138 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Nyemah Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1: Email Uniloc to Google, #3 Exhibit 2: Email Google to Uniloc, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 12, 2020 Filing 149 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #132 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File SUBMIT A REBUTTAL EXPERT DECLARATION OR TO STRIKE UNILOCS EXTRINSIC DEFINITIONS AND ARGUMENTS THAT SUCH DEFINITIONS SUPPORT filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC . (Loveless, Ryan)
February 12, 2020 Filing 148 REDACTION to #145 Sealed Response to Motion, by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Nyemah Declaration, #2 Exhibit REDACTED Ex. 1 - 2020.01.06 Email Google to Uniloc, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Filing 147 RESPONSE in Opposition re #135 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #123 Order,, Scheduling Order,, Terminate Motions, filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Samartino Declaration, #2 Ex 1 - 496 Google Invalidity Contentions, #3 Ex 2 - 503 Google Invalidity Contentions, #4 Ex 3 - 504 Google Invalidity Contentions, #5 Ex 4 - 548 Google Invalidity Contentions, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Clutter, Patrick)
February 11, 2020 Filing 146 STATUS REPORT ON MEET AND CONFER OBLIGATIONS RELATING TO DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Google LLC. (Thames, Earl)
February 10, 2020 Filing 145 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #134 Opposed MOTION to Compel Identification and Production of Financial Documents filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Nyemah Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1: 1/6 email meet and confer, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 144 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended(Folsom, David)
February 6, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #140 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Uniloc's Untimely Served Objections to Interrogatories and to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Responses, #138 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery, #142 Opposed MOTION to Strike Invalidity Contentions, #134 Opposed MOTION to Compel Identification and Production of Financial Documents : Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re #132 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File SUBMIT A REBUTTAL EXPERT DECLARATION OR TO STRIKE UNILOCS EXTRINSIC DEFINITIONS AND ARGUMENTS THAT SUCH DEFINITIONS SUPPORT filed by Google LLC. (Jones, Michael)
February 3, 2020 Filing 142 Opposed MOTION to Strike Invalidity Contentions by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Responses due by 2/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Declaration of Ryan Loveless, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
February 3, 2020 Filing 141 REDACTION to #140 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Uniloc's Untimely Served Objections to Interrogatories and to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Responses by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Phan, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 31, 2020 Filing 140 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Uniloc's Untimely Served Objections to Interrogatories and to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Responses by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Phan, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2020: #3 Corrected Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER - Markman Hearing set for 2/18/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/20/2020. (ch, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 138 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
January 29, 2020 Filing 137 RESPONSE to Motion re #132 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File SUBMIT A REBUTTAL EXPERT DECLARATION OR TO STRIKE UNILOCS EXTRINSIC DEFINITIONS AND ARGUMENTS THAT SUCH DEFINITIONS SUPPORT filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/28/2020. (ch, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 135 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #123 Order,, Scheduling Order,, Terminate Motions, by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
January 26, 2020 Filing 134 Opposed MOTION to Compel Identification and Production of Financial Documents by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
January 16, 2020 Filing 133 REDACTION to #131 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Richins Declaration, #2 Exhibit DN Reports, #3 Exhibit B - E fully redacted, #4 Affidavit Day Declaration, #5 Exhibit Declaration)(Etheridge, James)
January 15, 2020 Filing 132 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File SUBMIT A REBUTTAL EXPERT DECLARATION OR TO STRIKE UNILOCS EXTRINSIC DEFINITIONS AND ARGUMENTS THAT SUCH DEFINITIONS SUPPORT by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Samartino Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Uniloc P.R. 4-2 Disclosure (548), #3 Exhibit 2 - 2019-11-11 N. Lee to Etheridge re Uniloc's PR 4-2 disclosure served 10-8-2019, #4 Exhibit 3 - Supplemental Delp Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 13, 2020 Filing 131 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #79 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED] filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Day, #2 Day Declaration - Exhibit 1, #3 Second Declaration of Travis Richins, #4 Richins Exhibit A, #5 Richins Exhibit B, #6 Richins Exhibit C, #7 Richins Exhibit D, #8 Richins Exhibit E)(Etheridge, James)
January 7, 2020 Filing 130 Joint Claim Construction Chart by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Berta, Michael)
January 6, 2020 Filing 129 NOTICE from District Court of Luxembourg (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(ch, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 128 REPLY in support of #117 Claim Construction Brief filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC . (Etheridge, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 127 REDACTION to #126 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Samartino Declaration, #2 Exhibit AAA - redacted in entirety, #3 Exhibit AAB - redacted in entirety, #4 Exhibit AAC - redacted in entirety, #5 Exhibit AAD - redacted in entirety, #6 Exhibit AAE - redacted in entirety, #7 Exhibit AAF - DN stats (1-1-16), #8 Exhibit AAG - redacted in entirety)(Jones, Michael)
December 30, 2019 Filing 126 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #79 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED] filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Samartino Declaration, #2 Exhibit AAA - 2019.10.03 Objections to 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice Topics to Uniloc 2017 LLC, #3 Exhibit AAB - 2019.10.17 - Response to Google October 10 letter re 30(b)(6), #4 Exhibit AAC - 2019.10.10 - Follow-Up Letter to Etchegoyen Deposition, #5 Exhibit AAD - 2019.07.26 Fortress Investment Group Subpoena, #6 Exhibit AAE - Patrick Orr - Confidential_mini [excerpted], #7 Exhibit AAF - DN stats (1-1-16), #8 Exhibit AAG - Lou Wang Dep Excerpts)(Jones, Michael)
