Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Pension Trust et al v. Mancias et al
Plaintiff: Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Pension Trust, Trustee Jacob Jameson, Trustee Michael Newington, Board of Trustees of the Shop Ironworkers 790 Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Welfare Trust, Northern California Shop Ironworkers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Northern California Shop Ironworkers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Trustee Greg McClelland and Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Welfare Trust
Defendant: Ricardo Avila Mancias doing business as Mancias Steel Co. and ABS Manufacturers, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv05812
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by ABS Manufacturers, Inc., Ricardo Avila Mancias identifying Corporate Parent Mancias Steel Company, Inc. for ABS Manufacturers, Inc., Ricardo Avila Mancias. (Mason, Roger) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint byABS Manufacturers, Inc., Ricardo Avila Mancias. (Mason, Roger) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Jameson, Michael Newington, Northern California Shop Ironworkers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Greg McClelland, Board of Trustees of the Shop Ironworkers 790 Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the Northern California Shop Ironworkers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Pension Trust, Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Welfare Trust, Board of Trustees of the Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Welfare Trust. Ricardo Avila Mancias served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Jameson, Michael Newington, Northern California Shop Ironworkers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Greg McClelland, Board of Trustees of the Shop Ironworkers 790 Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the Northern California Shop Ironworkers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Pension Trust, Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Welfare Trust, Board of Trustees of the Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Welfare Trust. ABS Manufacturers, Inc. served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/9/2020. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 9/9/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Board of Trustees of the Northern California Shop Ironworkers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Shop Ironworkers 790 Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Welfare Trust, Jacob Jameson, Greg McClelland, Michael Newington, Northern California Shop Ironworkers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Pension Trust, Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Welfare Trust.. (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/16/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ABS Manufacturers, Inc., Ricardo Avila Mancias. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Board of Trustees of the Northern California Shop Ironworkers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Shop Ironworkers 790 Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Welfare Trust, Jacob Jameson, Greg McClelland, Michael Newington, Northern California Shop Ironworkers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Pension Trust, Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Welfare Trust (Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABS Manufacturers, Inc., Ricardo Avila Mancias ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14830681.). Filed byJacob Jameson, Michael Newington, Northern California Shop Ironworkers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Greg McClelland, Board of Trustees of the Shop Ironworkers 790 Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the Northern California Shop Ironworkers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Pension Trust, Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Welfare Trust, Board of Trustees of the Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Welfare Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mendoza, Luz) (Filed on 8/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Pension Trust et al v. Mancias et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Pension Trust
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Jacob Jameson
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Michael Newington
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Shop Ironworkers 790 Pension Trust
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Welfare Trust
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California Shop Ironworkers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Northern California Shop Ironworkers Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustee Greg McClelland
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shop Ironworkers Local 790 Welfare Trust
Represented By: Luz Elena Mendoza
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Avila Mancias doing business as Mancias Steel Co.
Represented By: Roger Mark Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABS Manufacturers, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Mark Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?