Gonzales v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Veronica Gonzales and Veronica Ann Gonzales
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Northwest Trustee Services, Inc., Juliet Bernal, U.S. Bank National Association, Quality Loan Service Corporation and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2020cv05494
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 28 Renotice motion hearing re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed byJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 10/2/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. (Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 26 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Remand ) filed byJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Haist, Frederick) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 25 Renotice motion hearing re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (to be heard in Oakland, CA, Courtroom TBD) for November 10, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. before the Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers filed byU.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 09/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RECUSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/30/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 30, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonic before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Seeborg's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 9/30/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; REASSIGNING CASE TO A DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/29/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Remand ) filed byU.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Remand. Responses due by 10/2/2020. Replies due by 10/9/2020. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 Motion to Remand and DECLARATION OF VERONICA GONZALES; OBJECTION TO JURISDICTION OF USDC TO HEAR THE STATE CASE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION by Veronica Ann Gonzales. Responses due by 10/2/2020. Replies due by 10/9/2020. (Gonzales, Veronica) (Filed on 9/18/2020) Modified on 9/22/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S THIRD NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 9/15/2020 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Change of Firm Name by U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 9/3/2020) Modified on 9/4/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/17/2020. Opposition to #7 Motion to Dismiss due by 9/17/2020. Replies re #7 Motion to Dismiss due by 9/24/2020. Motion Hearing on #7 motion to dismiss set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/3/2020. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Judicial Notice re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (to be heard in Oakland, CA, Courtroom TBD) filed byU.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (to be heard in Oakland, CA, Courtroom TBD) filed by U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 9/14/2020. Replies due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rapkine, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Non-Opposition (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Haist, Frederick) (Filed on 8/28/2020) Modified on 8/31/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please be sure the Judge's initials are correctly reflected as KAW, not DAW, on all future filings. Re: #8 Request for Judicial Notice filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/20/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Judicial Notice re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed byJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Haist, Frederick) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 8/27/2020. Replies due by 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haist, Frederick) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Haist, Frederick) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2929 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/21/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV2001401. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14788787). Filed byJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 8/7/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Ann Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliet Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: Frederick Alan Haist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?