December 27, 2019 Filing 125 Responsive CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Samartino, #2 Ex A - USP 6,253,201, #3 Ex B - 2000-07-12 Amend from UNILOC_6253201_00000045, #4 Ex C - 2000-10-12 Office Action from UNILOC_6253201_00000045, #5 Ex D - 2000-03-16 Office Action from UNILOC_6253201_00000045, #6 Ex E - 2001-01-19 Amend after Final from UNILOC_6253201_00000045, #7 Ex F - Notice of Allowability from UNILOC_6253201_00000045, #8 Ex G - Uniloc PR 4-2 Disclosure (548), #9 Ex H - Uniloc PR 4-1 Proposed Claim Terms for Construction, #10 Ex I - Google PR 4-1 Disclosures, #11 Ex J - 2018-11-18 Delp Declaration)(Jones, Michael)
December 20, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC re #122 Order, Scheduling Order (Notice of Compliance) (Loveless, Ryan)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Jury Selection set for 8/17/2020 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Markman Hearing set for 2/19/2020 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions due by 6/22/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/6/2020.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/19/2019. (ch, )
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR AND SCHEDULING FOR MARKMANHEARINGS - Markman Hearing set for 2/19/2020 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/19/2019. (nkl, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 121 Joint MOTION to Amend Docket Control Order re #74 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Table, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
December 18, 2019 Filing 120 REDACTION to #114 Sealed Response to Motion,, to Transfer Venue by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Travis Richins, #2 Richins Exhibit 1, #3 Richins Exhibit 2, #4 Richins Exhibit 3, #5 Richins Exhibit 4, #6 Richins Exhibit 5, #7 Richins Exhibit 6, #8 Richins Exhibit 8, #9 Richins Exhibit 9, #10 Richins Exhibit 10, #11 Richins Exhibit 11, #12 Richins Exhibit 12, #13 Richins Exhibit 13, #14 Declaration of Sean Burdick, #15 Declaration of James Palmer, #16 Declaration of Steve Pedersen, #17 Declaration of Drake Turner, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
December 16, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC Joint Notice Regarding Proposed Case Groupings for Markman Hearings (Loveless, Ryan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google LLC RE TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL (Jones, Michael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 117 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US 6253501, #2 Exhibit 2 - Modern Dictionary of Electronics)(Etheridge, James)
December 12, 2019 Filing 116 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #114 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Richins 11-1, #2 Exhibit Richins 11-2, #3 Exhibit Richins 11-3, #4 Exhibit Richins 11-4, #5 Exhibit Richins 11-5, #6 Exhibit Richins 11-6, #7 Exhibit Richins 11-7, #8 Exhibit Richins 11-8, #9 Exhibit Richins 11-9, #10 Exhibit Richins 11-10, #11 Exhibit Richins 11-11, #12 Exhibit Richins 11-12)(Etheridge, James)
December 12, 2019 Filing 115 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #114 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Turner, #2 Affidavit Pedersen, #3 Affidavit Burdick, #4 Affidavit Palmer)(Etheridge, James)
December 12, 2019 Filing 114 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #79 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED] filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Richins, #2 Exhibit Richins 1, #3 Exhibit Richins 2, #4 Exhibit Richins 3, #5 Exhibit Richins 4, #6 Exhibit Richins 5, #7 Exhibit Richins 6, #8 Exhibit Richins 8, #9 Exhibit Richins 9, #10 Exhibit Richins 10, #11 Exhibit Richins 12, #12 Exhibit Richins 13, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER - The Court issues this Order sua sponte.The Court enters this Order to address the upcoming schedule for Markman hearings in Case Nos. 2:18-cv-548-JRG, 2:18-cv-550-JRG, 2:18-cv-551-JRG, 2:18-cv-552-JRG, and 2:18-cv-553-JRG.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/10/2019. (nkl, )
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #109 Joint MOTION to Modify Markman Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/10/2019. (ch, )
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Motion to Modify Briefing on 1404 Venue Motions. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/6/2019. (nkl, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 110 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Schedule on 1404 Venue Briefing by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 109 Joint MOTION to Modify Markman Briefing Schedule by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
November 30, 2019 Filing 108 REDACTION to #107 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, Google's Renewed Motion to Dismiss by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Loveless, #2 Exhibit A)(Etheridge, James)
November 26, 2019 Filing 107 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #78 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING AND IMPROPER VENUE filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-Dispute Agreement, #2 Exhibit Second Loveless Declaration with Ex. A)(Etheridge, James)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER finding as moot #66 Sealed Motion to Compel Production of Log Files. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/22/2019. (nkl, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 105 REDACTION to #104 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,,,,, DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING AND IMPROPER VENUE by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Clark Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. MM - McCallion DDT Depo (FULLY REDACTED), #3 Exhibit Ex. NN - Ex. 17 to Opposition (FULLY REDACTED), #4 Exhibit Ex. OO - Ex. 19 to Opposition (PUBLIC) - 2, #5 Exhibit EX. PP - Ex. H with Bates Number (FULLY REDACTED - 2, #6 Exhibit Ex. QQ -(Pandian Depo) (FULLY REDACTED), #7 Exhibit Ex. RR - Livingston Deposition Transcript (FULLY REDACTED), #8 Exhibit Ex. SS Parts 1 and 2 - Ex. 8 to Opposition (FULLY REDACTED), #9 Exhibit Ex. TT Parts 1-3 - Ex. 6 to Livingston Deposition (FULLY REDACTED), #10 Exhibit Ex. UU - Ex. G with Bates Number (PUBLIC), #11 Exhibit Ex. VV - Ex. L with Bates Number (FULLY REDACTED), #12 Exhibit Ex. WW - Fractus v. ZTE (PUBLIC), #13 Exhibit Ex. XX, DDT v Qualcomm Order (PUBLIC), #14 Exhibit Ex. YY, USPN 3,711,262 (PUBLIC), #15 Exhibit Ex. ZZ, HowStuffWorks (PUBLIC))(Jones, Michael)
November 20, 2019 Filing 104 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #78 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING AND IMPROPER VENUE filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Clark Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. MM - McCallion DDT Depo (UNDER SEAL), #3 Exhibit Ex. NN - Ex. 17 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit Ex. OO - Ex. 19 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL) - 2, #5 Exhibit EX. PP - Ex. H with Bates Number (UNDER SEAL) - 2, #6 Exhibit Ex. QQ -(Pandian Depo) (UNDER SEAL), #7 Exhibit Ex. RR - Livingston Deposition Transcript (UNDER SEAL), #8 Exhibit Ex. SS Part 1 - Ex. 8 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL), #9 Exhibit Ex. SS Part 2 - Ex. 8 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL), #10 Exhibit Ex. TT Part 1 - Ex. 6 to Livingston Deposition (UNDER SEAL), #11 Exhibit Ex. TT Part 2 - Ex. 6 to Livingston Deposition (UNDER SEAL), #12 Exhibit Ex. TT Part 3 - Ex. 6 to Livingston Deposition (UNDER SEAL), #13 Exhibit Ex. UU - Ex. G with Bates Number (PUBLIC), #14 Exhibit Ex. VV - Ex. L with Bates Number (UNDER SEAL), #15 Exhibit Ex. WW - Fractus v. ZTE (PUBLIC), #16 Exhibit Ex. XX, DDT v Qualcomm Order (PUBLIC), #17 Exhibit Ex. YY, USPN 3,711,262 (PUBLIC), #18 Exhibit Ex. ZZ, HowStuffWorks (PUBLIC))(Jones, Michael)
