Bonilla v. Superior Court of Sonoma County
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Bonilla
Defendant: Superior Court of Sonoma County
Case Number: 4:2020cv05776
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE RE MALICIOUS PROSECUTION by Steven Wayne Bonilla (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/20/2020. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/20/2020. ***Civil Case Terminated. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Failure to Enter a Default Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 55 or to Issue an Order to Show Cause Pursuant to 28 USC 2243. Filed bySteven Wayne Bonilla. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonilla v. Superior Court of Sonoma County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of Sonoma County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?