Chaitin-Lefcourt v. City and County of San Francisco
Plaintiff: ADAM CHAITIN-LEFCOURT
Defendant: ASHLEY SAJLIAGA SALMIA, SFPD OFC CHEW #2088, SFPD OFC CHRISTOPHER M. DUNNE #1775, SFPD OFC CHAVARIN #77, San Francisco Police Department, ADMIRAL SECURITY SERVICES, INC., CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, a political subdivision of the State of California, SFPD OFC NASER #4289, ANOTHER PLANET ENTERTAINMENT, LLC and SFPD OFC TOM #621
Case Number: 4:2020cv05822
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ADAM CHAITIN-LEFCOURT.. (Segal, Philip) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/16/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to ADMIRAL SECURITY SERVICES, INC., ANOTHER PLANET ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, a political subdivision of the State of California, ASHLEY SAJLIAGA SALMIA, SFPD OFC CHAVARIN #77, SFPD OFC CHEW #2088, SFPD OFC CHRISTOPHER M. DUNNE #1775, SFPD OFC NASER #4289, SFPD OFC TOM #621, San Francisco Police Department. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Segal, Philip) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 #Electronic filing error. A maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons or multiple defendants on THREE summons and re-file in its entirety. Additionally, Please only list the first named defendant, et al. in the caption. Re: #6 Proposed Summons filed by ADAM CHAITIN-LEFCOURT (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Segal, Philip) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by ADAM CHAITIN-LEFCOURT (Segal, Philip) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Proposed Summons is incomplete. Please complete the summons and re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by ADAM CHAITIN-LEFCOURT (jml S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Certificate of Interested Parties. The correct event can be found at: Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:[1-2] Certificate of Interested Parties filed by ADAM CHAITIN-LEFCOURT (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/1/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Segal, Philip) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14831087.). Filed byADAM CHAITIN-LEFCOURT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Segal, Philip) (Filed on 8/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaitin-Lefcourt v. City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY SAJLIAGA SALMIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFPD OFC CHEW #2088
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFPD OFC CHRISTOPHER M. DUNNE #1775
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFPD OFC CHAVARIN #77
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADMIRAL SECURITY SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, a political subdivision of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFPD OFC NASER #4289
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANOTHER PLANET ENTERTAINMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFPD OFC TOM #621
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM CHAITIN-LEFCOURT
Represented By: Philip Allan Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?