November 20, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion submitted document #102 does not contain a Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal per Local Rule CV-5(a)(7)(A). Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 103 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Loveless, Ryan)
November 19, 2019 Filing 102 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #78 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING AND IMPROPER VENUE filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Clark Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. MM - McCallion DDT Depo (UNDER SEAL), #3 Exhibit Ex. NN - Ex. 17 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit Ex. OO - Ex. 19 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL) - 2, #5 Exhibit EX. PP - Ex. H with Bates Number (UNDER SEAL) - 2, #6 Exhibit Ex. QQ -(Pandian Depo) (UNDER SEAL), #7 Exhibit Ex. RR - Livingston Deposition Transcript (UNDER SEAL), #8 Exhibit Ex. SS Part 1 - Ex. 8 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL), #9 Exhibit Ex. SS Part 2 - Ex. 8 to Opposition (UNDER SEAL), #10 Exhibit Ex. TT Part 1 - Ex. 6 to Livingston Deposition (UNDER SEAL), #11 Exhibit Ex. TT Part 2 - Ex. 6 to Livingston Deposition (UNDER SEAL), #12 Exhibit Ex. TT Part 3 - Ex. 6 to Livingston Deposition (UNDER SEAL), #13 Exhibit Ex. UU - Ex. G with Bates Number (PUBLIC), #14 Exhibit Ex. VV - Ex. L with Bates Number (UNDER SEAL), #15 Exhibit Ex. WW - Fractus v. ZTE (PUBLIC), #16 Exhibit Ex. XX, DDT v Qualcomm Order (PUBLIC), #17 Exhibit Ex. YY, USPN 3,711,262 (PUBLIC), #18 Exhibit Ex. ZZ, HowStuffWorks (PUBLIC))(Jones, Michael) Modified on 11/20/2019 (nkl, ).
November 19, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Matthew Koide on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Koide, Brian)
November 18, 2019 Filing 100 REDACTION to #99 Sealed Patent Document Joint Status Report by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Fully Redacted)(Jones, Michael)
November 16, 2019 Filing 99 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Joint Status Report. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Non Dispute Agreement)(Jones, Michael)
November 12, 2019 Filing 98 REDACTION to #93 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Google's Renewed Motion to Dismiss by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Loveless, #2 Loveless Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of James Palmer, #4 Second Declaration of James Palmer, #5 First Declaration of Drake Turner, #6 Turner Exhibits A - D, #7 Second Turner Declaration, #8 Second Turner Declaration Exhibits A-D, #9 Declaration of Travis Richins, #10 Richins Exhibit A, #11 Richins Exhibit B, #12 Richins Exhibit C, #13 Proposed Order, #14 PMC Response to Google Motion to Dismiss, #15 Lusztig Declaration, #16 Lusztig Exhibits 2-10, #17 Lusztig Exhibit 12, #18 Lusztig Exhibits 15-18, #19 Lusztig Exhibit 19, #20 Lusztig Exhibit 20)(Etheridge, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 97 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #96 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, #93 Sealed Response to Motion,,, #94 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, #95 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lusztig 16, #2 Exhibit Lusztig 17, #3 Exhibit Lusztig 18, #4 Exhibit Lusztig 19, #5 Exhibit Lusztig 20)(Etheridge, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 96 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #93 Sealed Response to Motion,,, #94 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, #95 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lusztig 10, #2 Exhibit Lusztig 12, #3 Exhibit Lusztig 15)(Etheridge, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 95 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #93 Sealed Response to Motion,,, #94 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lusztig 8, #2 Exhibit Lusztig 9)(Etheridge, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 94 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #93 Sealed Response to Motion,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PMC Brief, #2 Affidavit Lusztig Decl., #3 Exhibit Lusztig 2, #4 Exhibit Lusztig 3, #5 Exhibit Lusztig 4, #6 Exhibit Lusztig 5, #7 Exhibit Lusztig 6, #8 Exhibit Lusztig 7)(Etheridge, James)
November 8, 2019 Filing 93 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #78 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING AND IMPROPER VENUE filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Loveless Decl., #2 Exhibit Loveless Ex. A, #3 Affidavit Palmer Decl., #4 Affidavit Palmer Decl. 2, #5 Affidavit Turner Decl., #6 Exhibit Turner Ex A, #7 Exhibit Turner Ex B, #8 Exhibit Turner Ex C, #9 Exhibit Turner Ex D, #10 Affidavit Turner Decl. 2, #11 Exhibit Turner 2 Ex A, #12 Exhibit Turner 2 Ex B, #13 Exhibit Turner 2 Ex C, #14 Exhibit Richins Decl, #15 Exhibit Richins A, #16 Exhibit Richins B, #17 Exhibit Richins C, #18 Exhibit Richins D, #19 Exhibit Richins E, #20 Exhibit Richins F, #21 Exhibit Richins G, #22 Exhibit Richins H, #23 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to Koninklijke Philips N.V. (f.k.a. Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2019. (nkl, )
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #89 Motion to Modify Briefing on 1404 Venue Motions. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2019. (nkl, )
November 7, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 86, SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ITS RULE 30(B)(6) NOTICE AND STANDING AND VENUE-RELATED REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to Koninklijke Philips N.V. (f.k.a. Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.) by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Letter Request, #2 Exhibit B: Protective Order (548), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION re #87 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, modify briefing schedule as to 1404 issues only by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
November 1, 2019 Filing 88 REDACTION to #86 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ITS RULE 30(B)(6) NOTICE AND STANDING AND VENUE-RELATED REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 [redacted] Tse Declaration ISO MTC, #2 [redacted] Exhibit A - [excerpted] 10-4-19 Etch deposition, #3 [redacted] Proposed Order Granting MTC)(Jones, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #78 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING AND IMPROPER VENUE, #79 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED] Responses due by 11/8/2019 Replies due by 11/19/2019.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/30/2019. (nkl, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 86 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ITS RULE 30(B)(6) NOTICE AND STANDING AND VENUE-RELATED REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Tse Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - [excerpted] 10-4-19 Etch deposition, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 11/7/2019 (nkl, ).
October 28, 2019 Filing 85 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #79 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED], #78 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING AND IMPROPER VENUE by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 84 REDACTION to #78 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING AND IMPROPER VENUE by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Doak Dec, #2 Affidavit Clark Dec., #3 Exhibit Exhibit _A - BMC v. Cherwell VAED-1-17-cv-01074_Dkt. 55 (PUBLIC), #4 Exhibit Exhibit _B - Orr Declaration (PUBLIC), #5 Exhibit Exhibit _C - March 21 2019 Lim - Uniloc Declaration (PUBLIC), #6 Exhibit Exhibit _D -RSA Excerpts_Fully Redacted, #7 Exhibit Exhibit _E -Fortress License Agreement_Fully Redacted, #8 Exhibit Exhibit _F - Erez Levy Depo_Fully Redacted, #9 Exhibit Exhibit _G - Drake Turner Depo_Fully Redacted, #10 Exhibit Exhibit _H - Mgmt Report year ended 30 June 2017_Fully Redacted, #11 Exhibit Exhibit _I - Third Amendment to RSA_Fully Redacted, #12 Exhibit Exhibit _J - IPR2013-0039_Fully Redacted, #13 Exhibit Exhibit _K - E.D. Tex. 14-cv-00625 dckt (PUBLIC), #14 Exhibit Exhibit _L - Asset Purchase Agreement_Fully Redacted, #15 Exhibit Exhibit _M - Termination Agreement_Fully Redacted, #16 Exhibit Exhibit _N - Payoff and Termination Agreement_Fully Redacted, #17 Exhibit Exhibit _O - Patent Assignment_Fully Redacted, #18 Exhibit Exhibit _P.1 - Etchegoyen Depo_Fully Redacted, #19 Exhibit Exhibit _Q - Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple MTD_Fully Redacted, #20 Exhibit Exhibit _R - Palmer Declarations_Fully Redacted, #21 Exhibit Exhibit _S - _2017-to-Licensing License_Fully Redacted, #22 Exhibit Exhibit _T - Amended 2017-to-Licensing License_Fully Redacted, #23 Exhibit Exhibit _U - Amended and Restated Note Purchase and Security_Fully Redacted, #24 Exhibit Exhibit _V - Etchegoyen Depo Notice (PUBLIC), #25 Exhibit Exhibit _W - McCallion First MTD Declaration (PUBLIC), #26 Exhibit Exhibit _X - McCallion Deposition_Fully Redacted, #27 Exhibit Exhibit _Y - Draining Ticket (Ex. 3 to McCallion Depo)_Fully Redacte, #28 Exhibit Exhibit _Z - 2019-10-15 McCallion Declaration_Fully Redacted, #29 Exhibit Exhibit AA- 2019-10-14 Honti Declaration_Fully Redacted, #30 Exhibit Exhibit BB - McCallion PMC Declaration_Fully Redacted, #31 Exhibit Exhibit CC - MasterMind Charts_Fully Redacted, #32 Exhibit Exhibit DD - ISP Emails_Fully Redacted, #33 Exhibit Exhibit EE - Arscott Declaration Signed (PUBLIC), #34 Exhibit Exhibit FF - T-Mobile Agreement_Fully Redacted, #35 Exhibit Exhibit GG - Sprint Agreement_Fully Redacted, #36 Exhibit Exhibit HH - Joshua Cha (megaport) Declaration Signed (PUBLIC), #37 Exhibit Exhibit II - Signed Krause Declaration Re Express (PUBLIC), #38 Exhibit Exhibit JJ - '712 Patent (550-case) [DI 23-18] (PUBLIC), #39 Exhibit Exhibit KK - '960 Patent (550-case) [DI 23-19] (PUBLIC), #40 Exhibit Exhibit LL - '908 Patent (553-case) [DI 21-20] (PUBLIC), #41 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Extension of Time to File Redactions to Renewed Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Transfer Venue. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/23/2019. (nkl, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 82 REDACTION to #79 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED] by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Tekell, #2 Declaration of J. Vallery, #3 Declaration of B. Phan, #4 A - Redacted in its Entirety, #5 B - Redacted in its Entirety, #6 Exhibit C - Lim Declaration, #7 D - Redacted in its Entirety, #8 E - Redacted in its Entirety, #9 Exhibit F - Turner LinkedIn, #10 Exhibit G - TXED-2-17-cv-00258-104 (excerpted), #11 H - Redacted in its Entirety, #12 I - Redacted in its Entirety, #13 Exhibit J - Etchegoyen LinkedIn, #14 Exhibit K - SOS search result re Uniloc 2017, #15 Exhibit L - Burdick 258 deposition (excerpted), #16 M - Redacted in its Entirety, #17 N - Redacted in its Entirety, #18 O - Redacted in its Entirety, #19 P - Redacted in its Entirety, #20 Q - Redacted in its Entirety, #21 R - Redacted in its Entirety, #22 S - Redacted in its Entirety, #23 T - Redacted in its Entirety, #24 U - Redacted in its Entirety, #25 V - Redacted in its Entirety, #26 Exhibit W - Meisinger LinkedIn, #27 X - Redacted in its Entirety, #28 Exhibit Y - Fortress location, #29 Z- Redacted in its Entirety, #30 zExhibit AA - D. Del. 19-mc-00202 dckt 000001_000 filed 2019-08-14, #31 AB - Redacted in its Entirety, #32 AC - Redacted in its Entirety, #33 AD - Redacted in its Entirety, #34 zExhibit AE - Levy -360 deposition (excerpted), #35 zExhibit AF - Turner -360 deposition (excerpted), #36 AG - Redacted in its Entirety, #37 AH - Redacted in its Entirety, #38 AI - Redacted in its Entirety, #39 AJ - Redacted in its Entirety, #40 AK - Redacted in its Entirety, #41 AL - Redacted in its Entirety, #42 AM - Redacted in its Entirety, #43 AN - Redacted in its Entirety, #44 AO - Redacted in its Entirety, #45 AP - Redacted in its Entirety, #46 zExhibit AQ - Table C-5, #47 zExhibit AR - fcms_na_distprofile0630.2019, #48 zExhibit AS - US5579471, #49 zExhibit AT - US5465353, #50 zExhibit AU - Ronald Barber LinkedIn, #51 zExhibit AV - Dragutin Petkovic _ LinkedIn, #52 zExhibit AW - Peter Hart Linkedin, #53 Text of Proposed Order)(Clutter, Patrick)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER finding as moot #24 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot #28 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/23/2019. (nkl, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Redactions to Renewed Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Transfer Venue by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 79 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 [RENEWED] by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A, Tekell, #2 Declaration of J. Vallery, #3 Declaration of B. Phan, #4 Exhibit A - 2019.06.28 DN 26-2 Decl of P. Orr, #5 Exhibit B - 2019-10-17 Google Initial Disclosures (1st Amended) (548 case), #6 Exhibit C - Lim Declaration, #7 Exhibit D - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0030312 [Drake Turner Depo_1.15.19], #8 Exhibit E - 10-4-19 Etchegoyen deposition, #9 Exhibit F - Turner LinkedIn, #10 Exhibit G - TXED-2-17-cv-00258-104 (excerpted), #11 Exhibit H - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0007333 [Sean Burdick Depo_3.19.19], #12 Exhibit I - Uniloc CP to G 0011376 [2nd Amended & Restated Operating Agrmt of Uniloc 2017 LLC], #13 Exhibit J - Etchegoyen LinkedIn, #14 Exhibit K - SOS search result re Uniloc 2017, #15 Exhibit L - Burdick 258 deposition (excerpted), #16 Exhibit M - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0028669 [11-7-18 Burdick depo], #17 Exhibit N - NDTX - Caddo Mills, #18 Exhibit O - NDTX - White Settlement, #19 Exhibit P - NDTX - Rockwall, #20 Exhibit Q - Uniloc CP to G 0009317 [Amendment No. 1 to License Agmt btw Uniloc 2017 & Uniloc Licensi USA], #21 Exhibit R - Uniloc CP to Google 0009327 [Amendment No. 1 to License Agreement btw Uniloc 2017 & Uniloc USA], #22 Exhibit S - Uniloc Common Production to Google002648 [License Agreement btw Uniloc 2017 & Uniloc Lux], #23 Exhibit T - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0005080 [Drake Turner Depo_10.8.18], #24 Exhibit U - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0010357 [Earnout and Release Agreement], #25 Exhibit V - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0010791 [Employment Agreement], #26 Exhibit W - Meisinger LinkedIn, #27 Exhibit X - Pantros acquisition, #28 Exhibit Y - Fortress location, #29 Exhibit Z - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0010813 [Limited Liability Company Agreement of Uniloc 2017 LLC, #30 zExhibit AA - D. Del. 19-mc-00202 dckt 000001_000 filed 2019-08-14, #31 zExhibit AB - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0009840 [Note Purchase and Security Agreement], #32 zExhibit AC - Uniloc CP to G 0011253 [Third Amd to Revenue Sharing & Note and W PA], #33 zExhibit AD - Uniloc Common Production to Google 0011354, #34 zExhibit AE - Levy -360 deposition (excerpted), #35 zExhibit AF - Turner -360 deposition (excerpted), #36 zExhibit AG - Zur, #37 zExhibit AH - Briger LinkedIn, #38 zExhibit AI - Furstein, #39 zExhibit AJ - Sorkin LinkedIn, #40 zExhibit AK - Johnson LinkedIn, #41 zExhibit AL - Erez Levy LinkedIn Profile, #42 zExhibit AM - Palmer LinkedIn, #43 zExhibit AN - Michele Moreland LinkedIn Profile, #44 zExhibit AO - Shtein, #45 zExhibit AP - Uniloc Common Production to Google002802, #46 zExhibit AQ - Table C-5, #47 zExhibit AR - fcms_na_distprofile0630.2019, #48 zExhibit AS - US5579471, #49 zExhibit AT - US5465353, #50 zExhibit AU - Ronald Barber LinkedIn, #51 zExhibit AV - Dragutin Petkovic _ LinkedIn, #52 zExhibit AW - Peter Hart Linkedin, #53 Text of Proposed Order)(Clutter, Patrick)
October 18, 2019 Filing 78 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING AND IMPROPER VENUE by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit D. Doak, #2 Affidavit D. Clark, #3 Exhibit A: BMC v. Cherwell, #4 Exhibit B: Orr Dec, #5 Exhibit C: March 21, 2019 Uniloc Dec, #6 Exhibit D: RSA Excerpts, #7 Exhibit E: Fortress License Agmt, #8 Exhibit F: E. Levy Depo, #9 Exhibit G: D. Turner Depo, #10 Exhibit H: Mgt Rpt yr ended 30 June 2017, #11 Exhibit I: Third Amendment to RSA, #12 Exhibit J: IPR2019-0039, #13 Exhibit K: E.D. Tex. 14cv625, #14 Exhibit L: Asset Purchase Agmt, #15 Exhibit M: Termination Agmt, #16 Exhibit N: Payoff and Termination Agmt, #17 Exhibit O: Patent Assignment, #18 Exhibit P: Etchegoyen Depo, #19 Exhibit Q: Plf Opp to Apple MTD, #20 Exhibit R: Palmer Dec, #21 Exhibit S: 2017 to Licensing License, #22 Exhibit T: Am 2017 to Licensing License, #23 Exhibit U: Am and Restated Note Purchase and Sec Agmt, #24 Exhibit V: Etchegoyen Depo Notice, #25 Exhibit W: McCallion First MTD Dec, #26 Exhibit X: McCallion Depo, #27 Exhibit Y: Draining Ticket, #28 Exhibit Z: McCallion Dec 10-15-19, #29 Exhibit AA: 10-14-19, #30 Exhibit BB: McCallion PMC Dec, #31 Exhibit CC: MasterMind Charts, #32 Exhibit DD: ISP Emails, #33 Exhibit EE: Arscott Dec, #34 Exhibit FF: T-Mobile Agmt, #35 Exhibit GG: Sprint Agmt, #36 Exhibit HH: J. Cha Dec, #37 Exhibit II: Krause Dec, #38 Exhibit JJ: '712 Patent, #39 Exhibit KK: '960 Patent, #40 Exhibit LL: '908 Patent, #41 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 77 REDACTION to #76 Sealed Response to Motion, Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit McCallion Declaration, #2 Affidavit Honti Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 17, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 75, SEALED RESPONSE to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 76 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #66 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit McCallion Declaration, #2 Affidavit Honti Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Filing 75 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #66 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit McCallion Declaration, #2 Affidavit Honti Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 10/17/2019 (nkl, ).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #73 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/15/2019. (nkl, )
October 15, 2019 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/26/2019. (nkl, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 73 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #48 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Scheduling Order,, Docket Control Order by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Amended Docket Control Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #66 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files Responses due by 10/16/2019. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/10/2019. (nkl, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc 2017 LLC Service of P.R. 4-2 Proposed Claim Constructions (Loveless, Ryan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #66 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google LLC P.R. 4-2 (Jones, Michael)
October 8, 2019 Filing 68 REDACTION to #66 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redactions to McCallion Transcript)(Loveless, Ryan)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Entry of Modified Scheduling Order Following Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/30/2019. (nkl, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 66 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Log Files by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - McCallion Depo Excerpts, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Entry of Modified Scheduling Order Following Order on Motion to Compel by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Uniloc's Proposed Modified Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B - Google's Proposed Modified Scheduling Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC re #61 Order on Motion to Compel (Joint Notice by Parties in Response to Order) (Etheridge, James)
September 17, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE by Google LLC of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 & Court's Docket Control Order (D.I. 48) (Berta, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc 2017 LLC P.R. 4-1 Proposed Claim Terms for Construction (Loveless, Ryan)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #57 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/16/2019. (nkl, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 Opposed MOTION to Compel filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google LLC regarding Compliance with PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Jones, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Filing 58 STATUS REPORT ON MEET AND CONFER OBLIGATIONS RELATING TO DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Etheridge, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 57 Opposed MOTION to Compel by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Request for Venue Discovery, #2 Exhibit B - Google Objections to Venue Document Requests, #3 Exhibit C - Google Responses to 1st Request for Documents, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 Joint MOTION Modify Scheduling Order re Standing/Venue re 52 Agreed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order ; Denying as moot #52 . Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/13/2019. (ch, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY IN PATENT CASES re #54 Motion for Entry of ESI Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/8/2019. (nkl, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Entry of ESI Discovery Order by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 53 Joint MOTION Modify Scheduling Order re Standing/Venue re #52 Agreed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order , #44 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
July 30, 2019 Filing 52 Agreed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/24/2019. (nkl, )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Issuance of Letter Request. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/24/2019. (nkl, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE by Google LLC Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Berta, Michael)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #42 Joint MOTION to Enter Docket Control Order filed by Google LLC., Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 11/5/2019., Jury Selection set for 7/6/2020 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Markman Hearing set for 1/21/2020 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in Limine due by 5/11/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/26/2020. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/2019. (nkl, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Submission of Proposed Protective Order by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION Issuance of Letter Request to Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Letters Request, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DISCOVERY ORDER granting #43 Motion to Enter Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/17/2019. (nkl, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Entry of Schedule to Govern Discovery and Briefing Pertaining to Standing and Venue. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/16/2019. (nkl, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 43 Joint MOTION to Enter Discovery Order by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Enter Docket Control Order by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Docket Control Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re #34 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Schedule to Govern Discovery and Briefing Pertaining to Standing and Venue filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Alternate Order)(Etheridge, James)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #28 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 ( Responses due by 8/14/2019); granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/9/2019. (nkl, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. David Folsom is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/9/2019. (nkl, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #34 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Schedule to Govern Discovery and Briefing Pertaining to Standing and Venue filed by Google LLC. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/8/2019. (nkl, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Seal Response to Motion to Dismiss ; granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Google's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/8/2019. (nkl, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Standing and Improper Venue [Dkt. 24] by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 5, 2019 Filing 35 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue Under Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(3), and 12(B)(6) filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Loveless, #2 Loveless Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of Drake Turner, #4 Turner Exhibit A, #5 Turner Exhibit B, #6 Turner Exhibit C, #7 Turner Exhibit D, #8 Declaration of James Palmer - November 2018, #9 Declaration of James Palmer - March 2019, #10 Declaration of Travis Richins, #11 Richins Exhibit A, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
July 5, 2019 Filing 34 Opposed MOTION for Entry of Schedule to Govern Discovery and Briefing Pertaining to Standing and Venue by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thames, Earl)
July 5, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017 LLC of No Agreement on Mediator (Loveless, Ryan)
July 5, 2019 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Response to Motion to Dismiss by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
July 5, 2019 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 30 REDACTION to #28 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration - A. Tekell, #2 Affidavit Declaration - J. Vallery, #3 Affidavit Declaration - P. Orr - Redacted, #4 Affidavit Declaration - B. Phan, #5 Exhibit A - TXED-2-17-cv-00258-104 (excerpted), #6 Exhibit B - Burdick 258 deposition (excerpted), #7 Exhibit C - Turner -158 depo (excerpted), #8 Exhibit D - Uniloc v. Apple (-258) - Dkt. 61-2, #9 Exhibit E - Uniloc 2017 Corporate Disclosure, #10 Exhibit F - Etchegoyen LinkedIn, #11 Exhibit G - Texas SoS - Uniloc 2017, #12 Exhibit H - Burdick LinkedIn, #13 Exhibit I - Meisinger LinkedIn, #14 Exhibit J - Turner LinkedIn, #15 Exhibit K - Fortress location, #16 Exhibit L - Uniloc DE Certificate of Formation, #17 Exhibit M - DE Certificate of Formation - CF Uniloc Holdings, #18 Exhibit N - App to Reg Foreign LLC, #19 Exhibit O - Stmt of Information, #20 Exhibit P - Fortress Agreement, #21 Exhibit Q - Third Amendment Fortress, #22 Exhibit R - Levy -360 deposition (excerpted), #23 Exhibit S - Jacobs - 360 declaration (excerpted), #24 Exhibit T - Turner -360 deposition (excerpted), #25 Exhibit U - CF Uniloc agreement (excerpted), #26 Exhibit V - Order on MTD (-360) (excerpted), #27 Exhibit W - Palmer LinkedIn, #28 Exhibit X - Intentionally Blank, #29 Exhibit Y - Erez Levy LinkedIn Profile, #30 Exhibit Z - Michele Moreland LinkedIn Profile, #31 Exhibit AA - TXWD-1-17-cv-00754-47 (excerpted), #32 Exhibit AB - Uniloc v. RingCentral - Burdick decl, #33 Exhibit AC - Burdick 258 declaration, #34 Exhibit AD: Table C-5, #35 Exhibit AE - fcms_na_distprofile0331.2019 (excerpted), #36 Exhibit AF - Pendragon assignment of patent rights (1), #37 Exhibit AG - US5579471, #38 Exhibit AH - US5465353, #39 Exhibit AI - Ronald Barber LinkedIn, #40 Exhibit AJ - Dragutin Petkovic _ LinkedIn, #41 Exhibit AK - Peter Hart Linkedin, #42 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 2, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR IN PER ATTORNEY. Document # 29, Redaction. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 29 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY REDACTION to #28 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration - A. Tekell, #2 Affidavit Declaration - J. Vallery, #3 Affidavit Declaration P. Orr - Redacted, #4 Affidavit Declaration B. Phan, #5 Exhibit A - TXED-2-17-cv-00258-104 (excerpted), #6 Exhibit B - Burdick 258 deposition (excerpted)., #7 Exhibit C - Turner -158 depo (excerpted), #8 Exhibit D - Uniloc v. Apple (-258) - Dkt. 61-2, #9 Exhibit E - Uniloc 2017 Corporate Disclosure., #10 Exhibit F - Etchegoyen LinkedIn., #11 Exhibit G - Texas SoS - Uniloc 2017., #12 Exhibit H - Burdick LinkedIn, #13 Exhibit I - Meisinger LinkedIn., #14 Exhibit J - Turner LinkedIn, #15 Exhibit K - Fortress location., #16 Exhibit L - Uniloc DE Certificate of Formation, #17 Exhibit M - DE Certificate of Formation - CF Uniloc Holdings, #18 Exhibit N - App to Reg of Foreign LLC, #19 Exhibit O - Stmt of Information., #20 Exhibit P - Fortress Agreement., #21 Exhibit Q - Third Amendment Fortress, #22 Exhibit R - Levy -360 deposition (excerpted), #23 Exhibit S - Jacobs - 360 declaration (excerpted, #24 Exhibit T - Turner -360 deposition (excerpted), #25 Exhibit U - CF Uniloc agreement (excerpted), #26 Exhibit V - Order on MTD (-360) (excerpted), #27 Exhibit W - Palmer LinkedIn, #28 Exhibit X - Intentionally Blank, #29 Exhibit Y - Erez Levy LinkedIn Profile, #30 Exhibit Z - Michele Moreland LinkedIn Profile, #31 Exhibit AA: TXWD 1-17cv754-47 (excerpt), #32 Exhibit AB - Uniloc v. RingCentral - Burdick decl, #33 Exhibit AC - Burdick 258 declaration, #34 Exhibit AD: Table C-5, #35 Exhibit AE - fcms_na_distprofile0331.2019 (excerpted), #36 Exhibit AF: TXWD 1-18cv158-159, #37 Exhibit AG- Hulyalkar Linkedin, #38 Exhibit AH: Hiep Pham LinkedIn, #39 Exhibit AI: Lyn Nguyen LinkedIn, #40 Exhibit AJ: US20030149794 Morris, #41 Exhibit AK: John Noneman LinkedIn, #42 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 7/2/2019 (nkl, ).
July 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 7/1/2019. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml)
June 28, 2019 Filing 28 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Tekell, #2 Declaration of J. Vallery, #3 Declaration of P. Orr, #4 Declaration of B. Phan, #5 Exhibit A - TXED-2-17-cv-00258-104 (excerpted), #6 Exhibit B - Burdick 258 deposition (excerpted), #7 Exhibit C - Turner -158 depo (excerpted), #8 Exhibit D - Uniloc v. Apple (-258) - Dkt. 61-2, #9 Exhibit E - Uniloc 2017 Corporate Disclosure, #10 Exhibit F - Etchegoyen LinkedIn, #11 Exhibit G - Texas SoS - Uniloc 2017, #12 Exhibit H - Burdick LinkedIn, #13 Exhibit I - Meisinger LinkedIn, #14 Exhibit J - Turner LinkedIn, #15 Exhibit K - Fortress location, #16 Exhibit L - Uniloc DE Certificate of Formation, #17 Exhibit M - DE Certificate of Formation - CF Uniloc Holdings, #18 Exhibit N - App to Reg Foreign LLC, #19 Exhibit O - Stmt of Information, #20 Exhibit P - Fortress Agreement, #21 Exhibit Q - Third Amendment Fortress, #22 Exhibit R - Levy -360 deposition (excerpted), #23 Exhibit S - Jacobs - 360 declaration (excerpted), #24 Exhibit T - Turner -360 deposition (excerpted), #25 Exhibit U - CF Uniloc agreement (excerpted), #26 Exhibit V - Order on MTD (-360) (excerpted), #27 Exhibit W - Palmer LinkedIn, #28 Exhibit X - Intentionally blank, #29 Exhibit Y - Erez Levy LinkedIn Profile, #30 Exhibit Z - Michele Moreland LinkedIn Profile, #31 zExhibit AA - TXWD-1-17-cv-00754-47 (excerpted), #32 zExhibit AB - Uniloc v. RingCentral - Burdick decl, #33 zExhibit AC - Burdick 258 declaration, #34 zExhibit AD - Table C-5, #35 zExhibit AE - fcms_na_distprofile0331.2019 (excerpted), #36 zExhibit AF - Pendragon assignment of patent rights (1), #37 zExhibit AG - US5579471, #38 zExhibit AH - US5465353, #39 zExhibit AI - Ronald Barber LinkedIn, #40 zExhibit AJ - Dragutin Petkovic _ LinkedIn, #41 zExhibit AK - Peter Hart Linkedin, #42 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Google's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC Sec. 1404 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of Google LLC (Thames, Earl)
June 19, 2019 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. (Jones, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and Improper Venue Under Rules 12(B)(1), 12(B)(3), and 12(B)(6) by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A- BMC Software v. Cherwell Software, #2 Ex. B Final People Ops (Orr) 1406 Decl. - Pgs 1-3 - Signed, #3 Ex. C [March 21, 2019] Lim - Uniloc Declaration, #4 Ex. D Fortress Agreement, #5 Ex. E Standing Order_Alsup 2-1-19, #6 Ex. F Turner Deposition, #7 Ex. G Uniloc Summary of Ownership (Dkt 120), #8 Ex. H UNILOC 2017 LLC - DE - Certified Copy, #9 Ex. I FORTRESS CREDIT CO LLC - DE - Certified Copy, #10 Ex. J Foster Declaration (Box Case), #11 Ex. L 2014 Fortress Credit Patent Security Agreement, #12 Ex. M Third Amendment Fortress, #13 Ex. N Summary of Uniloc Patent Challeneges, #14 Ex. O McCallion signed declaration, #15 Ex. P Arscott Declaration Signed, #16 Ex. Q Joshua Cha (megaport) Declaration Signed, #17 Ex. R Signed Krause Declaration re Express, #18 Ex. S US Patent No. 6,628,712, #19 Ex. T US Patent No. 7,012,960, #20 Ex. U US Patent No. 6,366,908, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Google LLC (Clutter, Patrick)
June 17, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc 2017 LLC Pursuant to P.R. 3-1, 3-2 (Loveless, Ryan)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2019 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/5/2019. (nkl, )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/3/2019. (nkl, )
June 4, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google LLC to 6/19/2019. (nkl, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bonnie Phan on behalf of Google LLC (Phan, Bonnie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Joseph Samartino on behalf of Google LLC (Samartino, Mark)
May 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Isaac Margulies on behalf of Google LLC (Margulies, Paul)
April 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Momti Nyemah on behalf of Google LLC (Nyemah, Nicholas)
April 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Lee on behalf of Google LLC (Lee, Nicholas)
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Anthony Berta on behalf of Google LLC (Berta, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Caine on behalf of Google LLC (Caine, David)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google LLC.( Jones, Michael)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google LLC.( Jones, Michael)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. Google LLC served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019. (Loveless, Ryan)
April 3, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google LLC to 5/20/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
April 3, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google LLC to 6/4/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Google LLC. (nkl, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Lee Richins on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Richins, Travis)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Huang on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Huang, Jeffrey)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Mangrum, Brett)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Loveless, Ryan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Loveless, Ryan)
January 2, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
January 2, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
December 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Loveless, Ryan)
December 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Patent Infringement against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7078867.), filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '201 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Etheridge, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Uniloc Licensing USA LLC
Represented By: James L Etheridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Uniloc USA, Inc.
Represented By: James L Etheridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: Travis Lee Richins
Represented By: Brian Matthew Koide
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Brett Aaron Mangrum
Represented By: Jeffrey Huang
Represented By: Ryan Scott Loveless
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Represented By: James L Etheridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Masanori Koresawa
Represented By: Nicholas Momti Nyemah
Represented By: E. Glenn Thames, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Conor Reidy
Represented By: Nicholas Lee
Represented By: Michael Edwin Jones
Represented By: Mark Joseph Samartino
Represented By: Paul Isaac Margulies
Represented By: David A Caine
Represented By: Carson Dean Anderson
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Represented By: Michael Anthony Berta
Represented By: Bonnie Phan
Represented By: Michael A. Berta
Represented By: Nicholas M Nyemah
Represented By: David Adam Caine
Represented By: Andrew T. Dufresne
Represented By: Dan L Bagatell
Represented By: Nicholas H Lee
Represented By: David A. Caine
Represented By: Mark Joseph Samartino,
Represented By: Nicholas H. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?